Balfour Beatty Infrastructure, Inc. v. PB&A, Inc.
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Roy B Dalton, Jr |
Referred: | Gregory J Kelly |
Case #: | 6:16-mc-00052 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | Motion to Compel |
Case Filed: | Oct 28, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 12, 2016 4:54 AM EST |
Counter Claimant
PB&A, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Balfour Beatty Infrastructure, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PB&A, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Balfour Beatty Infrastructure, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Martin | Hild, P.A.
555 Winderley Place Suite 415
Maitland, FL 32751 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order
Thu 01/12 3:01 PM
ORDER -- Martin Hild, P.A.'s Limited Objection to the November 30, 2016 Order (Doc. No. 17), or Alternatively Request that the Court Deem Martin Hild's Production to Comply with the November 30, 2016 Order (Doc. 18) is OVERRULED. The Order of U.S. Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly (Doc. 17) isAFFIRMED. Martin Hild, P.A. is directed to produce all responsive documents by January 23, 2017. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 1/12/2017. (VMF) |
|
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Wed 01/11 5:57 PM
ORDER denying 24 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 1/11/2017. (CAC) |
|
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Leave to File Document
Mon 01/09 3:12 PM
MOTION for leave to file A Reply Brief In Support of Its Objection to the Magistrate's Order Granting PB&A's Motion to Compel by Martin | Hild, P.A.. (Johnson, Ricky) |
|
Friday, January 06, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
respoth
Response
Fri 01/06 3:29 PM
RESPONSE re18 Objection by Martin Hild, P.A. to Magistrate's Order Granting PB&A's Motion to Compel filed by PB&A, Inc., PB&A, Inc..(Stalmack, Todd) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - letter | ||
Friday, December 30, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order
Fri 12/30 12:00 PM
ENDORSED ORDER re 18 Objection To The November 30, 2016 Order (Doc. 17). Defendant PB&A is DIRECTED to file a responsive brief on or before January 6, 2017 not to exceed 10 pages. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 12/30/2016. (Dalton, Jr., Roy) |
|
Monday, December 19, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
appeal
Appeal of magistrate judge ruling to district court
Tue 12/20 8:32 AM
APPEAL of Magistrate Judge ruling to District Court by Martin | Hild, P.A. re18 Limited Objection to17 Order on motion to compelOrder on motion to transfer case (SWT) Modified on 12/20/2016 (SWT) |
|
20 | 20
order
*Order no pdf
Mon 12/19 3:45 PM
ENDORSED ORDER vacating "Order to Strike," Doc. No. 19. In an abundance of caution, "Martin Hild, P.A.'s Limited Objection to the November 30, 2016 Order (Doc. No. 17), or Alternatively Request that the Court Deem Martin Hild's Production to Comply with the November 30, 2016 Order," Doc. No. 18, is treated as an objection under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72 for the District Judge to rule on. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 12/19/2016. (MB) |
|
19 | 19
order
*Order pdf Order to strike
Mon 12/19 1:23 PM
ORDER to strike re: 18 Martin Hild, P.A.'s Limited Objection to the November 30, 2016 Order (Doc. No. 17), or Alternatively Request that the Court Deem Martin Hild's Production to Comply with the November 30, 2016 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 12/19/2016. (MB) |
|
Wednesday, December 14, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
respoth
Objection
Wed 12/14 4:35 PM
OBJECTION re17 Order on motion to compelOrder on motion to transfer case Limited Objection to the November 30, 2016 Order (Doc. No. 17), or Alternatively Request that the Court Deem Martin Hild's Production to Comply with The November 30, 2016 Order .(Johnson, Ricky) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (Declaration) | ||
Wednesday, November 30, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on motion to compel Order on motion to transfer case
Wed 11/30 5:23 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1 Defendant/Counterclaimant PB&A's Motion to Compel Non-Party Martin Hild, P.A. to Produce Documents; denying 2 Defendant/Counterclaimant PB&A's Motion to Transfer Its Motion to Compel Non-Party Martin Hild, P.A. to Produce Documents to the Northern District of California. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 11/30/2016. (MB) |
|
Friday, November 18, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 11/18 12:09 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re2 MOTION to transfer case filed by PB&A, Inc., PB&A, Inc..(Stalmack, Todd) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Subpoena, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Requests for Production | ||
Thursday, November 17, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Thu 11/17 1:21 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 13 Motion for Leave to File a Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Transfer Hearing of its Motion to Compel Martin Hild, P.A. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 11/17/2016. (MB) |
|
14 | 14
order
Order Referring Motion
Thu 11/17 11:30 AM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 13 MOTION for leave to file Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Transfer Hearing of its Motion to Compel re 2 MOTION to transfer to the Northern District of California filed by PB&A, Inc.. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 11/17/2016. (CAC) |
|
Tuesday, November 15, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Leave to File Document
Tue 11/15 6:20 PM
MOTION for leave to file Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Transfer Hearing of its Motion to Compel by PB&A, Inc., PB&A, Inc.. (Stalmack, Todd) |
|
Monday, November 14, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 11/14 3:50 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re1 MOTION to Compel Non-Party Martin Hild, P.A. to Produce Documents filed by Martin | Hild, P.A..(Johnson, Ricky) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 11/14 10:09 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re2 MOTION to transfer case /the Motion to Compel to the Northern District of California filed by Martin | Hild, P.A..(Johnson, Ricky) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
Tuesday, November 08, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on motion to appear pro hac vice
Tue 11/08 12:12 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 9 Unopposed Motion for Special Admission of Todd J. Stalmack to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Todd J. Stalmack is ordered to comply with the administrative procedures regarding electronic filing and register for a login name and password for CMECF. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 11/8/2016. (MB) |
|
Friday, November 04, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Fri 11/04 4:39 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Todd J. Stalmack to appear pro hac vice by PB&A, Inc., PB&A, Inc..(Bennett, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on motion to appear pro hac vice
Fri 11/04 2:46 PM
ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g) 7 Motion for Special Admission of Todd J. Stalmack to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 11/4/2016. (MB) |
|
Tuesday, November 01, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Tue 11/01 4:26 PM
MOTION for Todd J. Stalmack to appear pro hac vice by PB&A, Inc., PB&A, Inc..(Bennett, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of appearance
Tue 11/01 4:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian W. Bennett on behalf of PB&A, Inc., PB&A, Inc. (Bennett, Brian) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of appearance
Tue 11/01 4:18 PM
NOTICE of Ricky L.. Johnson's Appearance by Ricky L. Johnson on behalf of Balfour Beatty Infrastructure, Inc., Balfour Beatty Infrastructure, Inc. (Johnson, Ricky) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of appearance
Tue 11/01 4:17 PM
NOTICE of Gregory S. Martin's Appearance by Ricky L. Johnson on behalf of Balfour Beatty Infrastructure, Inc., Balfour Beatty Infrastructure, Inc. (Johnson, Ricky) |
|
Monday, October 31, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice to counsel of Local Rule
Mon 10/31 11:48 AM
NOTICE to counsel, Todd Stalmack, of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (copies mailed) (SWT) |
|
Friday, October 28, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Transfer case
Mon 10/31 11:43 AM
MOTION to transfer to the Northern District of California1 Motion to Compel Martin Hild, P.A. to Produce Documents by PB&A, Inc.(SWT) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
1 | 1
motion
Compel
Mon 10/31 11:41 AM
MOTION to Compel Non-Party Martin Hild, P.A. to Produce Documents by PB&A, Inc.(SWT) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Index, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit M, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit N, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit O, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit P, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit Q, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit R, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit S, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit T, | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit U | ||
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fees paid
Mon 10/31 11:44 AM
***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Todd J. Stalmack, appearing on behalf of PB&A, Inc., PB&A, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL-57986.). (SWT) |