White v. PSI Parent, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Claudia Wilken |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-05909 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA) |
Case Filed: | Oct 12, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 10, 2017 2:52 AM PDT |
Defendant
Southland Office Investors, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Titan Real Estate Investment Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PSI Parent, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donna White
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
PSI Parent, Inc.
Terminated: 11/21/2016
|
|
Defendant
PSI Services, Inc.
Terminated: 11/21/2016
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, January 04, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment
Wed 01/04 9:01 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2017) |
|
Tuesday, January 03, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Tue 01/03 3:30 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by PSI Parent, LLC, PSI Services, Inc... (Eldredge, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/3/2017) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 01/03 3:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan A. Eldredge NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF GLYNN & FINLEY, LLP (Eldredge, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/3/2017) |
|
Monday, December 19, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order
Mon 12/19 2:22 PM
ORDER GRANTING re 11 Stipulation to Enlarge Time to Respond to Complaint by Less than Thirty (30) days filed by PSI Parent, LLC. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/19/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2016) |
|
12 | 12
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Mon 12/19 2:20 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant PSI Parent, LLC shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge Consent/Declination due by 1/3/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 1/3/2017. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2016) |
|
Friday, December 16, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Fri 12/16 3:04 PM
STIPULATION re8 Amended Complaint, to Enlarge Time to Respond to Complaint by Less Than Thirty (30) Days filed by PSI Parent, LLC. (Jones, Terrence) (Filed on 12/16/2016) |
|
Monday, November 21, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Mon 11/21 3:36 PM
Summons Issued as to PSI Parent, LLC, Southland Office Investors, LLC, Titan Real Estate Investment Group, Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2016) |
|
Monday, November 07, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Proposed Summons
Mon 11/07 4:00 PM
Proposed Summons. (Filed on 11/7/2016) |
|
8 | 8
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 11/07 3:59 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DAMAGES against Southland Office Investors, LLC, Titan Real Estate Investment Group, Inc., PSI Parent, LLC. Filed byDonna White. (Filed on 11/7/2016) |
|
Tuesday, October 25, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Tue 10/25 1:45 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Donna White (Filed on 10/25/2016) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Tue 10/25 1:44 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Donna White.. (Filed on 10/25/2016) |
|
Wednesday, October 12, 2016 | ||
5 | 5 Summons Issued as to PSI Parent, Inc., PSI Services, Inc., Southland Office Investors, LLC, Titan Real Estate Investment Group, Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2016) | |
4 | 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2016) | |
3 | 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/26/2016. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2016) | |
2 | 2 Proposed Summons. (Filed on 10/12/2016) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT FOR PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DAMAGES; Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-10845424.). Filed by Donna White. (Filed on 10/12/2016) Modified on 10/12/2016 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |