Anderson v. Sanofi-Aventis U S L L C et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | S Maurice Hicks |
Referred: | Mark L Hornsby |
Case #: | 5:16-cv-01484 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Oct 24, 2016 |
Terminated: | Dec 08, 2016 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 22, 2017 4:59 AM CDT |
Defendant
Sanofi Aventis U S L L C
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi U S Services Inc
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi Winthrop Pharmaceuticals Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Lula Anderson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, December 28, 2016 | ||
utility
District Transfer/Remand Record Received
Wed 12/28 1:22 PM
DISTRICT COURT TRANSFER Record Received electronically by Eastern District of LA on 12/28/2016, case number 2:16-cv-16901. (crt,Whidden, C) |
||
Thursday, December 08, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
transfer
Order for Multi-District Litigation (MDL) Transfer
Fri 12/09 4:17 PM
ORDER FOR MULTI-DISTRICT LITIGATION TRANSFER CTO # 11, directing transfer to Eastern District of Louisiana, In Re: Taxotere (Docetaxel) Products Liability Litigation, MDL # 2740. Record electronically transmitted to receiving court. Case Terminated. All future pleadings should be filed with the newly assigned court. (crt,Reeves, T) |
|
Wednesday, November 30, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 11/30 11:10 AM
NOTICE received via email from Clerk of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transmitting Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-11) in MDL No. 2740, IN RE: Taxotere (Docetaxel) Products Liability Litigation advising case shall be transferred to the Eastern District of Louisiana upon the request of the record. (crt,Whidden, C) |
|
Monday, November 07, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 11/07 1:44 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Dennis Reich for Lula Anderson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 11/7/16. (crt,Keller, J) |
|
Friday, November 04, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 11/04 3:16 PM
MOTION for Dennis Reich to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3213653) by Lula Anderson. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby.(aty,Jeffcott, Emily) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of good standing, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed order | ||
Monday, October 24, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued - All (Form Included)
Tue 10/25 11:08 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sanofi U S Services Inc, Sanofi Winthrop Pharmaceuticals Inc, Sanofi-Aventis U S L L C. (crt,Keller, J) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 10/24 3:51 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3203777) filed by Lula Anderson.(Attorney Emily Catherine Jeffcott added to party Lula Anderson(pty:pla))(aty,Jeffcott, Emily) |
|
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 10/25 10:44 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge S Maurice Hicks and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Keller, J) |