Texas Southern District Court
Judge:Nelva Gonzales Ramos
Case #: 2:16-cv-00463
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Nov 02, 2016
Last checked: Monday May 01, 2017 4:33 AM CDT
Defendant
1893 Oil & Gas, Ltd.
Represented By
Richard Glenn Foster
Porter Rogers Dahlman & Gordon, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Alamo Mineral Properties, LLC
Represented By
Richard Glenn Foster
Porter Rogers Dahlman & Gordon, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Burlington Resources Oil and Gas Company, LP
600 North Dairy Ashford Road
Houston, TX 77079
Represented By
Susan E Adams
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
William Scott Hastings
Locke Lord LLC
contact info
Defendant
ELP2 Management LLC
Represented By
Richard Glenn Foster
Porter Rogers Dahlman & Gordon, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
ELP2 Minerals, Ltd.
Represented By
Richard Glenn Foster
Porter Rogers Dahlman & Gordon, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Melba Jo Parrott
Represented By
Richard Glenn Foster
Porter Rogers Dahlman & Gordon, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Jeannine Powell Shold, WA
Represented By
Richard Glenn Foster
Porter Rogers Dahlman & Gordon, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Curtis Torrey Vaughan, III
Represented By
Richard Glenn Foster
Porter Rogers Dahlman & Gordon, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Robert Louis Vaughan
Represented By
Richard Glenn Foster
Porter Rogers Dahlman & Gordon, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Vaughan & Sons, Inc
Represented By
Richard Glenn Foster
Porter Rogers Dahlman & Gordon, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Verde Minerals, LLC
Represented By
Walter James Scott, Jr.
Scott Law Group LLP
contact info
George Theodore Scott
Scott Law Group LLP
contact info

GPO Jan 09 2019
dge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)ORDER ON CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND granting in part and denying in part 57 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 58 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 67 Motion for Leave to File.(Signed by Ju
GPO May 31 2019
ORDER granting 99 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. Claims against Defendant Burlington are DISMISSED. Furthermore, Plaintiffs are DENIED leave to amend.(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(mserpa, 2)

Docket last updated: 04/15/2017 7:13 PM CDT
Wednesday, November 02, 2016
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-17464041) filed by Verde Minerals, LLC.(Scott, Walter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-D,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet