Frank E. Vennes, Jr. v. Gary Hansen
Original Case: 0:08-cv-05348
Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:16-pr-04196 |
Type | prisoner / federal / other |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Case Filed: | Nov 15, 2016 |
Terminated: | Mar 08, 2017 |
Last checked: Thursday Mar 09, 2017 2:31 AM CST |
Defendant
Thomas Joseph Petters, doing business as Petters Company, Inc., also known as PCI, doing business as Petters Group Worldwide, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Deanna Coleman, also known as Deanna Munson
|
|
Defendant
Robert White
|
|
Defendant
James Wehmhoff
|
|
Defendant
Larry Reynolds, doing business as Nationwide International Resources, also known as NIR
|
|
Defendant
Michael Catain, doing business as Enchanted Family Buying Company
|
|
Defendant - Appellant
Frank E. Vennes, Jr., doing business as Metro Gem Finance, doing business as Metro Gem Inc., doing business as Grace Offerings of Florida LLC, doing business as Metro Property Financing, LLC, doing business as 38 E. Robinson, LLC, doing business as 55 E. P
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Frank Elroy Vennes, Jr., doing business as Metro Gem Finance, doing business as Metro Gem Inc., doing business as Grace Offerings of Florida LLC, doing business as Metro Property Financing, LLC, doing business as 38 E. Robinson, LLC, doing business as 55 E
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
United States of America
|
|
Receiver
Douglas Arthur Kelley
|
|
Trustee - Appellee
Gary Hansen
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/09/2017 2:31 AM CST |
Tuesday, November 15, 2016 | ||
Prisoner case docketed. [4469491] 16-4196 (JMM) | ||
Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, orders filed 08/03/16 and 09/15/16 and docket entries. [4469517] 16-4196 (JMM) | ||
Originating court document filed consisting of originating court order of 11/04/2016 denying IFP on appeal, [4469519] 16-4196 (JMM) | ||
CLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4469521] 16-4196 (JMM) | ||
CLERK ORDER:The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 12/13/2016, this appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. [4469525] 16-4196 (JMM) | ||
Prisoner case docketed. [4469491] 16-4196 (JMM) | ||
Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, orders filed 08/03/16 and 09/15/16 and docket entries. [4469517] 16-4196 (JMM) | ||
Originating court document filed consisting of originating court order of 11/04/2016 denying IFP on appeal, [4469519] 16-4196 (JMM) | ||
CLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [4469521] 16-4196 (JMM) | ||
CLERK ORDER:The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 12/13/2016, this appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. [4469525] 16-4196 (JMM) |