Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:16-bk-23652

Pennsylvania Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Jeffery A Deller
Case #: 2:16-ap-02208
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
Case Filed:Nov 04, 2016
Terminated:Dec 21, 2016
Last checked: never
Defendant
Sterling Jewelers Inc dba Kay Jewelers
323 W. Lakeside Avenue Suite 200
Cleveland, OH 44113
Represented By
Sterling Jewelers Inc dba Kay Jewelers
contact info
Plaintiff
Tammy Nelson
621 Idlewood Ave
Carnegie, PA 15106
Represented By
Aurelius P. Robleto
Robleto Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Frederick H. Nelson
621 Idlewood Ave
Carnegie, PA 15106
Represented By
Aurelius P. Robleto
Robleto Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, December 21, 2016
9 9 court|utility Close Adversary Case|Disposition of Adversary Wed 11:10 AM
Disposition of Adversary, Adversary Case 2:16-ap-2208 Closed. 20 year disposition (amaz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2016
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 1:03 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 12/07/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] :7 Order -Non-motion related-
Monday, December 05, 2016
7 7 order Order -Non-motion related- Mon 2:21 PM
Order Signed on 12/5/2016. Related [+]. The secured claim of Sterling Jewelers, Inc. d/b/a Kay Jewelers (Sterling) shall be ALLOWED in the amount of $1,250.00 but Sterling shall not be entitled to any payment of interest upon its allowed secured claim. Sterling shall also have an allowed general unsecured claim in theamount of $1,251.57. (amaz)
Related: [-] :1 Complaint,6 Certification of Counsel Regarding
Wednesday, November 30, 2016
6 6 misc Certification of Counsel Regarding - PAWB Form 26 Wed 4:26 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Consent Order Resolving Adversary Proceeding Filed by Frederick H. Nelson, Tammy Nelson.(Robleto, Aurelius)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Consent Order
Att: 2 Black-Lined Version of Proposed Consent Order
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Monday, November 14, 2016
5 5 court Summons Issued Mon 12:16 PM
One Summons Issued on Sterling Jewelers Inc dba Kay Jewelers Date Issued 11/14/2016, Answer Due 12/14/2016. If an answer is not timely filed, Plaintiffs shall file a Motion For Default Judgment on or before 12/27/2016. cm: Aurelius P. Robleto, Esq (jfur)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 10, 2016
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 10:49 PM
Summons Service Executed on Sterling Jewelers Inc dba Kay Jewelers 11/10/2016 including Complaint 1 , Summons [2-2] and Amended Complaint 3 . (Robleto, Aurelius)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 10:06 PM
Amended Complaint filed by Frederick H. Nelson, Tammy Nelson against all defendants Related [+]. (Robleto, Aurelius)
Related: [-] :1 Complaint
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, November 07, 2016
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 12:54 PM
One Summons Issued on Sterling Jewelers Inc dba Kay Jewelers Date Issued 11/7/2016, Answer Due 12/7/2016. If an answer is not timely filed, Plaintiffs shall file a Motion For Default Judgment on or before 12/19/2016. cm: Aurelius P. Robleto, Esq. (jfur)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 04, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 7:52 PM
Adversary case 16-02208 Complaint by Tammy Nelson, Frederick H. Nelson against Sterling Jewelers Inc dba Kay Jewelers. Receipt Number NFR, Fee Amount $ 350. Nature of Suit: (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) (Robleto, Aurelius)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Order