HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS INC. v. GLAZER et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Peter G Sheridan |
Referred: | Tonianne J Bongiovanni |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-08483 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 10, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jul 24, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday May 09, 2017 5:06 AM EDT |
Defendant
JEFFREY A. GLAZER
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JASON T. MALEK
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States
U.S. Department of Justice, Antitrust Division 450 5th Street NW Suite 11300
Washington, DC 20530 |
|
Intervenor
United States
U.S. Department of Justice, Antitrust Division 450 5th Street NW Suite 11300
Washington, DC 20530 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
HERITAGE PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Mar 01 2019
MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 3/1/2019. (km) |
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |