Taylor v. Horace Greely High School et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Nelson Stephen Roman |
Case #: | 7:16-cv-09045 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race) |
Case Filed: | Nov 21, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jan 05, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday May 20, 2017 5:47 AM EDT |
Defendant
Chappaqua Central School District
66 Roaring Brook Road
Chappaqua, NY 10514 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lyn McKay
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert Rhodes
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Daniel McCann
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Taylor
Zdanis Law Firm 55 Old Turnpike Road, Suite 304 Nanuet
Nanuet, NY 10954 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Horace Greely High School
Terminated: 03/03/2017
70 Roaring Brook Rd.
Chappaqua, NY 10514 |
Represented By
|
1. | Greeley Assistant Principal Files Racial Discrimination Lawsuit Against Chappaqua Central School District (chappaqua.dailyvoice.com) |
Submitted Mon 12/05/2016 | |
Docket last updated: 03/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
48 | 48
order
Stipulation and Order of Dismissal
Fri 01/05 5:29 PM
STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the attorneys of record for all parties in the above entitled action, that whereas no party hereto is an infant, incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed or conservatee and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the action, the above entitled action be, and the same is hereby discontinued against the Defendants with prejudice, without costs or fees to either party. The Stipulation may be filed without notice with the Clerk of the Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 1/5/2018) (ras) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
44 | 44
misc
Letter
Tue 06/20 6:53 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Lewis R. Silverman dated June 20, 2017 re: Opposition To Plaintiffs Faxed Request to File Sur Reply. Document filed by Chappaqua Central School District, Horace Greely High School, Daniel McCann, Lyn McKay, Robert Rhodes.(Silverman, Lewis) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Fri 04/28 5:56 PM
ORDER granting31 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The application is granted. Defendants and plaintiff's counsel are both granted leave to file Memorandums of up to 30 pages in length. Clerk of the Court requested to terminate the motion (doc. 31). (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 4/28/2017) (anc) |
|
31 | 31
motion
File Excess Pages
Fri 04/28 11:54 AM
LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Lewis R. Silverman dated April 28, 2017. Document filed by Chappaqua Central School District, Horace Greely High School, Daniel McCann, Lyn McKay, Robert Rhodes.(Silverman, Lewis) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
order
Memo Endorsement 1 - Terminate Hearings
Thu 04/13 4:43 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:29 Letter re: Withdrawing Request For Pre-Motion Conference filed by Horace Greely High School, Daniel McCann, Lyn McKay, Chappaqua Central School District, Robert Rhodes. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants' Feb. 17, 2017 letter application is deemed withdrawn without prejudice and the Pre-motion Conf. scheduled for April 21, 2017 is cancelled. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 4/13/2017) (mml) |
|
29 | 29
misc
Letter
Thu 04/13 12:18 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Lewis R. Silverman dated April 13, 2017 re: Withdrawing Request For Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Chappaqua Central School District, Horace Greely High School, Daniel McCann, Lyn McKay, Robert Rhodes.(Silverman, Lewis) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 04/07 9:09 AM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending21 Amended Complaint,2 Complaint against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Michael Taylor. Related document:21 Amended Complaint, filed by Michael Taylor,2 Complaint filed by Michael Taylor.(Zdanis, Karen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A | ||
adr
Mediator Session Held
Fri 04/07 4:16 PM
Mediator Session Held on 4/6/2017 at White Plains Courthouse.(mf) |
||
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
order
Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Set Hearings
Fri 03/31 8:39 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:26 Letter regarding Defendants' pre-motion letter filed by Michael Taylor. ENDORSEMENT: The Pre-Motion Conference is adjourned from April 7, 2017 until April 21, 2017 at 2:30 pm. Plaintiffs' written response is also adjourned from April 4, 2017 until April 18, 2017. ( Responses due by 4/18/2017, Pre-Motion Conference set for 4/21/2017 at 02:30 PM before Judge Nelson Stephen Roman.) (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 3/30/2017) (rj) |
|
26 | 26
misc
Letter
Thu 03/30 4:09 PM
FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Karen Zdanis, Esq. dated 03/30/2017 re: Defendants' pre-motion letter. Document filed by Michael Taylor.(Zdanis, Karen) |
|
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion for Conference
Thu 03/30 12:49 PM
ORDER granting20 Letter Motion for Conference re:20 LETTER MOTION for Conference Pre-Motion Conference for Discovery Dispute addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Lewis R. Silverman dated February 17, 2017. Pre-Motion/Discovery Dispute Conference set for 4/7/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. ENDORSEMENT: In person Pre Motion /Discovery Dispute Conference scheduled for April 7, 2017 at 10:00 am. Plaintiff's written response due April 4, 2017. Clerk of the Court requested to terminate the motion (Doc. 20). (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 3/20/2017) (rj) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 03/30 12:50 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 4/4/2017 (rj) |
||
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines
Thu 03/30 10:26 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:23 Letter regarding Extension of Motion To Dismiss Deadlines, filed by Horace Greely High School, Daniel McCann, Lyn McKay, Chappaqua Central School District, Robert Rhodes. ENDORSEMENT Plaintiff granted leave to file a Second Amended Complaint by April 7, 2017. Briefing schedule is extended as set forth alone. ( Amended Pleadings due by 4/7/2017.) (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 3/29/2017) (rj) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Letter
Tue 03/28 8:52 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Lewis R. Silverman dated March 28, 2017 re: Extension of Motion To Dismiss Deadlines. Document filed by Chappaqua Central School District, Horace Greely High School, Daniel McCann, Lyn McKay, Robert Rhodes.(Silverman, Lewis) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Letter
Fri 03/17 5:24 PM
FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Karen Zdanis, Esq. dated 03/17/2017 re: Motion to Amend. Document filed by Michael Taylor.(Zdanis, Karen) |
|
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
adr
Mediator Session Scheduled
Mon 03/06 4:39 PM
MEDIATOR SESSION SCHEDULED First Mediation Session scheduled for 4/6/2017, 10:00 AM at the U.S. Courthouse located at 300 Quarropas Street White Plains, NY 10601.(cda) |
||
Friday, March 03, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 03/03 3:49 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending2 Complaint against Chappaqua Central School District, Lyn McKay, Robert Rhodes, Daniel McCann with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Michael Taylor. Related document:2 Complaint filed by Michael Taylor.(Zdanis, Karen) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Conference
Fri 02/17 1:41 PM
LETTER MOTION for Conference Pre-Motion Conference for Discovery Dispute addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Lewis R. Silverman dated February 17, 2017. Document filed by Chappaqua Central School District, Horace Greely High School, Lyn McKay, Robert Rhodes.(Silverman, Lewis) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
adr
Notice of Mediator Assignment
Fri 02/10 11:02 AM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 3/13/2017.(cda) |
||
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Mediation Referral Order
Fri 02/03 4:41 PM
MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER...the above-entitled action is eligible for mediation, pursuant to the Civil Justice Expense and Delay Reduction Plan. This action is eligible for mediation subject to the limitations and restrictions as noted: ALL ISSUES ARE ELIGIBLE. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 2/13/2017. Mediator Expertise Request due by 2/8/2017. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 2/3/2017) (mml) |
|
minutes
Pre-Motion Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 02/03 5:03 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nelson Stephen Roman: Pre-Motion Conference held on 2/3/2017. Plaintiffs and Defendants counsel present. Court Reporter is Sue Ghorayeb. Plaintiff granted leave to file an amended complaint by March 6, 2016. Defendants granted leave to file motion to dismiss with following briefing schedule: moving papers to be served April 6, 2017; opposition to be served May 8, 2017; and reply to be served June 1, 2017. The parties are directed to file all motion documents on the reply date, June 1, 2017, and to provide 2 copies of all documents to chambers as the documents are served. The Court will issue an order referring this case to court sponsored mediation as requested by the parties. If defendants decide to not file a motion, they should inform plaintiff and the Court in writing, request the Court schedule an Initial Pretrial Conference and file an answer on or before April 6, 2017. ( Amended Pleadings due by 3/6/2017., Motions due by 6/1/2017.). (Court Reporter Sue Ghorayeb) (gs) |
||
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Hearing
Wed 02/01 4:05 PM
RESCHEDULING NOTICE: Due to a scheduling conflict, the above case previously scheduled for a Pre-Motion Conference on February 3, 2017 at 1:15 pm, is hereby advanced on the same date to 12:00 pm in Courtroom 218 before the Hon. Nelson S. Roman, at the Charles L. Brieant United States Courthouse, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601. (mml) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Letter
Wed 02/01 2:31 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Karen Zdanis, Esq. dated 2/1/17 re: Defendant's pre-motion letter. Document filed by Michael Taylor.(Zdanis, Karen) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 01/18 11:29 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:15 Letter filed by Michael Taylor. ENDORSEMENT: Response due Feb. 1, 2017. Pre-motion Conference scheduled for Feb. 3, 2017 at 1:15pm. The application is granted. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 2/3/2017 at 01:15 PM before Judge Nelson Stephen Roman.) (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 1/17/2017) (mml) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Letter
Fri 01/13 5:33 PM
FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Karen Zdanis, Esq. dated 01/13/2017 re: Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Michael Taylor.(Zdanis, Karen) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Hearings
Fri 01/13 1:43 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:13 Letter, filed by Horace Greely High School, Lyn McKay, Chappaqua Central School District, Robert Rhodes. ENDORSEMENT: Initial Pre-trial Conference scheduled for Jan. 20, 2017 at 12:30pm converted to a Pre-motion Conference. Opposing party to state position in writing (not to exceed 3 pages by Jan. 18, 2017. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 1/20/2017 at 12:30 PM before Judge Nelson Stephen Roman.) (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 1/12/2017) (mml) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Letter
Thu 01/12 8:51 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Lewis R. Silverman dated January 12, 2017 re: Pre-Motion Conference for Motion To Dismiss. Document filed by Chappaqua Central School District, Horace Greely High School, Lyn McKay, Robert Rhodes.(Silverman, Lewis) |
|
Monday, December 19, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 12/20 10:00 AM
ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting10 Motion for James Everett Voyles to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of the Court is requested to terminate the motion (doc. 10). (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 12/19/2016) (mml) |
|
Friday, December 16, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Hearing
Mon 12/19 12:09 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL COURT CONFERENCE: THIS MATTER HAS BEEN SCHEDULED FOR AN INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, on January 20, 2017 at 12:30 pm, at the United States Courthouse, 300 Quarropas Street, Courtroom 218, White Plains, New York 10601. (Initial Conference set for 1/20/2017 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 218, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Nelson Stephen Roman) (lnl) |
|
Thursday, December 15, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 12/15 4:10 PM
FIRST MOTION for James Everett Voyles to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13103183. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Michael Taylor.(Zdanis, Karen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
misc
Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
Thu 12/15 4:16 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 10 FIRST MOTION for James Everett Voyles to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13103183. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) |
||
Friday, December 09, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 12/09 4:48 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lewis R. Silverman on behalf of Chappaqua Central School District, Horace Greely High School, Lyn McKay, Robert Rhodes.(Silverman, Lewis) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, November 23, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Mon 11/28 4:40 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chappaqua Central School District, Horace Greely High School, Lyn McKay, Robert Rhodes.(sj) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons | ||
Tuesday, November 22, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 11/22 5:25 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Horace Greely High School, re:2 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Taylor. (Zdanis, Karen) |
|
6 | 6
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 11/22 5:24 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chappaqua Central School District, re:2 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Taylor. (Zdanis, Karen) |
|
5 | 5
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 11/22 5:23 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to McKay, re:2 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Taylor. (Zdanis, Karen) |
|
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 11/22 5:22 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Rhodes, re:2 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Taylor. (Zdanis, Karen) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 11/22 11:55 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Zdanis, Karen) |
|
2 | 2
15
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 11/22 11:50 AM
COMPLAINT against Chappaqua Central School District, Horace Greely High School, Lyn McKay, Robert Rhodes. Document filed by Michael Taylor.(Zdanis, Karen) |
|
Monday, November 21, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 11/21 4:15 PM
COMPLAINT against Horace Greely High School, Chappaqua Central School District, Robert Rhodes, Lyn McKay. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13012735)Document filed by Michael Taylor, Horace Greely High School, Chappaqua Central School District, Robert Rhodes, Lyn McKay.(Zdanis, Karen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
Tue 11/22 9:16 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Karen Lenore Zdanis to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 11/22 9:34 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Karen Lenore Zdanis. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct signed PDF. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet. (vf) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Tue 11/22 2:04 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Karen Lenore Zdanis. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jury Demand code n (None); County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jury Demand code has been modified to p (Plaintiff); the County code has been modified to Westchester. (vf) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Tue 11/22 2:08 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Tue 11/22 2:09 PM
Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 11/22 2:09 PM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |