Everett v. Jetro Holdings, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:14-bk-44505
Lead BK case is: 4:14-bk-44505
California Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Roger L Efremsky |
Case #: | 4:16-ap-04200 |
Nature of Suit | 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 10, 2016 |
Terminated: | May 10, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Jetro Holdings, LLC
1265 N. Kraemer Blvd.
Anaheim, CA 92806 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kyle Everett
400 Montgomery St. Suite 1000
San Francisco, CA 94104 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, May 10, 2018 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 05/10 9:14 AM
Adversary Case Closed 4:16-ap-4200. (rdr) |
||
Wednesday, April 25, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
order
Stipulation
Wed 04/25 11:28 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding . (mab) |
|
Tuesday, April 24, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
stip
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tue 04/24 5:26 PM
Stipulation to Dismiss Filed by Plaintiff Kyle Everett . Case Management Action due after 05/8/2018. (Rougeau, Gregory) |
|
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
audio
audio
Tue 04/10 8:55 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 4/10/2018 1:42:34 PM ]. File Size [ 1024 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:04:16 ]. (admin) |
|
33 | 33
audio
audio
Tue 04/10 8:55 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 4/10/2018 1:34:53 PM ]. File Size [ 524 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:02:11 ]. (admin) |
|
court
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled
Tue 04/10 2:12 PM
Courtroom Hearing held before Judge Roger L. Efremsky on 04/10/2018 01:30 pm re: Further Status Conference. Minutes: Parties to file stipulation and order to dismiss. If not filed, both parties are required to appear at the continued hearing date. The hearing is continued to 05/15/2018 at 01:30 PM at Oakland Room 201 - Efremsky. Appearance(s): Gregory Rougeau and L. Scott Keehn present. (mab) |
||
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
3
pgs
order
Order
Fri 03/30 10:11 AM
Order Granting Chapter 7 Trustee's Request for Entry of Order by Default Authorizing Compromise of Controversy Between Debtor and Jetro Holdings, LLC Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 . (ds) |
|
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 03/26 8:12 PM
Certificate of Service . Filed by Plaintiff Kyle Everett (Rougeau, Gregory) |
|
30 | 30
misc
Request For Entry of Default Judgment
Mon 03/26 8:04 PM
Request for Entry of Default Judgment: Re Notice Of Intent To Compromise Controversy . Filed by Plaintiff Kyle Everett (Rougeau, Gregory) |
|
Wednesday, March 21, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
3
pgs
order
Order Granting Related Motion/Application
Wed 03/21 12:38 PM
Order Granting Ex Parte Application To Set Aside Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding for Lack of Prosecution . Status Conference scheduled for 4/10/2018 at 01:30 PM at Oakland Room 201 - Efremsky. (mab) |
|
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Declaration
Tue 03/20 1:56 PM
Declaration of Gregory A. Rougeau in Support of . Filed by Plaintiff Kyle Everett (Rougeau, Gregory) |
|
27 | 27
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 03/20 1:55 PM
Ex Parte Motion To Set Aside Dismissal Order Filed by Plaintiff Kyle Everett. (Rougeau, Gregory) |
|
26 | 26
stip
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 03/20 1:52 PM
Stipulation, To Set Aside Dismissal Order Filed by Plaintiff Kyle Everett . (Rougeau, Gregory) |
|
25 | 25
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 03/20 1:49 PM
Certificate of Service . Filed by Plaintiff Kyle Everett (Rougeau, Gregory) |
|
Tuesday, March 13, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
order
Dismiss Case
Wed 03/14 2:45 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding For Lack of Prosecution . Case Management Action due after 3/27/2018. (mab) |
|
23 | 23
audio
audio
Tue 03/13 8:55 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 3/13/2018 1:44:37 PM ]. File Size [ 212 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:53 ]. (admin) |
|
court
Hearing Held (Adv)
Wed 03/14 9:49 AM
Courtroom Hearing held before Judge Roger L. Efremsky on 03/13/2018 01:30 pm re: Status Conference. Minutes: Case dismissed with prejudice for lack of prosecution. Court to issue order. Appearances: None. (mab) |
||
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
audio
audio
Tue 01/09 8:55 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 1/9/2018 1:40:35 PM ]. File Size [ 156 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:39 ]. (admin) |
|
court
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled
Tue 01/09 2:03 PM
Courtroom Hearing held before Judge Roger L. Efremsky on 1/9/2018 re: Status Conference. Minutes: The hearing is continued to 03/13/2018 at 01:30 PM at Oakland Room 201 - Efremsky. Appearance(s): Gregory Rougeau and Scott Keehn present.(mab) |
||
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice
Mon 01/08 10:57 PM
Notice Regarding Chapter 7 Trustee's Intention To Compromise Controversy Filed by Plaintiff Kyle Everett. (Rougeau, Gregory) |
|
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
court
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled
Wed 10/25 2:34 PM
Courtroom Hearing for proceedings held before Judge Roger L. Efremsky on 10/25/2017 re: Status Conference. Minutes : Further Status Conference is continued to 01/09/2018 at 01:30 PM at Oakland Room 201 - Efremsky . Appearance(s): Gregory Rougeau and Claude Ames present. (mab ) |
||
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
audio
audio
Tue 09/12 8:55 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 9/12/2017 1:31:39 PM ]. File Size [ 96 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:24 ]. (admin) |
|
court
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled
Tue 09/12 1:47 PM
Courtroom Hearing for proceedings held before Judge Roger L. Efremsky on 9/12/2017 re: Status. Minutes : The hearing is continued to 10/25/2017 at 02:00 PM at Oakland Room 201 - Efremsky. Appearance(s): None. (mab ) |
||
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Reply
Fri 07/28 2:06 PM
Reply Answer to Complaint to Avoid Unauthorized Postpetition Transfers . Filed by Defendant Jetro Holdings, LLC (Keehn, L.) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 07/21 6:57 PM
Certificate of Service . Filed by Plaintiff Kyle Everett (Rougeau, Gregory) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Declaration
Thu 07/20 6:50 AM
Declaration of Gregory A. Rougeau in Support of . Filed by Plaintiff Kyle Everett (Rougeau, Gregory) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Entry of Default
Thu 07/20 6:49 AM
Motion for Entry of Default Filed by Plaintiff Kyle Everett . (Rougeau, Gregory) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order Granting Related Motion/Application
Wed 07/19 7:28 AM
Order Granting Ex Parte Application To Set Aside Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding For Lack of Prosecution . Status Conference scheduled for 9/12/2017 at 01:30 PM at Oakland Room 201 - Efremsky. (mab) |
|
Saturday, July 15, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Declaration
Sat 07/15 9:21 PM
Declaration of Gregory A. Rougeau in Support of . Filed by Plaintiff Kyle Everett (Rougeau, Gregory) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Reopen Adversary Proceeding
Sat 07/15 9:19 PM
Motion to Reopen Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Kyle Everett. (Rougeau, Gregory) DEFECTIVE ENTRY: Incorrect event code selected. Modified on 7/17/2017 (lb) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order
Thu 07/13 9:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order . Notice Date 07/13/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 07/12 7:47 AM
Adversary Case Closed 4:16-ap-4200. (tw) |
||
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Dismiss Case
Tue 07/11 3:17 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding For Lack of Prosecution . (mab) |
|
10 | 10
audio
audio
Tue 07/11 1:44 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 7/11/2017 1:35:25 PM ]. File Size [ 158 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:39 ]. (admin) |
|
court
Hearing Held (Adv)
Tue 07/11 2:04 PM
Courtroom Hearing (Text only) for proceeding held before Judge Roger L. Efremsky on 7/11/2017 re: Status Conference. Minutes : The case is Dismissed for lack of prosecution. The court will issue order. Appearance(s) |
||
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
audio
audio
Tue 05/09 8:55 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 5/9/2017 1:31:09 PM ]. File Size [ 424 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:46 ]. (admin) |
|
court
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled
Tue 05/09 3:05 PM
Courtroom Hearing (Text only) for proceeding held before Judge Roger L. Efremsky on 5/9/2017 re: Status Conference. MINUTES : The hearing is continued to 07/11/2017 at 01:30 PM at Oakland Room 201 - Efremsky. Default and Judgment must be entered prior to this date. Appearance(s): Gregory Rougeau present. (mab) |
||
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Other Interested Parties
Thu 03/30 9:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Other Interested Parties . Notice Date 03/30/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
court
Hearing Set
Tue 03/28 2:46 PM
NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING re: Status Conference. Due to the Court's unavailability, please take notice that the hearing currently scheduled for 4/4/2017 is vacated. The hearing is rescheduled for 5/9/2017 at 01:30 PM at Oakland Room 201 - Efremsky. (mab) |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
audio
audio
Tue 02/07 8:55 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 2/7/2017 1:34:29 PM ]. File Size [ 300 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:15 ]. ( ). (admin) |
|
court
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled
Tue 02/07 2:05 PM
Courtroom Hearing MINUTES (Text only) for proceedings held before Judge Roger L. Efremsky on 2/7/2017 re: Status Conference. The hearing is continued to 04/04/2017 at 01:30 PM at Oakland Room 201 - Efremsky. Appearance(s): Kenneth Brunette present. (mab) |
||
Tuesday, November 22, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 11/22 9:09 PM
Certificate of Service . Filed by Plaintiff Kyle Everett (Rougeau, Gregory) |
|
Wednesday, November 16, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Wed 11/16 9:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing . Notice Date 11/16/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, November 14, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
order
Discovery
Mon 11/14 11:26 AM
Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference. (acb) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Mon 11/14 11:25 AM
Summons Issued on Jetro Holdings, LLC Answer Due 12/14/2016 . Status Conference scheduled for 2/7/2017 at 01:30 PM at Oakland Room 201 - Efremsky. (acb) |
|
Thursday, November 10, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 11/10 9:23 PM
Adversary case[LINK 16-04200 . 14 Complaint by Kyle Everett against Jetro Holdings, LLC. Fee Amount $350. (Rougeau, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 AP Cover Sheet |