Ramot at Tel Aviv University Ltd. v. Snap Inc.
Delaware District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph F Bataillon |
Referred: | Sherry R Fallon |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-01021 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Nov 02, 2016 |
Terminated: | Oct 10, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday May 01, 2017 5:27 AM EDT |
Defendant
Snap Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ramot at Tel Aviv University Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
utility
- CORRECTING ENTRY
Wed 10/11 10:12 AM
CORRECTING ENTRY: The main attachment at D.I.47 has been removed and replaced as the pdf was corrupt. (fms) |
||
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
47 | 47
misc
Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents
Tue 10/10 4:30 PM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,718,333 B2.(fms) |
|
Att: 1 Order on Stipulation of Dismissal | ||
46 | 46
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Tue 10/10 4:24 PM
ORDER granting45 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Snap Inc., ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 10/10/2017. (fms) |
|
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
45 | 45
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 10/06 11:44 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Snap Inc.. (Grimm, Thomas) Modified on 10/6/2017 (lih) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
44 | 44
notice
Notice - Other
Mon 08/21 3:41 PM
NOTICE of Screening Procedure by Ramot at Tel Aviv University Ltd. (Farnan, Brian) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
43 | 43
order
Oral Order
Wed 08/09 5:56 PM
ORAL ORDER - Pursuant to the filing of this case, the Court issues the following order: This case shall be immediately referred to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Magistrate Judge Fallon shall issue a scheduling order when appropriate. Magistrate Judge Fallon shall handle all dispositive and nondispositive matters on all issues, including claim construction, except for summary judgments, Daubert motions and pretrial motions in limine. On all dispositive matters, the magistrate judge shall issue a report and recommendation. The parties have the right to file objections to the report and recommendation, or in the case of nondispositive matters, file an appeal of the magistrate judge's order, and the same shall be decided by the undersigned. The magistrate judge shall likewise handle all discovery matters, scheduling, and pretrial conferences. If the parties believe the magistrate judge has a conflict of interest with this case, the parties shall so notify the Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 8/9/2017. (Brunswick, Amy) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
utility
Case Assigned (in lieu of Vacant Judgeship)
Tue 08/01 12:21 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Joseph F. Bataillon of the District of Nebraska (in lieu of Vacant Judgeship). Please include the initials of the Judge (JFB) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) |
||
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
42 | 42
misc
Redacted Document
Fri 07/21 4:56 PM
REDACTED VERSION of37 Letter by Snap Inc.. (Jacobs, Karen) |
|
41 | 41
misc
Redacted Document
Fri 07/21 4:55 PM
REDACTED VERSION of35 Letter by Snap Inc..(Jacobs, Karen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-6 | ||
40 | 40
misc
Redacted Document
Fri 07/21 2:57 PM
REDACTED VERSION of38 Letter by Ramot at Tel Aviv University Ltd.. (Farnan, Michael) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
misc
Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)
Thu 07/20 5:10 PM
STIPULATION to Amend Case Management Order by Ramot at Tel Aviv University Ltd.. (Farnan, Brian) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
minutes
Discovery Hearing
Tue 07/25 2:50 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Discovery Dispute Hearing held on 7/18/2017. (Court Reporter S. Ingram (Hawkins Reporting).) (lih) |
||
order
Oral Order
Tue 07/25 2:52 PM
ORAL ORDER- re34 MOTION for Conference to Resolve Discovery Dispute. The transcript of the hearing held on 7/18/2017 shall serve as the order of the court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/18/2017. (lih) |
||
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Letter
Fri 07/14 11:59 AM
[SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Michael J. Farnan regarding Response to Snap Inc.'s July 13, 2017 Letter - re35 Letter. (Farnan, Michael) |
|
37 | 37
misc
Letter
Fri 07/14 11:54 AM
[SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Karen Jacobs regarding response to letter from Ramot at Tel Aviv University, Ltd. dated July 13, 2017 re: discovery dispute - re36 Letter. (Jacobs, Karen) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Letter
Thu 07/13 11:59 AM
Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Michael J. Farnan regarding Discovery Dispute. (Farnan, Michael) |
|
35 | 35
misc
Letter
Thu 07/13 11:47 AM
[SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sherry R. Fallon from Karen Jacobs regarding discovery dispute.(Jacobs, Karen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-6 | ||
misc
Deficiency re Courtesy Copies (SRF cases)
Thu 07/13 2:31 PM
NOTICE: Per Magistrate Judge Fallon's Standing Order Regarding Courtesy Copies for discovery disputes, which requires two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs and two (2) copies of any other document filed in support of any briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits etc.) within one hour of filing, please submit to the Clerk's Office two copies of D.I. #35 and36 . (lih) |
||
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
order
SO ORDERED ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 07/11 3:49 PM
SO ORDERED- re34 MOTION for Conference to Resolve Discovery Dispute. A Discovery Dispute Hearing is set for 7/18/2017 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. In preparation for this hearing the parties shall follow the Discovery Matters and Disputes procedure as set forth in the Order regarding discovery matters available at www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/magistrate-judge-sherry-r-fallon. Set Deadlines: (Moving Submission on 7/13/2017, Responsive submission due on 7/14/2017.)Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/11/2017. (lih) |
||
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 07/10 3:06 PM
MOTION for Conference to Resolve Discovery Dispute - filed by Ramot at Tel Aviv University Ltd.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Farnan, Michael) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
utility
- CORRECTING ENTRY
Fri 06/30 10:15 AM
CORRECTING ENTRY: The pdf of D.I.33 has been replaced with a revised version of the document. (lih) |
||
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
discov
Notice of Service
Thu 06/29 6:04 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of List of Claim Terms and Preliminary Proposed Constructions filed by Snap Inc..(Jacobs, Karen) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
discov
Notice of Service
Thu 06/15 6:01 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Snap, Inc.'s Initial Invalidity Contentions filed by Snap Inc..(Kraftschik, Stephen) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
minutes
Discovery Hearing
Mon 07/10 2:32 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Discovery Review Hearing held on 6/7/2017. (Court Reporter T. Carroll (Hawkins Reporting).) (lih) |
||
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
discov
Notice of Service
Wed 05/31 5:27 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Ramot's Objections and Responses to Snap's Amended First Set of Requests for Production [Nos. 1-18] filed by Ramot at Tel Aviv University Ltd..(Farnan, Michael) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
discov
Notice of Service
Thu 05/25 4:54 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Ramot's Initial Claim Chart filed by Ramot at Tel Aviv University Ltd..(Farnan, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
discov
Notice of Service
Wed 05/24 5:15 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Ramot's Objections and Responses to Snap's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-13) and 2) Ramot's First Supplemental Initial Disclosures filed by Ramot at Tel Aviv University Ltd..(Farnan, Michael) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
discov
Notice of Service
Fri 04/28 5:42 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Snap Inc.'s Responses to Ramot's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-10); and (2) Defendant Snap Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 1-18) filed by Snap Inc..(Grimm, Thomas) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
order
SO ORDERED
Thu 04/27 7:46 AM
SO ORDERED, re27 Proposed Order filed by Ramot at Tel Aviv University Ltd.. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/27/2017. (Polito, Rebecca) |
||
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Proposed Order
Tue 04/25 5:35 PM
PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Protective Order by Ramot at Tel Aviv University Ltd.. (Farnan, Brian) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
discov
Notice of Service
Mon 04/24 5:18 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Snap Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Ramot at Tel Aviv University, Ltd.; and (2) Defendant Snap Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things to Plaintiff Ramot at Tel Aviv University, Ltd. filed by Snap Inc..(Grimm, Thomas) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
discov
Notice of Service
Fri 04/21 2:00 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Snap Inc.'s Production Pursuant to Paragraph 1(c)(3) of the Court's March 8, 2017 Case Management Order (D.I. 19) filed by Snap Inc..(Grimm, Thomas) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
order
SO ORDERED
Wed 03/29 7:48 AM
SO ORDERED, re21 Proposed Order filed by Ramot at Tel Aviv University Ltd.. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/29/2017. (Polito, Rebecca) |
||
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
discov
Notice of Service
Tue 03/28 10:00 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Ramot's First Set of Requests for Production [Nos. 1-18] and (ii) Ramot's First Set of Interrogatories [Nos. 1-10] filed by Ramot at Tel Aviv University Ltd..(Farnan, Brian) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
discov
Notice of Service
Thu 03/23 4:49 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Ramot's Initial Disclosures filed by Ramot at Tel Aviv University Ltd..(Farnan, Brian) |
|
22 | 22
discov
Notice of Service
Thu 03/23 3:42 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Snap Inc.'s Initial Disclosures and Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Stipulated Discovery Order filed by Snap Inc..(Grimm, Thomas) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Proposed Order
Wed 03/22 4:26 PM
PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Stipulated Discovery Order Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) by Ramot at Tel Aviv University Ltd.. (Farnan, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order
Tue 03/21 2:40 PM
ORDER: Counsel for the parties and knowledgeable party representatives are to attend an in person Discovery Review Conference with the Court on June 7, 2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6C. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/21/17. (cak) |
|
Wednesday, March 08, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Scheduling Order - Patent
Wed 03/08 10:44 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for discovery and all motions to dismiss, amend, transfer and any discovery motions permitted by the Magistrate Judge. Joinder of Parties due by 8/24/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 8/24/2017. Fact Discovery completed by 3/1/2018. Expert Discovery due by 6/7/2018. A Status Conference is set for 2/7/2018 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Dispositive Motions due by 6/27/2018. An Oral Argument is set for 8/31/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 8/10/2017. Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 9/7/2017. Claim Construction Reply Brief due by 9/28/2017. Claim Construction Surreply Brief due by 10/12/2017. A Markman Hearing is set for 12/6/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. A Status Conference re: Expert Discovery is set for 6/5/2018 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 11/16/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. A Jury Trial is set for 12/3/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/8/2017. (nmfn) |
|
Friday, March 03, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Proposed Order
Fri 03/03 4:58 PM
PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order by Ramot at Tel Aviv University Ltd..(Farnan, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter | ||
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Tue 02/21 3:14 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sue L. Robinson - Scheduling Conference held on 2/21/2017. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) Counsel to submit the final proposed scheduling order to the court. (nmfn) |
||
Monday, February 20, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Proposed Order
Mon 02/20 2:09 PM
PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order by Ramot at Tel Aviv University Ltd..(Farnan, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson | ||
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
utility
Add Attorneys - PHV only
Tue 02/07 2:27 PM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Leonard C. Suchyta for Ramot at Tel Aviv University Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg) |
||
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 02/06 2:35 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Leonard C. Suchyta - filed by Ramot at Tel Aviv University Ltd.. (Farnan, Brian) |
|
order
SO ORDERED
Mon 02/06 3:39 PM
SO ORDERED, re16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Leonard C. Suchyta filed by Ramot at Tel Aviv University Ltd. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/6/2017. (fms) |
||
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
utility
Add Attorneys - PHV only
Wed 02/01 2:59 PM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Reuben Chen for Snap Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lmm) |
||
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order Setting Scheduling Conference
Mon 01/23 11:27 AM
Order Setting In-Person Patent Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 2/21/2017 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/23/2017. (nmfn) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
Fri 01/20 2:58 PM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Snap Inc.. (Jacobs, Karen) |
|
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 01/20 2:56 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Snap Inc..(Jacobs, Karen) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 01/17 11:38 AM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew E. Buccellato of Cooley LLP - filed by Snap Inc.. (Jacobs, Karen) |
|
order
SO ORDERED
Tue 01/17 1:28 PM
SO ORDERED, re11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kyle D. Chen and Priya Viswanath filed by Snap Inc.,12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew E. Buccellato of Cooley LLP filed by Snap Inc. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/17/2017. (fms) |
||
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 01/13 3:28 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kyle D. Chen and Priya Viswanath - filed by Snap Inc.. (Grimm, Thomas) |
|
Tuesday, January 10, 2017 | ||
order
SO ORDERED
Tue 01/10 8:14 AM
SO ORDERED, re10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Yuan Liang, Mark Weinstein, Reuben Chen, Heidi L. Keefe and Emily E. Terrell of COOLEY LLP filed by Snap Inc. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/10/2017. (fms) |
||
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 01/09 4:40 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Yuan Liang, Mark Weinstein, Reuben Chen, Heidi L. Keefe and Emily E. Terrell of COOLEY LLP - filed by Snap Inc.. (Grimm, Thomas) |
|
Thursday, January 05, 2017 | ||
order
SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline
Thu 01/05 2:56 PM
SO ORDERED, re9 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to January 20, 2017 filed by Snap Inc., Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Snap Inc. answer due 1/20/2017. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/5/2017. (nmfn) |
||
Wednesday, January 04, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Stipulation to EXTEND Time
Wed 01/04 3:56 PM
Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to January 20, 2017 - filed by Snap Inc.. (Grimm, Thomas) |
|
Wednesday, December 07, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Wed 12/07 2:08 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address for Mark Raskin, Timothy J. Rousseau, and Robert Whitman of Mishcon De Reya New York LLP by Brian E. Farnan (Farnan, Brian) Modified on 12/7/2016 (fms) |
|
Monday, November 28, 2016 | ||
order
SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline
Mon 11/28 1:11 PM
SO ORDERED, re7 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to the Complaint to January 4, 2017 filed by Snap Inc., Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Snap Inc. answer due 1/4/2017. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 11/28/2016. (fms) |
||
Tuesday, November 22, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Stipulation to EXTEND Time
Tue 11/22 4:11 PM
Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to the Complaint to January 4, 2017 - filed by Snap Inc.. (Grimm, Thomas) |
|
Thursday, November 17, 2016 | ||
utility
Add Attorneys - PHV only
Thu 11/17 7:55 AM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Robert A. Whitman,Timothy J. Rousseau for Ramot at Tel Aviv University Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lmm) |
||
Wednesday, November 16, 2016 | ||
utility
Add Attorneys - PHV only
Wed 11/16 7:44 AM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Mark S. Raskin for Ramot at Tel Aviv University Ltd. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lmm) |
||
Monday, November 14, 2016 | ||
order
SO ORDERED
Mon 11/14 8:46 AM
SO ORDERED, re6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark Raskin, Timothy J. Rousseau, and Robert Whitman filed by Ramot at Tel Aviv University Ltd. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 11/14/2016. (fms) |
||
Friday, November 11, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 11/11 2:28 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark Raskin, Timothy J. Rousseau, and Robert Whitman - filed by Ramot at Tel Aviv University Ltd.. (Farnan, Brian) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
Fri 11/11 2:25 PM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Tel Aviv University Economic Corporation Ltd., Other Affiliate Tel Aviv University for Ramot at Tel Aviv University Ltd. filed by Ramot at Tel Aviv University Ltd.. (Farnan, Brian) |
|
Wednesday, November 09, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 11/09 2:00 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ramot at Tel Aviv University Ltd.. Snap Inc. served on 11/7/2016, answer due 11/28/2016. (Farnan, Brian) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 11/09 12:48 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Sue L. Robinson. Please include the initials of the Judge (SLR) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) |
||
Thursday, November 03, 2016 | ||
service
Summons Issued
Thu 11/03 8:46 AM
Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Snap Inc. on 11/3/2016. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (jcs) |
||
Wednesday, November 02, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents
Thu 11/03 8:45 AM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,718,333 B2. (jcs) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Magistrate Consent Forms
Thu 11/03 8:44 AM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jcs) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 11/03 8:43 AM
COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Snap Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2024213.) - filed by Ramot at Tel Aviv University Ltd.(jcs) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |