Williams v. Espinoza et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Vince Chhabria |
Referred: | Pslc Rmh |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-06439 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Nov 03, 2016 |
Terminated: | May 10, 2018 |
Defendant
B. Honey
|
|
Defendant
J. Aguar
|
|
Defendant
J. Bernhardt
|
|
Defendant
Jenny Espinoza
|
|
Defendant
Long
|
|
Defendant
M. Datu
|
|
Defendant
Magnolia
|
|
Defendant
Petra-Maria Ogwurumba
|
|
Plaintiff
Bobby Williams
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, September 27, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Payment Record Card
Thu 09/27 12:46 PM
PAYMENT RECORD CARD : payment of Filing Fee in the amount of $350.00 paid on 9/10/18. (cfkS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, May 10, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Thu 05/10 11:09 AM
Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting 26 Stipulation for Dismissal of Case With Prejudice.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2018) |
|
Thursday, May 03, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Thu 05/03 10:38 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re5 Amended Complaint Stipulation for Dismissal of Case with Prejudice; Order Dismissing Case with Prejudice filed by Jenny Espinoza. (Modlin, Craig) (Filed on 5/3/2018) |
|
Thursday, April 12, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
order
Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding
Thu 04/12 12:10 PM
Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding. Matter settled. Signed by Judge Robert M. Illman on 4/12/2018. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on April 12, 2018 a copy of this Order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2018) |
|
24 | 24
minutes
Settlement Conference
Thu 04/12 10:59 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman: Further Settlement Conference held on 4/12/2018. Matter settled in full. Terms of settlement placed on the record. FTR Time: 10:09-10:16. Plaintiff Attorney: Bobby Williams, Pro Se. Defendant Attorney: Craig Modlin. Attachment: Minutes. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 4/12/2018 a copy of this Order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/12/2018) |
|
Wednesday, April 11, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Wed 04/11 12:50 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Further Settlement Conference set for 4/12/2018 10:00 AM in McKinleyville. The parties will appear by phone. Notice and instruction provided to Plaintiff separately. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2018) Modified on 4/11/2018 (glm, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, April 03, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
minutes
Status Conference
Tue 04/03 2:46 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman: Status Conference held on 4/3/2018. Defense Counsel will contact the Plaintiff and report back to the court by 4/10/2018. Plaintiff Attorney: not present. Defendant Attorney: Craig Modelin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/3/2018) |
|
Thursday, March 22, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
minutes
Settlement Conference ~Util - Set Hearings
Thu 03/22 12:47 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman: Settlement Conference held on 3/22/2018 at San Quentin State Prison. Further Settlement Conference set for 4/3/2018 01:00 PM in McKinleyville. The parties may appear at the 4/3/2018 Settlement Conference by phone by dialing 888-684-8852/Access Code 1868782. FTR Time: not recorded. Plaintiff Attorney: Bobby Williams, Pro Se. Defendant Attorney: Craig Eugene Modlin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (glm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/22/2018) |
|
Thursday, March 15, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 03/19 9:38 AM
RESPONSE to 3/7/18 Telephonic Conference by Bobby Williams (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2018) |
|
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
2
pgs
order
Order Setting Settlement Conference
Thu 02/22 3:23 PM
Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Illman. Settlement Conference set for 3/22/2018 09:30 AM. at San Quentin State Prison. Signed by Judge Robert M. Illman on 2/22/2018.(rmilc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2018) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
9
pgs
order
Order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 01/31 8:50 AM
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; REFERRING CASE TO PRO SE PRISONER SETTLEMENT PROGRAM; STAYING CASE. Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Robert Illman for Settlement to occur within 90 days. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 1/31/2018. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 1/31/2018 a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2018) |
|
utility
Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Settlement
Wed 01/31 2:29 PM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman for Settlement (ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2018) |
||
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Reply to Opposition/Response
Mon 10/02 1:53 PM
REPLY filed byJenny Espinoza. (Modlin, Craig) (Filed on 10/2/2017) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
oth_sup
Declaration in Support
Thu 09/21 11:49 AM
Declaration of Bobby Williams filed byBobby Williams. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2017) |
|
15 | 15
respm
Opposition/Response to Motion
Thu 09/21 11:48 AM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE filed byBobby Williams. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2017) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Proposed Order
Mon 08/21 12:39 PM
Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motin for Summary Judgment by Jenny Espinoza. (Modlin, Craig) (Filed on 8/21/2017) |
|
13 | 13
oth_sup
Declaration in Support
Mon 08/21 12:37 PM
Declaration of Jenny Espinoza, M.D. in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed byJenny Espinoza. (Modlin, Craig) (Filed on 8/21/2017) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 08/21 12:05 PM
NOTICE by Jenny Espinoza in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment (Modlin, Craig) (Filed on 8/21/2017) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Summary Judgment PSP
Mon 08/21 11:56 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Points & Authorities filed by Jenny Espinoza. Responses due by 9/18/2017. Replies due by 10/2/2017. (Modlin, Craig) (Filed on 8/21/2017) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Tue 06/20 7:35 AM
Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion for Extension of Time.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Document PSP
Tue 06/06 4:18 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by Jenny Espinoza.(Modlin, Craig) (Filed on 6/6/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Craig Modlin in Support of Defendant's Motion to Extend Time, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Extend Time | ||
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 05/11 3:12 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint Demand for Jury Trial byJenny Espinoza. (Modlin, Craig) (Filed on 5/11/2017) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Request for Waiver of Service
Fri 04/21 9:02 AM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Bobby Williams on April 21, 2017 by Jenny Espinoza. Summons Waiver of Service due by 5/8/2017. (Modlin, Craig) (Filed on 4/21/2017) |
|
Wednesday, March 08, 2017 | ||
utility
Remark
Wed 03/08 1:04 PM
*** Copy of1 Complaint,5 Amended Complaint,6 Order, Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons and two Waiver of Service of Summons sent to Defendant and CA State Attorney General*** (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2017) |
||
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order
Tue 02/28 9:20 AM
ORDER SERVING COGNIZABLE CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 2/28/2017.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Thursday, December 22, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 12/23 9:01 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jenny Espinoza. Filed byBobby Williams.(msr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2016) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Tuesday, November 22, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order
Tue 11/22 9:42 AM
ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 11/22/2016.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2016) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
3 | 3
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 11/22 9:40 AM
Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2016) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Thursday, November 03, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis PSP
Fri 11/04 1:35 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Bobby Williams. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2016) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 11/04 1:34 PM
COMPLAINT against J. Aguar, J. Bernhardt, M. Datu, Jenny Espinoza, B. Honey, Long, Magnolia, Petra-Maria Ogwurumba. Filed byBobby Williams.(farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2016) |
|
Att: 1 part 2, | ||
Att: 2 part 3, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope |