Pope v. City of Bay St. Louis, Mississippi et al
Mississippi Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Halil S Ozerden |
Referred: | John C Gargiulo |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-00384 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Oct 24, 2016 |
Terminated: | Aug 10, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Judgment
Thu 08/10 1:57 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT : Ordered that this civil action is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on 8/10/17. (RLW) |
|
15 | 15
order
Order
Thu 08/10 1:50 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE : Ordered that this civil action is dismissed without prejudice for failure to obey the Court's Orders and to prosecute. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on 8/10/17. (RLW) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order to Show Cause
Wed 06/28 2:11 PM
SECOND AND FINAL ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff on or before 7/19/17, respond in writing to this Order to Show Cause and explain why this case should not be dismissed for failure to comply with the Courts Orders [12, 13] of 4/13/17, and 5/23/17, respectively; and that Plaintiff on or before 7/19/17, comply with the Orders [12, 13] by specifically stating the following. See Order for details. Show Cause Response due by 7/19/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 6/28/17. (RLW) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 05/23 3:35 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Ordered that Clerk edit Plaintiffs address to include P.O. Box 88550. See Pl.s Resp. [11-1] attached envelope; that Plaintiff on or before 6/14/17, respond to this Order to Show Cause in writing, and explain why this civil action should not be dismissed for failure to comply with theCourts12 Order; that the Clerk mail to Plaintiff at his last known address a copy of the Order12 entered on 4/13/17; that Plaintiff on or before 6/14/17, specifically provide the following: See Order for details. Show Cause Response due by 6/14/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 5/23/17. (RLW) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order
Thu 04/13 3:19 PM
ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE MORE INFORMATION CONCERNING HIS COMPLAINT: Ordered that Plaintiff shall file a written response to this Order on or before May 5, 2017. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 4/13/17. (JCH) |
|
Thursday, December 22, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Response to Order
Thu 12/22 10:30 AM
Response to Order re10 ORDER (RLW) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Friday, December 16, 2016 | ||
misc
Partial Payment of Filing Fee
Fri 12/16 3:22 PM
Partial Payment of Filing fee made by: Plaintiff Jvar Vontou Pope $61.80, receipt number 34643042620, copy of docket entry mailed to plaintiff. (RLW) |
||
misc
Partial Payment of Filing Fee
Fri 12/16 3:23 PM
Partial Payment of Filing fee made by: Plaintiff Jvar Vontou Pope $1.44, receipt number 34643042621, copy of docket entry mailed to plaintiff. (RLW) |
||
Wednesday, November 30, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Wed 11/30 12:05 PM
ORDER re7 Response to Order filed by Jvar Vontou Pope,9 Notice of Change of Address filed by Jvar Vontou Pope. The Clerk shall mail Plaintiff a copy of the Response7 and Notice9 along with a copy of this Order. Plaintiff on or before 12/23/16, is directed to place his original signature on page 1 of the Response7 and Notice9 and return the Response7 and Notice9 with the original signature to this Court by mailing same to the Clerk, SouthernDivision, 2012 15th Street, Suite 403, Gulfport, Mississippi 39501. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 11/30/16. (RLW) |
|
Monday, November 28, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Mon 11/28 3:44 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Jvar Vontou Pope, MDOC #169719: CMCF QB, Bed #147; 3794 Highway 468; Pearl, MS 39208 (RLW) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Friday, November 18, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 11/18 10:41 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to NEF of Docket Annotation filed on 11/15/2016, NEF of7 Response to Order. Mail sent to Jvar Vontou Pope. (JCH) |
|
Tuesday, November 15, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
respm
Response to Order
Tue 11/15 11:48 AM
(Unsigned and Undated) Response to Order re6 ORDER filed by Jvar Vontou Pope (RLW) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Tue 11/15 11:50 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #7: This document is unsigned and undated. Also, plaintiff did not include the court style, case style and case number. A copy of the NEF for this docket annotation will be mailed to plaintiff. (RLW) |
||
Tuesday, November 01, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order
Tue 11/01 2:23 PM
ORDER: Clerk edit the docket to reflect the Defendants are as follows: City of Bay St. Louis, Mississippi; Gulfport, Mississippi Police Department; City of Gulfport, Mississippi; and John Does, Unnamed Officers; and that on or before November 30, 2016, Plaintiff shall file a written response to this Order. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 11/1/16. (RLW) |
|
Monday, October 31, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order Setting Payment Schedule Opsp6
Mon 10/31 5:03 PM
ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 10/31/16. (RLW) |
|
Friday, October 28, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
service
Acknowledgment of Receipt and Cert.
Fri 10/28 3:57 PM
Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to3 Order Opsp2. Acknowledgement filed by Jvar Vontou Pope (RLW) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Tuesday, October 25, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order Opsp2
Tue 10/25 12:26 PM
ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 11/28/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 10/25/16. (RLW) |
|
Monday, October 24, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed IFP 1983
Mon 10/24 1:42 PM
*RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jvar Vontou Pope (RLW) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 10/24 1:40 PM
COMPLAINT against Bay St. Louis; Gulfport, MS Police Department, filed by Jvar Vontou Pope. (RLW) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Assignment, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope |