Cory Groshek v. Great Lakes Higher Education
Original Case: 3:15-cv-00143
Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:16-cv-03711 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Case Filed: | Oct 19, 2016 |
Terminated: | Aug 01, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 02, 2017 3:53 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
GREAT LAKES HIGHER EDUCATION CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
CORY GROSHEK, and all others similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/02/2017 3:39 AM CDT |
Wednesday, October 19, 2016 | ||
1 | 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 11/02/2016. Appellant's brief due on or before 11/28/2016 for Cory Groshek. [1] [6791464] 16-3711 (MM) |