Snap Interactive, Inc. v. Snap Inc.
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Denise L Cote |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-08313 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125la Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Oct 25, 2016 |
Terminated: | Dec 26, 2016 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 23, 2017 5:16 AM EDT |
Defendant
Snap Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Snap Interactive, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, December 23, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Stipulation and Order of Dismissal
Fri 12/23 9:19 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice. (Signed by Judge Denise Cote on 12/22/16) (km) |
|
Thursday, December 22, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 12/22 11:39 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, WITH prejudice against the defendant(s) Snap Inc.. Document filed by Snap Interactive, Inc.. (Mende, Craig) |
|
Tuesday, December 20, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Tue 12/20 3:22 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting12 Letter Motion to Adjourn 12/22/2016 Initial Conference. The conference is adjourned to 2/24/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/20/2016) (gr) |
|
Monday, December 19, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Adjourn Conference
Mon 12/19 4:16 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from David H. Bernstein of Debevoise & Plimpton LLP dated December 19, 2016. Document filed by Snap Inc..(Bernstein, David) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 12/19 2:19 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David H. Bernstein on behalf of Snap Inc.. (Bernstein, David) |
|
Tuesday, November 01, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 11/01 4:08 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James David Silberstein on behalf of Snap Interactive, Inc.. (Silberstein, James) |
|
Wednesday, October 26, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Wed 10/26 4:54 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (Notice): Initial Conference set for 12/22/2016 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 15B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote.-Please follow the procedures set forth in the Notice. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/26/2016) (gr) |
|
8 | 8
misc
AO 120 Form Trademark - Case Opening - Submitted
Wed 10/26 1:50 PM
AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (pc) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Wed 10/26 1:48 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Snap Inc.. (pc) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Wed 10/26 1:41 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Denise L. Cote. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Wed 10/26 1:42 PM
Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 10/26 1:42 PM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
Tuesday, October 25, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 10/25 2:42 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Felicity Sloan Kohn on behalf of Snap Interactive, Inc.. (Kohn, Felicity) |
|
5 | 5
misc
AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney
Tue 10/25 2:38 PM
AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Mende, Craig) |
|
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 10/25 2:37 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Snap Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Snap Interactive, Inc.. (Mende, Craig) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 10/25 2:30 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Snap Interactive, Inc..(Mende, Craig) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 10/25 2:25 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Mende, Craig) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 10/25 2:22 PM
COMPLAINT against Snap Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-12912547)Document filed by Snap Interactive, Inc..(Mende, Craig) |