Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Ed Kinkeade
Case #: 3:16-cv-03111
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Nov 07, 2016
Re-opened:Aug 14, 2018
Terminated:Sep 17, 2018
Last checked: Saturday May 06, 2017 3:57 AM CDT
Defendant
Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By
Daniel J Kramer
Paul Weiss Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Gregory F Laufer
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Ralph H Duggins
Cantey Hanger LLP
contact info
Jonathan Hurwitz
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Daniel Toal
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Nina Cortell
Haynes & Boone LLP
contact info
Theodore V. Wells
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Daniel Kramer
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Defendant
Andrew P. Swiger
Represented By
Daniel J Kramer
Paul Weiss Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Gregory F Laufer
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Ralph H Duggins
Cantey Hanger LLP
contact info
Jonathan Hurwitz
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Daniel Toal
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Nina Cortell
Haynes & Boone LLP
contact info
Theodore V. Wells
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Daniel Kramer
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Defendant
Rex W. Tillerson
Represented By
Daniel J Kramer
Paul Weiss Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Gregory F Laufer
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Ralph H Duggins
Cantey Hanger LLP
contact info
Jonathan Hurwitz
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Daniel Toal
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Nina Cortell
Haynes & Boone LLP
contact info
Theodore V. Wells
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Daniel Kramer
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jeffrey J. Woodbury
Represented By
Daniel J Kramer
Paul Weiss Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Gregory F Laufer
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Ralph H Duggins
Cantey Hanger LLP
contact info
Jonathan Hurwitz
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Daniel Toal
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Nina Cortell
Haynes & Boone LLP
contact info
Theodore V. Wells
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Daniel Kramer
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Greater Pennsylvania Carpenters Pension Fund
Represented By
Joe Kendall
Kendall Law Group LLP
contact info
Nathan R. Lindell
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
contact info
Tricia L McCormick
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
contact info
Balon B Bradley
Law Office Of Balon B Bradley
contact info
Plaintiff
Pedro Ramirez, Jr.
Represented By
Jeffrey S Abraham
Abraham Fruchter & Twersky LLP
contact info
Jamie Jean McKey
Kendall Law Group LLP
contact info
John C Herman
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
contact info
Joe Kendall
Kendall Law Group LLP
contact info
Nathan R. Lindell
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
contact info
Samuel H Rudman
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
contact info
Balon B Bradley
Law Office Of Balon B Bradley
contact info
Patrick Coughlin
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
contact info
Mary K Blasy
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
contact info

GPO Aug 14 2018
to the Section 10(b) and Rule 10b-5 securities claim, but the Section 20(a) control person liability claim remains. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/14/2018) (zkc)MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 48 MOTION to Strike; denying 46 Motion to Dismiss as to Defendants ExxonMobil, Tillerson, Swiger, and Rosenthal; granting 46 Motion to Dismiss regarding Defendant Woodbury as

Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, May 16, 2019
116 116 sealex Sealed and/or Ex Parte Response/Objection Fri 9:03 AM
(Document Restricted) Sealed Corrected Memorandum of Law in Opposition re:86 Motion to Certify Class filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation, David S Rosenthal, Andrew P Swiger, Rex W Tillerson, Jeffrey J Woodbury. (zkc)
Related: [-]
115 115 respm Response/Objection Fri 8:57 AM
CORRECTED MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation, David S Rosenthal, Andrew P Swiger, Rex W Tillerson, Jeffrey J Woodbury re:86 MOTION for Class Certification. (zkc)
Related: [-]
114 114 order Order on Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion Thu 4:37 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion to File Under Seal Their Motion for Leave to File a Corrected Opposition to Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification113 . (Clerk to enter the sealed and/or ex parte document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 5/16/2019) (chmb)
Related: [-]
113 113 motion Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion Thu 4:30 PM
(Document Restricted) Defendants' Unopposed Motion to File Under Seal Their Motion for Leave to File a Corrected Opposition to Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification (Sealed pursuant to motion to seal) filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation, David S Rosenthal, Andrew P Swiger, Rex W Tillerson, Jeffrey J Woodbury (Kramer, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A & B,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
112 112 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Thu 4:29 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting111 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Opposition to Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 5/16/2019) (chmb)
Related: [-]
111 111 motion Leave to File Thu 4:26 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Opposition to Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation, David S Rosenthal, Andrew P Swiger, Rex W Tillerson, Jeffrey J Woodbury (Kramer, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A & B,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 14, 2019
110 110 respm Reply Tue 3:38 PM
REPLY filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation, David S Rosenthal, Andrew P Swiger, Rex W Tillerson, Jeffrey J Woodbury re:100 MOTION for Hearing re86 MOTION to Certify Class Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification / Defendants' Request for Evidentiary Hearing on Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification (Kramer, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2019
109 109 sealex Sealed and/or Ex Parte Reply/Sur-reply Thu 10:19 AM
(Document Restricted) Sealed Reply in Further Support of:86 Motion to Certify Class, filed by Greater Pennsylvania Carpenters Pension Fund. (zkc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 7 to Appendix in Support of Reply in Further Support of Motion
108 108 order Order on Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion Thu 10:05 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting Lead Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to File Under Seal Its Concurrently Filed Reply in Further Support of Its Motion for Class Certification107 . (Clerk to enter the sealed and/or ex parte document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 5/9/2019) (chmb)
Related: [-]