|
GPO
Dec 21 2016
STIPULATION AND ORDER as to Sushovan Hussain 12. Signed by Judge Hon. Charles R. Breyer on 12/21/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2016)
|
|
GPO
Dec 21 2016
STIPULATION AND ORDER as to Sushovan Hussain. Signed by Judge Hon. Charles R. Breyer on 12/21/16. (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2016)
|
|
GPO
Jan 13 2017
STIPULATION AND ORDER as to Sushovan Hussain. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/13/17. (ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2017)
|
|
GPO
Oct 10 2017
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 110 Motion to Quash as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (1) Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/10/2017. (crblc2, COURT STAFF)
|
|
GPO
Oct 27 2017
ORDER denying 113 Motion to Dismiss as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/27/2017. (crblc2S, COURT STAFF)
|
|
GPO
Feb 09 2018
ORDER as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain GRANTING Defendant's Motion in Limine #6 [dkt. 151]. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/9/2018. (crblc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2018)
|
|
GPO
Feb 28 2018
ORDER DENYING HP'S EX PARTE MOTION TO WITHHOLD ATTORNEY INTERVIEW NOTES. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/28/2018. (crblc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2018)
|
|
GPO
Jul 30 2018
REDACTED ORDER denying 354 408 Motions for Acquittal; 409 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/30/2018. (crblc2S, COURT STAFF)
|
|
GPO
Mar 26 2019
AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain: Opposition due by 3/26/2019. Replies due by 3/27/2019. Motion Hearing set for 4/3/2019 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/26/2019. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2019)
|
|
GPO
Apr 11 2019
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF SENTENCING GUIDELINES as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on April 11, 2019. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
|
|
GPO
May 06 2019
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF SENTENCING GUIDELINES as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on May 6, 2019. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
|
|
GPO
May 14 2019
JUDGMENT in a Criminal Case as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/14/2019. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
|
|
GPO
Jul 02 2019
BOND ORDER as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on July 2, 2019. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
|
|
GPO
Jul 02 2019
ORDER CORRECTED BOND ORDER; Granting 583 Motion to Amend/Correct as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (1) Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on July 2, 2019. (crblc2, COURT STAFF)
|
|
GPO
Oct 06 2020
ORDER denying 624 Motion to Reduce Sentence as to Sushovan Tareque Hussain (1) Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/6/2020. (crblc2, COURT STAFF)
|