NY & Park, LLC
Hawaii Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Robert J Faris |
Case #: | 1:16-bk-01210 |
Case Filed: | Nov 14, 2016 |
Creditor Meeting: | Dec 21, 2016 |
Dismissed: | Nov 30, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jan 23, 2017 |
Debtor
NY & Park, LLC
2450 Koa Ave Apt 103
Honolulu, HI 96815-3214 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Richard A. Yanagi
1001 Bishop St., Ste. 2755
Honolulu, HI 96813 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee.
1132 Bishop Street, Suite 602
Honolulu, HI 96813 |
Docket last updated: 11/15/2016 12:01 AM HST |