Butcher v. Cable News Network, Inc.
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy C Batten, Sr |
Referred: | John K Larkins, III |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-03929 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race) |
Case Filed: | Oct 20, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jan 19, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 18, 2017 5:24 AM EDT |
Defendant
Cable News Network, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Turner Broadcasting System, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Omar Butcher
|
Represented By
|
1. | Former CNN employee files racial and religious discrimination lawsuit against company (legalreader.com) |
Submitted Mon 02/13/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 03/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
misc
Clerks Entry of Dismissal
Fri 01/19 9:25 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING48 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii). (jlm) |
||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Fri 01/19 9:26 AM
Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge John K Larkins, III terminated from case. (jlm) |
||
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
48 | 48
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 01/18 1:16 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Omar Butcher. (Mew, Thomas) |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
47 | 47
minutes
Settlement Conference
Mon 12/18 10:53 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas: Settlement Conference held on 12/14/2017. Parties advised the Court that the case settled. Clerk Office to terminate reference to settlement judge. (jlm) |
|
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
46 | 46
minutes
Settlement Conference
Mon 12/18 9:16 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas: Settlement Conference held on 12/11/2017. No settlement reached. Mediation held open until 12/15/17. (Tape #FTR)(rsh) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
45 | 45
1
pgs
order
Order Allowing Audio/Visual Equipment in the Courtroom
Thu 12/07 3:08 PM
ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM on 12/11/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 12/7/17. (rsh) |
|
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
44 | 44
5
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 12/01 3:23 PM
ORDER setting Mediation Hearing for 12/11/2017 at 09:30 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1810 before Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. This Order contains multiple mandatory deadlines and obligations. The parties are ORDERED to read the entire order and to comply with all deadlines set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 12/1/17. (rsh) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
43 | 43
2
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Settlement Judge
Mon 11/20 11:58 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Settlement Judge Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas, for mediation. Case is stayed pending mediation. Parties shall notify the Court within 7 days of the conclusion of the mediation whether the mediation was successful. If the mediation is unsuccessful, the Court will set a scheduling conference to set a time for the completion of depositions and any other outstanding discovery matters. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K Larkins, III on 11/16/17. (rsh) |
|
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
42 | 42
misc
Leave of Absence
Thu 11/09 2:39 PM
Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): January 1, 2018 through January 8, 2018, by Ilene Weisbard Berman. (Berman, Ilene) |
|
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
41 | 41
notice
Notice to Take Deposition
Mon 10/30 3:32 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of John Antonio filed by Omar Butcher (Mew, Thomas) |
|
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
notice
Notice to Take Deposition
Wed 10/25 4:10 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ellen Russ filed by Omar Butcher (Mew, Thomas) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
notice
Notice to Take Deposition
Mon 10/23 3:35 PM
Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of 30 (b)(6) through Marny Ridling filed by Omar Butcher(Mew, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment A | ||
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
notice
Notice to Take Deposition
Fri 10/20 1:39 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Marny Ridling filed by Omar Butcher (Mew, Thomas) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
notice
Notice to Take Deposition
Tue 09/26 6:18 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Plaintiff Omar Butcher filed by Cable News Network, Inc., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc. (Berman, Ilene) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 09/18 4:14 PM
ORDER allowing Defendants to examine Plaintiff for up to 5 hurs at his reconvened deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K Larkins, III on 9/18/17. (jlm) |
|
35 | 35
minutes
Discovery Hearing
Mon 09/18 4:10 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John K Larkins, III: Discovery Hearing held on 9/18/2017. The parties were heard on Defendants' request for additional time to examine Plaintiff at his reconvened deposition. As set out by separate order, the Court ordered that Defendants shall be allowed to examine Plaintiff for up to five hours at his reconvened deposition. (Court Reporter FTR)(jlm) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 09/15 4:44 PM
NOTICE of TELECONFERENCE Hearing: Discovery Hearing set for 9/18/2017 at 01:00 PM in ATLA Courtroom 1834 before Magistrate Judge John K Larkins III. (smw) |
||
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Thu 09/07 10:45 AM
Second Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery with Brief In Support by Cable News Network, Inc., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc..(Berman, Ilene) Text Modified on 9/7/2017 (sap). |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Thu 09/07 11:14 AM
ORDER granting34 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery ends on 11/17/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K Larkins, III on 09/07/2017. (smw) |
||
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 08/08 5:22 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Cable News Network, Inc., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc. Notice of Deposition of Plaintiff Omar Butcher (Berman, Ilene) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 05/17 3:32 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Omar Butcher serving Plaintiff's Responses and Objections to Defendant CNN'S Second Requests For Production of Documents to Plaintiff (Mew, Thomas) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Fri 05/05 5:31 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Cable News Network, Inc., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc..(Berman, Ilene) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Fri 05/05 5:43 PM
ORDER granting31 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery ends on 9/11/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K Larkins, III on 05/05/2017.(smw) |
||
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
order
Protective Order
Thu 05/04 11:19 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K Larkins, III on 5/4/17. (jlm) |
|
29 | 29
order
Order
Thu 05/04 11:16 AM
ORDER construing28 Stipulated Protective Order as a Joint Motion for entry of a Protective Order and GRANTS the Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K Larkins, III on 5/4/17. (jlm) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Thu 05/04 11:18 AM
ORDER granting28 Joint Motion for Protective Order. (Contained in29 Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge John K Larkins, III on 5/4/17. (jlm) |
||
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Stipulation
Tue 05/02 4:16 PM
STIPULATION Protective Order by Cable News Network, Inc., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc..(Hebert, Shawntel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Written Assurance | ||
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
service
Certificate of Service
Fri 04/14 2:32 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Cable News Network, Inc. Defendant Cable News Network, Inc.'s Second Requests for Production of Documents (Berman, Ilene) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Leave of Absence
Wed 03/29 12:49 PM
Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): April 10, 2017 through April 14, 2017 and June 16, 2017 through June 27, 2017, by Ilene Weisbard Berman. (Berman, Ilene) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
discov
Certificate of Service
Wed 03/22 7:19 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Responses & Objections to Def's 1st RPD by Omar Butcher.(Mew, Thomas) |
|
24 | 24
discov
Certificate of Service
Wed 03/22 7:18 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Answers & Objections to Def's 1st Set of Interrogatories by Omar Butcher.(Mew, Thomas) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Leave of Absence
Wed 03/15 1:33 PM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): April 3 through April 7, 2017 and May 8 through May 12, 2017, by Edward D. Buckley. (Buckley, Edward) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 03/13 11:03 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Cable News Network, Inc. Defendant CNN's Responses to Plaintiff's First Request for Admissions (Berman, Ilene) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
service
Certificate of Service
Fri 03/10 6:10 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Cable News Network, Inc. Defendant CNN's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents (Berman, Ilene) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Thu 03/09 4:37 PM
Defendants ANSWER to19 Amended Complaint by Cable News Network, Inc..(Berman, Ilene) |
|
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 02/23 4:03 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cable News Network, Inc., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc.with Jury Demand, filed by Omar Butcher.(jlm) |
|
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Thu 02/23 3:59 PM
ORDER GRANTING17 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K Larkins, III on 2/23/17. (jlm) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Leave to File Document
Thu 02/23 3:01 PM
Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Omar Butcher.(Mew, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed First Amended Complaint | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 02/23 2:57 PM
NOTICE by Omar Butcher re15 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (of Withdrawal) (Mew, Thomas) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 02/10 7:10 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by Omar Butcher.(Buckley, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 Brief Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - HR Reporting & Analytics, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Proposed Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, January 25, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 01/25 5:41 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Cable News Network, Inc. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Berman, Ilene) |
|
13 | 13
discov
Initial Disclosures
Wed 01/25 3:24 PM
Initial Disclosures by Omar Butcher.(Mew, Thomas) |
|
12 | 12
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 01/25 2:45 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Omar Butcher serving Plaintiff's First Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant (Mew, Thomas) |
|
11 | 11
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 01/25 2:41 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Omar Butcher serving Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Defendant (Mew, Thomas) |
|
10 | 10
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 01/25 2:37 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Omar Butcher serving Plaintiff's First Requests for Admissions to Defendant (Mew, Thomas) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 01/12 10:38 AM
Magistrate Judge's SCHEDULING ORDER re:8 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan and INSTRUCTIONS Regarding Management of Civil Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K Larkins, III on 1/12/17. (jlm) |
|
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan
Wed 01/11 5:47 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Omar Butcher. (Buckley, Edward) |
|
Tuesday, December 13, 2016 | ||
misc
Clerks Notation for LOA/CIP
Tue 12/13 2:54 PM
Clerks Notation re7 Certificate of Interested Persons: reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (se) |
||
Monday, December 12, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons
Mon 12/12 5:17 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Cable News Network, Inc.. (Berman, Ilene) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 12/12 5:14 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to COMPLAINT by Cable News Network, Inc.. Discovery ends on 5/11/2017.(Berman, Ilene) |
|
Friday, November 04, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint
Fri 11/04 11:43 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Cable News Network, Inc..(Berman, Ilene) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 11/04 11:49 AM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Cable News Network, Inc. Answer due 12/12/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K Larkins, III on 11/4/16. (JKL) |
||
Thursday, October 27, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons
Thu 10/27 1:50 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Omar Butcher. (Mew, Thomas) |
|
misc
Clerks Notation for LOA/CIP
Thu 10/27 4:31 PM
Clerks Notation re4 Certificate of Interested Persons: reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (se) |
||
Friday, October 21, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
service
Return of Service Executed
Fri 10/21 1:34 PM
Return of Service Executed by Omar Butcher. Cable News Network, Inc. served on 10/21/2016, answer due 11/14/2016. (Mew, Thomas) |
|
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Fri 10/21 12:23 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Cable News Network, Inc.. (tcc) |
|
Thursday, October 20, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
26
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 10/21 12:22 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Omar Butcher. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-6768347.)(tcc) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |