Badger Diesel LLC v. Dedolph et al
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Nancy Joseph |
Case #: | 2:13-cv-01282 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Nov 13, 2013 |
Terminated: | Jan 31, 2014 |
Last checked: Friday Jan 23, 2015 3:57 AM CST |
Defendant
Joan Dedolph
1510 Honeysuckle Lane
Janesville, WI 53546 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ryan M Dedolph
1510 Honeysuckle Lane
Janesville, WI 53546 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Badger Diesel LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/14/2013 4:24 AM CST |
Wednesday, November 13, 2013 | ||
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our web site ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl) | ||
Summons Issued as to JOAN DEDOLPH, RYAN M DEDOLPH. (djd) | ||
NOTICE of Electronic Filing Modifications as to:1 Complaint - the docket entry contains duplicate text. Also, all party names were entered with capital letters. It is not necessary to capitalize all letters. These documents do not need to be re-filed. Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (djd) | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT (verified) by Badger Diesel LLC against Dedolph, Ryan and Joan dba Badger Diesel Performance with Jury Demand; against BADGER DIESEL LLC by BADGER DIESEL LLC. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-1789462)(Jansson, Eric) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A-W, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Ryan M. Dedolph, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Joan Dedolph, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by BADGER DIESEL LLC. (Jansson, Eric) | |
3 | 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric VC Jansson on behalf of BADGER DIESEL LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Eric V.C. Jansson, Peter N. Jansson, Molly H. McKinley (Jansson, Eric) | |
4 | 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction against defendants, Ryan M. Dedolph and Joan Dedolph d/b/a Badger Diesel Performance by BADGER DIESEL LLC.(Jansson, Eric) | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
5 | 5 BRIEF in Support filed by BADGER DIESEL LLC re4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction against defendants, Ryan M. Dedolph and Joan Dedolph d/b/a Badger Diesel Performance . (Jansson, Eric) | |
6 | 6 Proposed Findings of Fact by BADGER DIESEL LLC (Jansson, Eric) |