Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Timothy S Hillman
Case #: 4:16-cv-40154
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:5
Case Filed:Oct 25, 2016
Terminated:Feb 24, 2017
Last checked: Sunday Apr 23, 2017 4:38 AM EDT
Defendant
Timothy P. Loftus
Represented By
Roy A. Bourgeois
Bourgeoiswhite, LLP
contact info
Samuel J. Miller
Bourgeoiswhite, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Unum Group
Represented By
Amanda M. Baer
Mirick, O'Connell, Demallie & Lougee, LLP
contact info
Jonathan R. Sigel
Mirick O'Connell Demallie & Lougee
contact info

GPO Dec 06 2016
District Judge Timothy S Hillman: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting 4 Motion for Injunctive Relief and denying 10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Castles, Martin)

Docket last updated: 06/18/2018 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, February 24, 2017
33 33 order Order on Motion to Produce Fri 10:40 AM
District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting32 Motion to Release Documents. (Burgos, Sandra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2017
32 32 motion Produce Thu 5:05 PM
Joint MOTION to Produce Related [+] by Unum Group.(Baer, Amanda)
Related: [-] lease Documents
31 31 2 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 5:01 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Unum Group. (Baer, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 02, 2017
30 30 order Order on Motion to Amend Thu 1:58 PM
District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting24 Motion to Amend. Plaintiff is not required to deliver a mirror copy of the laptop to this court, however, plaintiff's counsel must hold the laptop in escrow pending further order from this Court. (Castles, Martin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 26, 2017
29 29 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 2:34 PM
District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting28 Motion for Extension of Time to January 27, 2017 to Confer and File Index. (Castles, Martin)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2017
28 28 motion Extension of Time Fri 5:32 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to January 27, 2017 to Confer and File Index by Timothy P. Loftus.(Miller, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 19, 2017
27 27 respm Opposition to Motion Thu 5:16 PM
Opposition re24 MOTION to Amend 19 Order on Motion to Compel, filed by Timothy P. Loftus. (Miller, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2017
26 26 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 12:58 PM
District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting25 Motion for Extension of Time. (Castles, Martin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2017
25 25 motion Extension of Time Thu 3:52 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to January 20, 2017 to Confer and File Index by Unum Group.(Baer, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 05, 2017
24 24 3 pgs motion Amend Thu 9:54 PM
MOTION to Amend 19 Order on Motion to Compel, by Unum Group.(Baer, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 27, 2016
23 23 misc Affidavit Tue 2:41 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Roy A. Bourgeois re16 Order on Motion for Injuctive Relief, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Timothy P. Loftus. (Bourgeois, Roy)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Affidavit Tue 2:40 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Timothy P. Loftus re16 Order on Motion for Injuctive Relief, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Timothy P. Loftus. (Bourgeois, Roy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2016
21 21 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 2:48 PM
District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Timothy P. Loftus answer due 12/23/2016. (Castles, Martin)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 12:12 PM
Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,, by Timothy P. Loftus.(Miller, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 08, 2016
19 19 order Order on Motion to Compel Thu 9:18 AM
District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting motion to extend time and denying17 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff is to produce the mirrored copy of the hard drive and copies of the documents on the laptop on or before January 6, 2017. (Castles, Martin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2016
18 18 respm Opposition to Motion Wed 5:17 PM
Opposition re17 MOTION to Compel and Extend Deadline filed by Timothy P. Loftus.(Miller, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Timothy P. Loftus
17 17 motion Compel Wed 3:49 PM
MOTION to Compel and Extend Deadline by Unum Group.(Baer, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 06, 2016
16 16 8 pgs order Order on Motion for Injuctive Relief Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 3:50 PM
District Judge Timothy S Hillman: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting4 Motion for Injunctive Relief and denying10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Castles, Martin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 30, 2016
15 15 minutes Motion Hearing Order on Motion for Injuctive Relief Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 10:58 AM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S Hillman: Motion Hearing held on 11/30/2016 re4 MOTION for Injunctive Relief filed by Unum Group,10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM And for Costs and Fees filed by Timothy P. Loftus, Case called, Counsel appear for motion hearing, Court hears arguments of counsel, Court rules taking under advisement4 Motion for Injunctive Relief and taking under advisement10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com.)(Attorneys present: Sigel,Baer/Miller) (Castles, Martin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 29, 2016
14 14 respm Opposition to Motion Tue 3:32 PM
Opposition re10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM And for Costs and Fees filed by Unum Group.(Baer, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits
Tuesday, November 22, 2016
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan R. Sigel on behalf of Unum Group (Sigel, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice Setting or Resetting Hearing on Motion Tue 8:50 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion4 MOTION for Injunctive Relief , and10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM And for Costs and Fees : Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2016 at 10:00AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 17, 2016
11 11 8 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Thu 4:12 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM And for Costs and Fees filed by Timothy P. Loftus. (Bourgeois, Roy)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 4:11 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM And for Costs and Fees by Timothy P. Loftus.(Bourgeois, Roy)
Related: [-]
9 9 respm Opposition to Motion Thu 4:09 PM
Opposition re4 MOTION for Injunctive Relief filed by Timothy P. Loftus. (Bourgeois, Roy)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 4:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel J. Miller on behalf of Timothy P. Loftus (Miller, Samuel)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 4:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Roy A. Bourgeois on behalf of Timothy P. Loftus (Bourgeois, Roy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 03, 2016
6 6 19 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Thu 12:10 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re4 MOTION for Injunctive Relief filed by Unum Group.(Baer, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-G,
Att: 2 Exhibit H-Y
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Thu 12:05 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Unum Group. Timothy P. Loftus served on 10/28/2016, answer due 11/18/2016. Acknowledgement filed by Unum Group. (Baer, Amanda)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Injunctive Relief Thu 12:01 PM
MOTION for Injunctive Relief by Unum Group.(Baer, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 26, 2016
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 11:43 AM
Summons Issued as to Timothy P. Loftus. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Case Assignment Wed 11:42 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Burgos, Sandra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 25, 2016
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 1:17 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6347118 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Unum Group.(Baer, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet and Category Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Exhibit G,
Att: 9 Exhibit H,
Att: 10 Exhibit I,
Att: 11 Exhibit J,
Att: 12 Exhibit K,
Att: 13 Exhibit L,
Att: 14 Exhibit M,
Att: 15 Exhibit N,
Att: 16 Exhibit O,
Att: 17 Exhibit P,
Att: 18 Exhibit Q,
Att: 19 Exhibit R,
Att: 20 Exhibit S,
Att: 21 Exhibit T