Data:)Comm Electronics, Inc. v. Skywalker Communications, Inc.
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas W Thrash, Jr |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-04107 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 28:1338 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Nov 02, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jan 03, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday May 01, 2017 5:25 AM EDT |
Defendant
Skywalker Communications, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Data:)Comm Electronics, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, January 03, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
A.O. Form 120
Tue 01/03 4:01 PM
AO Form 120 forwarded to Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (jkl) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 01/03 3:19 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Data:)Comm Electronics, Inc. (Crain, Norman) |
|
misc
Clerks Entry of Dismissal
Tue 01/03 3:54 PM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(i) (jkl) |
||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Tue 01/03 3:55 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (jkl) |
||
Monday, November 07, 2016 | ||
misc
Clerks Notation for LOA/CIP
Mon 11/07 11:26 AM
Clerks Notation re3 Certificate of Interested Persons, OK per TWT. (ss) |
||
Thursday, November 03, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons
Thu 11/03 5:17 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Data:)Comm Electronics, Inc.. (Crain, Norman) |
|
2 | 2
misc
A.O. Form 120
Thu 11/03 1:10 PM
AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (eop) |
|
Wednesday, November 02, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 11/03 1:03 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, filed by Data:)Comm Electronics, Inc.. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113E-6793227.)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified text on 11/3/2016 (eop) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit -A - 964 Patent, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit -B - Images of the Accused Product, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit -C - Preliminary Claim Chart, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |