Kristin Schlecht v. Volkswagen Group of America Inc et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Charles R Breyer |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-06199 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Oct 26, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 24, 2017 2:17 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Mossy Automotive Group II, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Volkswagen Group of America Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kristin Schlecht
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Monday, November 07, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Transcript
Mon 11/07 9:29 AM
Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/03/2016, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina, rhondaaquilina@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/6/2017. (Aquilina, Rhonda) (Filed on 11/7/2016) |
|
Wednesday, October 26, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Wed 10/26 3:31 PM
Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:16-cv-07270. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Wednesday, October 19, 2016 | ||
8 | 8 Conditional Transfer Order - 64 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2672, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of California and assigned to Honorable Charles R. Breyer. Case transferred electronically. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-07152-DOC-SP et al. (see attachment)(dro) | |
Friday, October 07, 2016 | ||
7 | 7 ORDER STAYING CASE by Judge David O. Carter. All proceedings in this case are hereby STAYED pending a determination by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (the "MDL Panel") concerning the transfer of this action. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (dro) | |
Tuesday, October 04, 2016 | ||
6 | 6 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 14-03 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:15-cv-01930 DOC(SPx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon and Judge Manuel L. Real to Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:16-cv-07270 DOC(SPx). Signed by Judge David O. Carter (rn) | |
Wednesday, September 28, 2016 | ||
5 | 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (et) | |
Tuesday, September 27, 2016 | ||
4 | 4 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.,, identifying Volkswagen AG. (Oswell, Laura) | |
3 | 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by defendants Mossy Automotive Group II, LLC, VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.,. Related Case(s): 2:15-cv-07367; 2:15-cv-07375; 2:15-cv-07390; 2:15-cv-07391; 2:15-cv-07395; 2:15-cv-07429; 2:15-cv-07430; 2:15-cv-07431; 2:15-cv-07432; 2:15-cv-07473; 2:15-cv-07474; 2:15-cv-07475; 2:15-cv-07477; 2:15-cv-07517; 2:15-cv-01930; 2:15-cv-01948; 2:15-cv-01525; 8:16-cv-00209; 2:16-cv-01143; 2:16-cv-1120; 2:16-cv-01119; 2:16-cv-01104; 2:16-cv-01205; 2:16-cv-01164; 2:16-cv-01507; 2:16-cv-01527; 2:16-cv-01539; 2:16-cv-01563; 2:16-cv-01573; 2:16-cv-01575; 2:16-cv-01576; 2:16-cv-01577; 2:16-cv-01578; 2:16-cv-01580; 2:16-cv-1661; 2:16-cv-1662; 2:16-cv-1663; 5:16-cv-00462; 2:16-cv-01970; 2:16-cv-02014; 2:16-cv-02046; 2:16-cv-02148; 2:16-cv-02210; 2:16-cv-02214; 2:16-cv-02301; 2:16-cv-02302; 2:16-cv-02420; 2:16-cv-02429; 2:16-cv-02438; 2:16-cv-02469; 2:16-cv-2637; 2:16-cv-2796; 2:16-cv-805; 2:16-cv-02892; 2:16-cv-03074; 2:16-cv-03161; 5:16-cv-933; 2:16-cv-03162; 2:16-cv-3163; 5:16-cv-934; 8:16-cv-894; 2:16-cv-3385; 2:16-cv-3537; 2:16-cv-3727; 5:16-cv-1100; 2:16-cv-03776; 2:16-cv-3985; 2:16-cv-04171; 5:16-cv-01238; 2:16-cv-04177; 2:16-cv-04178; 2:16-cv-04179; 2:16-cv-04180; 2:16-cv-04181; 2:16-cv-4242; 2:16-cv-4244; 2:16-cv-4246; 8:16-cv-01111; 2:16-cv-4331; 2:16-cv-04333; 2:16-cv-04336; 2:16-cv-04338; 2:16-cv-4382; 8:16-cv-1139; 2:16-cv-4386; 2:16-cv-4392; 2:16-cv-4393; 2:16-cv-4394; 2:16-cv-4395; 2:16-cv-4399; 2:16-cv-4400; 2:16-cv-4401; 2:16-cv-4402; 2:16-cv-4403; 2:16-cv-4404;2:16-cv-4405;2:16-cv-04406; 2:16-cv-4423; 2:16-cv-4514; 2:16-cv-4630; 5:16-cv-1406; 2:16-cv-4774; 5:16-cv-01468; 8:16-cv-01252; 2:16-cv-04963; 8:16-cv-01256; 5:16-cv-01475; 5:16-cv-01476; 5:16-cv-01480; 2:16-cv-04989; 8:16-cv-01259; 2:16-cv-04997; 5:16-cv-01485; 2:16-cv-05068; 8:16-cv-01292; 8:16-CV-01314; 2:16-cv-5355; 2:16-cv-05631; 5:16-cv-01649; 5:16-cv-01650; 2:16-cv-05669; 2:16-cv-05776; 2:16-cv-05868; 2:16-cv-05874; 5:16-cv-01706; 5:16-cv-01707; 5:16-cv-01708; 2:16-cv-05875; 2:16-cv-05876; 8:16-cv-01456; 5:16-cv-01709; 2:16-cv-05877; 8:16-cv-01457; 8:16-cv-01458; 2:16-cv-05879; 8:16-cv-01459; 2:16-cv-05880; 2:16-cv-05881; 2:16-cv-05882; 2:16-cv-058832:16-cv-05938; 2:16-cv-06023; 8:16-cv-01491; 5:16-cv-01732; 2:16-cv-6564; 5:16-cv-01865; 5:16-cv-01917; 2:16-cv-6831; 2:16-cv-6832; 2:16-cv-6838; 2:16-cv-6839; 2:16-cv-6899; 2:16-cv-6900; 2:16-cv-6909; 2:16-cv-6917; 2:16-cv-06947; 2:16-cv-07065; 5:16-cv-02013; 5:16-cv-02014; 5:16-cv-02017; 5:16-cv-02018; 2:16-cv-07152; 2:16-cv-07255 (Oswell, Laura) | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Mossy Automotive Group II, LLC, VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.,. (Oswell, Laura) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number BC631642 Receipt No: 0973-18628524 - Fee: $400, filed by defendants Mossy Automotive Group II, LLC, VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.,. (Attorney Laura Kabler Oswell added to party Mossy Automotive Group II, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Kabler Oswell added to party VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC., (pty:dft))(Oswell, Laura) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal | ||
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Mossy Automotive Group II, LLC, Volkswagen Group of America Inc., Does 1 through 20, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Kristin Schlecht. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/24/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT B TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT #2] (et) |