J&J Sports Productions Inc. v. Exclusive Lounge & Grill Inc et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Allyne R Ross |
Referred: | Ramon E Reyes, Jr |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-06458 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 47:605 Unauthorized publication or use of communications |
Case Filed: | Nov 21, 2016 |
Terminated: | May 22, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday May 20, 2017 6:18 AM EDT |
Defendant
Jennifer Crayton
|
|
Defendant
Exclusive Lounge & Grill Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
J&J Sports Productions Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 05/22 4:47 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, by the undersigned, the attorney for plaintiff in the above entitled action, that whereas no party hereto is an infant, incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed or conservatee and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the action, the above entitled action be, and the same hereby is discontinued, without prejudice and without costs to either party. So Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 5/19/2017. (Almonte, Giselle) |
|
Wednesday, March 01, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation
Wed 03/01 4:56 PM
STIPULATION re4 Summons Issued,1 Complaint, Stipulation Discontinuing Action by J&J Sports Productions Inc. (Hooten, Paul) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Unexecuted
Wed 03/01 4:36 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by J&J Sports Productions Inc. as to Jennifer Crayton. (Hooten, Paul) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Unexecuted
Wed 03/01 4:35 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by J&J Sports Productions Inc. as to Exclusive Lounge & Grill Inc. (Hooten, Paul) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
order
Order(Other) ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 02/27 9:45 AM
ORDER: A review of the docket entries in this action indicates that there has been no activity in this case since the Summons was issued on ECF (11/23/2016). No later than March 3, 2017 one of the following events must occur: (a) the parties must file a stipulation extending the defendants time to answer, (b) the plaintiff must file a motion for the entry of a notation of default or (c) the defendant must file an answer. If, none of the preceding events occurs by the deadlines set forth above, I will deem the plaintiff to have abandoned the case and will promptly file a Report and Recommendation urging the assigned District Judge to dismiss the case for failure to prosecute. The plaintiffs counsel is directed to provide a copy of this order to his client and to the defendant. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 2/27/2017. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Wednesday, November 23, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 11/23 10:46 AM
Summons Issued as to Jennifer Crayton, Exclusive Lounge & Grill Inc. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Wed 11/23 10:45 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Wed 11/23 10:44 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 11/23 10:44 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) |
||
Monday, November 21, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 11/21 2:31 PM
COMPLAINT against Jennifer Crayton, Exclusive Lounge & Grill Inc filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9082103 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by J&J Sports Productions Inc.. (Hooten, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |