Viveve, Inc. v. ThermiGen LLC et al
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rodney Gilstrap |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-01189 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Oct 21, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jun 04, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 19, 2017 4:23 AM CDT |
Defendant
Red Alinsod, MD
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ThermiAesthetics LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ThermiGen LLC
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
William Joseph Cornelius
wc@wilsonlawfirm.com Wilson Robertson & Cornelius PC 909 ESE Loop 323 Suite 400 P.O. Box 7339
Tyler, TX 75711 |
|
Plaintiff
Viveve, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, June 04, 2018 | ||
137 | 137
notice
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
Mon 06/04 11:54 AM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (nkl, ) |
|
136 | 136
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 06/04 11:49 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/4/2018. (nkl, ) |
|
135 | 135
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 06/04 6:20 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Viveve, Inc..(Cimino, Frank) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, May 31, 2018 | ||
134 | 134
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Thu 05/31 8:38 AM
ORDER granting133 Joint Motion to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/31/2018. (nkl, ) |
|
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 05/31 8:04 AM
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING: The Final Pretrial Conference scheduled at 8:30 a.m. on May 31, 2018 is CANCELLED. (jml) |
||
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
133 | 133
motion
Stay
Wed 05/30 7:01 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Joint Motion to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by Viveve, Inc..(Cimino, Frank) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
132 | 132
3
pgs
order
Order on Sealed Motion
Wed 05/30 8:31 AM
ORDER MEMORIALIZING INITIAL PRETRIAL HEARING - granting in part and denying in part101 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part102 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part119 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part120 Sealed Motion. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/29/2018. (ch, ) |
|
131 | 131
4
pgs
order
Order on Sealed Motion
Wed 05/30 8:22 AM
ORDER denying90 Sealed Motion to Strike Opinions of Viveves Technical WitnessDr. Lawrence Bass. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/29/2018. (ch, ) |
|
130 | 130
7
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Wed 05/30 8:21 AM
ORDER denying88 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/29/2018. (ch, ) |
|
129 | 129
misc
Transcript
Tue 05/29 8:56 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/22/18 (Pretrial Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR, TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Motion to Redact due 6/19/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/27/2018. (sholmes, ) |
|
128 | 128
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 05/29 5:29 PM
NOTICE by Viveve, Inc. Joint Notice of Outstanding Exhibit Objections(Cimino, Frank) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B |