DACCO Transmission Parts (NY), Inc.
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Mary Kay Vyskocil |
Case #: | 1:16-bk-13245 |
Case Filed: | Nov 20, 2016 |
Terminated: | Feb 05, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
DACCO Transmission Parts (NY), Inc.
7350 Young Drive
Walton Hills, OH 44146 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 1:01 PM EST |
Attorney
Jenner & Block LLP
|
|
Attorney
Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP
787 Seventh Avenue
New York, NY 10019 |
Represented By
|
Attorney
Jones Day
|
Represented By
|
Attorney
Aaron M Krieger
Chapman and Cutler LLP 111 Monroe Street
Chicago, IL 60603 |
|
Claims and Noticing Agent
Prime Clerk LLC Claims Agent
830 3rd Avenue, 9th Floor www.primeclerk.com
New York, NY 10022 |
|
Cred. Comm. Chair
SPCP Group, LLC
1270 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation
Office of the Chief Counsel 1200 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Tannor Partners Credit Fund LP
555 Theodore Fremd Avenue Suite C-209
Rye, NY 10580 |
|
Creditor
Leaf Capital Funding, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
TN Dept of Revenue
Bankruptcy Division PO Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Lucky Lift Truck, LLC
1010 Fox Glen
Gallatin, TN 37066 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Massachusetts Department of Revenue
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Michigan Unemployment Insurance Agency
3030 W. Grand Blvd., Ste. 9-600
Detroit, MI 48202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Missouri Department of Revenue
Bankruptcy Unit PO Box 475 301 W High St.
Jefferson City, MO 65105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
New Mountain Capital Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
TCF Equipment Finance, a Division of TCF National Bank
2118 East Big Beaver Road Suite B
Troy, MI 48083 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc.
Buchalter PC Shawn M. Christianson 55 2nd St., 17th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Iron Mountain Information Management, LLC
One Federal Street
Boston, MA 02110 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Precision International Automotive Products, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Susquehanna Commercial Finance, Inc.
2 Great Valley Parkway Suite 300
Malvern, PA 19355 |
|
Creditor
Stellar Skrg Acquisition LLC
4939 Panther Parkway Lot 1067
Seville, OH 44273 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Racing Power Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Rolling Hills Properties LLC
Attn: Adam L. Rosen 489 Fifth Avenue, 21st Floor
New York, NY 10017 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Royal Bank of Canada as Administrative Agent and Collateral Agent under the Amended and Restated First Lien Credit Agreement
|
|
Creditor
Silver Point Capital, L.P.
1270 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Silver Point Finance, LLC
1270 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Sonar Credit Partners III, LLC
80 Business Park Drive Suite 208
Armonk, NY 10504 |
|
Creditor
United States of America, on behalf of the United States Postal Service
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Zimmerman Properties, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
ATC Drivetrain, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
American Properties Company, GP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
BorgWarner Transmission Systems, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Brazoria County Tax Office
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
CRG Financial LLC
100 Union Avenue
Cresskill, NJ 07626 |
|
Creditor
CRP-2 Mid-South Industrial, LLC
The Sader Law Firm 2345 Grand Blvd., Suite 2150
Kansas City, MO 64108 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Clear Rate Communications, Inc.
555 S. Old Woodward, Suite 600
Birmingham, MI 48009 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cortland Capital Markets Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dallas County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Elizabeth Weller 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Alleid Industrial and Service Workers, International Union (USW), AFL-CIO
Five Gateway Center Suite 807
Pittsburgh, PA 15222 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Federal Business Centers, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Filtration Group
811 Barton Springs Road Suite 811
Austin, TX 78704 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ford Component Sales, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Freudenberg-NOK General Partnership
47774 West Anchor Court
Plymouth, MI 48170 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
United Parcel Service, Inc.
Bialson, Bergen & Schwab 633 Menlo Ave. Suite 100
Menlo Park, CA 94025 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
General Motors LLC
2290 First National Bldg. 660 Woodward Avenue
Detroit, MI 48226 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Harris County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
c/o Kay D. Brock Travis County
P.O. Box 1748
Austin, TX 78767 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America (UAW)
8000 E. Jefferson Avenue
Detroit, MI 48214 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Sherwin-Williams Company
|
|
Examiner
Richard Levin
|
Represented By
|
Financial Advisor
FTI Consulting, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Octagon Credit Investors, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
KeyBank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Invesco Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Friedman Fleischer & Lowe, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP
|
|
Other Prof.
Hilco Real Estate, LLC
|
|
Other Prof.
Ducera Partners LLC
|
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Represented By
|
Unknown
Prime Clerk LLC Claims Agent
830 3rd Avenue, 9th Floor www.primeclerk.com
New York, NY 10022 |
Represented By
|
Unknown
Jenner & Block LLP
|
Represented By
|
1. | Auto Part Maker Transtar Files for Chapter 11 Bankruptcy (wsj.com) |
Submitted Mon 11/21/2016 | |
Docket last updated: 55 minutes ago |
Tuesday, February 26, 2019 | ||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Tue 02/26 9:05 AM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission([LINK 16-13245 mkv] ) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number EIE. Fee amount 200.00. (Richards) |
||
Monday, February 25, 2019 | ||
645 | 645
motion
Application, Pro Hac Vice Admission
Mon 02/25 3:42 PM
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion for Admission to Practice filed by Cydney Warburton on behalf of Pebblebrook Hotel Lessee LLC d/b/a Sofitel Philadelphia. (Warburton, Cydney) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |