NGL Energy Partners LP et al v. Lightning Master Corporation
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Fred Biery |
Case #: | 5:16-cv-01087 |
Nature of Suit | 385 Torts - Personal Property - Property Damage Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Nov 01, 2016 |
Terminated: | Feb 13, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 30, 2017 4:08 AM CDT |
Defendant
Lightning Master Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
High Sierra Water-Eagle Ford LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NGL Energy Partners LP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NGL Water Solutions Eagle Ford, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NGL Water Solutions, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, March 09, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Clerk's Copy
Thu 03/09 3:39 PM
Clerk's Copy of13 Remark (wg) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
misc
Remark
Mon 02/13 10:02 AM
Remark: Letter of Remand to the 81st Judicial District Court, Pearsall, Texas with Certified Copies of the Order, and Docket Sheet. (wg) |
|
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Mon 02/13 9:20 AM
ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT re9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by High Sierra Water-Eagle Ford LLC, ORDER GRANTING9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by High Sierra Water-Eagle Ford LLC. this case is REMANDED to the 81st Judicial District Court of FrioCounty, Texas. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court send a certified copy of this order to the clerk of the state court. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg) |
|
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Response in Support of Motion
Wed 02/08 1:23 PM
RESPONSE in Support, filed by Lightning Master Corporation, re10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff High Sierra Water-Eagle Ford LLC,9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff High Sierra Water-Eagle Ford LLC (Moody, James) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Remand to State Court
Wed 02/08 11:53 AM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by High Sierra Water-Eagle Ford LLC. (Pickering, Mark) |
|
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Remand to State Court
Fri 02/03 1:45 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by High Sierra Water-Eagle Ford LLC.(Pickering, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Wed 01/11 1:38 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties by NGL Water Solutions, LLC. (Pickering, Mark) |
|
Tuesday, December 27, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 12/27 4:14 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER, ( ADR Report Deadline due by 6/2/2017,, Amended Pleadings due by 4/7/2017,, Discovery due by 11/3/2017,, Joinder of Parties due by 4/7/2017,, Dispositive Motions due by 1/12/2018,) The trial date will be determined at a later date by the Court. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg) |
|
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 12/27 4:12 PM
COURT ADVISORY CONCERNING DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg) |
|
Monday, December 19, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order
Mon 12/19 7:21 AM
Scheduling Recommendations by Lightning Master Corporation. (Moody, James) |
|
Monday, November 21, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Sched Order Notice of Right to Consent to Magistrate Trial
Mon 11/21 9:59 AM
Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Parties shall submit a scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order to the Court within the earlier of 90 days after any defendant has been served or within sixty (60) days after the appearance of any defendant., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg) |
|
Tuesday, November 01, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Remark
Wed 11/02 8:47 AM
Remark: Letter of Non-Admission to the Western District of Texas, forwarded to Atty: Tommy W. Gillaspie. (wg) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Tue 11/01 2:42 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties and Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Lightning Master Corporation. (Moody, James) |
|
1 | 1
5
pgs
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 11/01 2:41 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lightning Master Corporation (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-8997911), filed by Lightning Master Corporation.(Moody, James) |
|
Att: 1 71 pgs Exhibit Exhibits A-1 to A-8, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Supplement | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 11/01 3:39 PM
Case Randomly Assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg) |
||
misc
To be Referred to SA Mag Judge
Tue 11/01 3:40 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Mathy (wg) |