Power Places Tours, Inc. et al v. Free Spirit
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Christine M Arguello |
Referred: | Kathleen M Tafoya |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-02725 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 28:1338 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Nov 04, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jun 23, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday May 03, 2017 3:31 AM MDT |
Defendant
Free Spirit
|
|
Plaintiff
Power Places Tours, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fred Toby Weiss
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Theresa Weiss
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jun 23 2017
ORDER granting 39 Motion for Default Judgment by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/23/2017. (swest) |
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
45 | 45
1
pgs
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 08/15 2:58 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re:41 Judgment,42 Order on Motion for Default Judgment,43 Judgment Addressed to Free Spirit. (athom, ) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
44 | 44
misc
Report re: Patent/Trademark
Tue 06/27 8:35 AM
Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the determination of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (athom, ) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
43 | 43
3
pgs
order
Judgment
Fri 06/23 4:00 PM
AMENDED DEFAULT AND FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of plaintiffs, Power Places Tours, Inc., Fred Toby Weiss, Theresa Weiss and against defendant, Free Spirit by Clerk on 06/23/2017. Amended to correct ECF Order No. as indicated. (swest) |
|
42 | 42
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Fri 06/23 3:56 PM
ORDER granting39 Motion for Default Judgment by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/23/2017. (swest) |
|
41 | 41
3
pgs
order
Judgment
Fri 06/23 3:49 PM
DEFAULT AND FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of the plaintiffs, Power Places Tours, Inc., Fred Toby Weiss, Theresa Weiss and against defendant, Free Spirit by Clerk on 06/23/2017. (swest) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
3
pgs
misc
Mail Returned
Mon 04/10 4:15 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re:26 Answer to Complaint,25 Order, 24 Order on Motion to Reset, Addressed to Free Spirit. (cthom, ) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
motion
Default Judgment
Wed 03/29 4:57 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Free Spirit by Plaintiffs Power Places Tours, Inc., Fred Toby Weiss, Theresa Weiss.(Tracy-Ramirez, Alexandra) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, Declaration of Attorney, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, Declaration of Plaintiff, | ||
Att: 3 19 pgs Exhibit 3, Receipts of Costs, | ||
Att: 4 4 pgs Exhibit 4, Summons and Proof of Service, | ||
Att: 5 11 pgs Proposed Order (PDF Only) | ||
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
order
Order
Wed 03/15 2:56 PM
ORDER: Counsel shall contact chambers at arguello_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov 60 days from today's date to set a scheduling conference or, in the alternative, if Plaintiffs intend to file a Motion for Default Judgment, they are directed to do so, citing the relevant authorities, within 14 days of today's date. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/15/2017. Text Only Entry (cmasec) |
|
37 | 37
order
Order
Wed 03/15 10:48 AM
ORDER: Upon further review of the file, the Court's Order of Reference to U.S. Magistrate Judge Tafoya, dated 11/7/2016 (Doc. # 7 ), is RESCINDED. This matter will be handled by the presiding Judge. FURTHER ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set for 3/22/2017 in front of Magistrate Judge Tafoya is VACATED. FURTHER ORDERED that the34 Third Motion to Reset Scheduling Conference is DENIED AS MOOT. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/15/2017. Text Only Entry (cmasec) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
order
Memorandum
Tue 03/14 3:22 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding34 Third MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference and Planning Meeting filed by Theresa Weiss, Power Places Tours, Inc., Fred Toby Weiss. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/14/2017. Text Only Entry (cmasec) |
|
35 | 35
misc
Errata
Tue 03/14 1:58 PM
ERRATA re34 Third MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference and Planning Meeting by Plaintiffs Power Places Tours, Inc., Fred Toby Weiss, Theresa Weiss.(Tracy-Ramirez, Alexandra) |
|
Att: 1 Corrected filing | ||
34 | 34
motion
Reset
Tue 03/14 12:27 PM
Third MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference and Planning Meeting by Plaintiffs Power Places Tours, Inc., Fred Toby Weiss, Theresa Weiss.(Tracy-Ramirez, Alexandra) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) | ||
33 | 33
order
Order on Motion to Strike
Tue 03/14 7:44 AM
ORDER granting32 Motion to Strike. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #31) is STRICKEN. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/14/2017. Text Only Entry (cmasec) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Strike
Fri 03/10 9:23 AM
MOTION to Strike31 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Power Places Tours, Inc., Fred Toby Weiss, Theresa Weiss.(Tracy-Ramirez, Alexandra) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) | ||
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
11
pgs
motion
Dismiss
Wed 02/22 9:14 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Free Spirit. (athom, ) |
|
30 | 30
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Wed 02/22 9:13 AM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re29 by Defendant Free Spirit. (athom, ) |
|
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order to Show Cause
Fri 02/03 11:39 AM
Order Striking Defendant's Second Answer and ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Defendant's26 second answer is STRICKEN. Defendant is ordered to show cause in writing on or before 2/17/2017, why, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37, default judgment should not be entered for his willful failure to comply with the orders of this Court. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 02/03/2017. (athom, ) |
|
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
1
pgs
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 02/03 11:20 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 15 Minute Order on Motion to Reset Addressed to Free Spirit. (athom, ) |
|
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Conventionally Submitted Material
Mon 01/30 2:46 PM
Conventionally Submitted Material : 1 CD - Additional Digital Evidence to Answer to Complaint26 by Defendant Free Spirit. Text Only Entry (athom, ) |
|
26 | 26
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 01/30 2:44 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Free Spirit. (athom, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
25 | 25
order
Order
Mon 01/30 1:43 PM
SECOND AMENDED ORDER Resetting Scheduling Conference for 3/22/2017 10:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/30/17. (sgrim) |
|
24 | 24
order
Order on Motion to Reset
Mon 01/30 9:49 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting22 Motion to Reset Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference set for February 14, 2017, is vacated, to be reset by separate order. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/30/17. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 ) |
|
Friday, January 27, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Memorandum
Fri 01/27 12:10 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding22 Second MOTION to Reset Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference filed by Theresa Weiss, Power Places Tours, Inc., Fred Toby Weiss. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/27/2017. Text Only Entry (cmasec) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Reset
Fri 01/27 11:48 AM
Second MOTION to Reset Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference by Plaintiffs Power Places Tours, Inc., Fred Toby Weiss, Theresa Weiss. (Tracy-Ramirez, Alexandra) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings - PUBLIC
Fri 01/13 3:54 PM
Utility Setting Deadlines: Free Spirit answer due 2/13/2017 pursuant to20 Order. Text Only Entry (athom, ) |
|
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond
Fri 01/13 3:51 PM
ORDER Striking Defendant's11 Answer for Failure to Comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Defendant is ORDERED to submit an answer that complies with the Federal Rules on or before 2/13/2017. The referral to the Magistrate Judge of Plaintiff's First Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond (Doc. # 19 ) is WITHDRAWN, and the Motion (Doc. #18 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 01/13/2017. (athom, ) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Memorandum
Thu 01/12 1:02 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding18 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re11 Answer to Complaint filed by Theresa Weiss, Power Places Tours, Inc., Fred Toby Weiss. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/12/2017. Text Only Entry (cmasec) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond
Thu 01/12 12:09 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re11 Answer to Complaint by Plaintiffs Power Places Tours, Inc., Fred Toby Weiss, Theresa Weiss. (Tracy-Ramirez, Alexandra) |
|
Friday, January 06, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order
Fri 01/06 8:37 AM
AMENDED ORDER Resetting Scheduling Conference for 2/14/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/6/17. (sgrim) |
|
Thursday, January 05, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 01/05 10:17 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service by International Mail by Clerk of Court re 15 Order on Motion to Reset to Free Spirit, 13 Freeland Park, Poole, BH16 8FA, UK. Text Only Entry. (jgonz, ) |
|
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion to Reset
Thu 01/05 10:03 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting13 Motion to Reset Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference set for January 10, 2017, is vacated, to be reset by separate order. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/5/17. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 ) |
|
14 | 14
order
Memorandum
Thu 01/05 7:06 AM
MEMORANDUM regarding13 First MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference and Planning Meeting filed by Theresa Weiss, Power Places Tours, Inc., Fred Toby Weiss. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/5/2017. Text Only Entry (cmasec) |
|
Wednesday, January 04, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Reset
Wed 01/04 4:09 PM
First MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference and Planning Meeting by Plaintiffs Power Places Tours, Inc., Fred Toby Weiss, Theresa Weiss. (Tracy-Ramirez, Alexandra) |
|
Wednesday, December 28, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Conventionally Submitted Material
Thu 12/29 9:31 AM
Conventionally Submitted Material : 1 CD to Answer to Complaint11 by Defendant Free Spirit Text Only Entry (athom, ) |
|
11 | 11
29
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 12/29 9:28 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Free Spirit. (athom, ) |
|
Tuesday, December 13, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
service
Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint
Tue 12/13 4:45 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Free Spirit served on 12/1/2016, answer due 12/22/2016. (Tracy-Ramirez, Alexandra) |
|
Tuesday, November 15, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order
Tue 11/15 8:32 AM
ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 1/10/2017 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/15/16. (sgrim) |
|
Monday, November 07, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order
Mon 11/07 1:04 PM
NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/7/2016. (vbarn) |
|
7 | 7
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Mon 11/07 12:51 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Magistrate Judge Tafoya is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). ALSO ORDERED that unless service has otherwise been completed or arranged, Plaintiffs' counsel is directed to effect service of the summons and complaint pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than December 7, 2016 in order for the initial scheduling conference to be held promptly. The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED BY Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/7/2016. Text Only Entry (vbarn) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Report re: Patent/Trademark
Mon 11/07 8:42 AM
Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (sphil, ) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Summons Issued
Mon 11/07 8:40 AM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (sphil, ) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form | ||
4 | 4
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Mon 11/07 8:27 AM
Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry (sphil, ) |
|
Friday, November 04, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
misc
Summons Request
Fri 11/04 5:34 PM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to Free Spirit re1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Power Places Tours, Inc., Fred Toby Weiss, Theresa Weiss. (Hopkins, Edward) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 11/04 5:20 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Hopkins, Edward) |
|
1 | 1
33
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 11/04 5:15 PM
COMPLAINT against Free Spirit (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-5233347)Attorney Edward Charles Hopkins, Jr added to party Power Places Tours, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Charles Hopkins, Jr added to party Fred Toby Weiss(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Charles Hopkins, Jr added to party Theresa Weiss(pty:pla), filed by Power Places Tours, Inc., Fred Toby Weiss, Theresa Weiss.(Hopkins, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet |