MCINTOSH v. WARE OIL & SUPPLY COMPANY INC
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert L Hinkle |
Referred: | Charles A Stampelos |
Case #: | 4:16-cv-00676 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Oct 25, 2016 |
Terminated: | Dec 20, 2016 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 23, 2017 5:06 AM EDT |
Defendant
WARE OIL & SUPPLY COMPANY INC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SYLVIA J MCINTOSH
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, December 20, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Judgment (Signed by Clerk: Not an Opinion)
Tue 12/20 2:00 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - re: 11 Order for Dismissal. (cle) |
|
Monday, December 19, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order
Tue 12/20 1:52 PM
ORDER FOR DISMISSAL - re: 10 Order. The clerk must enter judgment stating, "This case is dismissed without prejudice in deference to arbitration." The clerk must close the file. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 12/19/2016. (cle) |
|
Tuesday, December 13, 2016 | ||
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Tue 12/13 8:57 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE notified that action is needed re:10 ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION. The deadline for filing a show cause motion/memo has expired. No motion/memo has been filed. (cle) |
||
Saturday, November 26, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 11/28 4:12 PM
ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION - The consented motion to dismiss or to stay and compel arbitration, ECF No. 5 , is granted in part. The parties must present their dispute to arbitration in accordance with the agreement they entered before the dispute arose. The case will be dismissed-by a judgment retaining jurisdiction to enforce the order to arbitrate and retaining jurisdiction to enforce or set aside any arbitration awardunless a party files by 12/12/2016 , a memorandum showing cause why the court should not so dismiss the case. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 11/26/2016. (vkm) |
|
Friday, November 18, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons
Fri 11/18 2:35 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by WARE OIL & SUPPLY COMPANY INC. (CRAWFORD, INA) |
|
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Fri 11/18 2:10 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE notified that action is needed re:3 Initial Scheduling Order. The Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline has expired. No disclosure statement has been filed. (cle) |
||
Thursday, November 10, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Thu 11/10 12:37 PM
NOTICE OF NO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STAY AND COMPEL ARBITRATION by SYLVIA J MCINTOSH (GOODMAN, ERIKA) |
|
Thursday, November 03, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 11/03 1:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ERIKA ESAN GOODMAN on behalf of SYLVIA J MCINTOSH (GOODMAN, ERIKA) |
|
Wednesday, November 02, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Wed 11/02 10:08 AM
NOTICE of Filing Executed Copy of Exhibit 1 to Defendants Motion To Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, Stay This Action And Compel Arbitration by WARE OIL & SUPPLY COMPANY INC re5 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (CRAWFORD, INA) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Tuesday, November 01, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Compel
Tue 11/01 9:55 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration by WARE OIL & SUPPLY COMPANY INC. (CRAWFORD, INA) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Don Everett, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Arbitration Agreement | ||
Friday, October 28, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order
Fri 10/28 11:25 AM
ORDER ON RULE 26(f) OBLIGATIONS - re: 3 Initial Scheduling Order. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 10/28/2016. (cle) |
|
3 | 3
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 10/28 11:22 AM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER - Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 11/14/2016 . Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/12/2016 . Discovery due by 2/23/2017 . Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 10/28/2016. (cle) |
|
Tuesday, October 25, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 10/25 1:38 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (MCCORMACK, J) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Tue 10/25 1:36 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WARE OIL & SUPPLY COMPANY, INC. d/b/a WARE OIL 21 PEPPERHEADS from Third Judicial Circuit in and for Taylor County, FL, case number 16-CA-428. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-3713086.), filed by WARE OIL & SUPPLY COMPANY, INC. d/b/a WARE OIL 21 PEPPERHEADS. (MCCORMACK, J) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Summons & Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal |