REESE v. BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Susan D Wigenton |
Referred: | Leda D Wettre |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-08670 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Nov 21, 2016 |
Terminated: | Apr 07, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday May 20, 2017 6:38 AM EDT |
Defendant
BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BAYER OY
|
|
Defendant
BAYER PHARMA AG
|
|
Plaintiff
MARYSSA REESE
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation (public)
Thu 04/27 11:38 AM
Case transferred from New Jersey has been opened in Southern District of New York as case 1:17-cv-03071, filed 04/27/2017. (mfr) |
||
misc
Docket Annotation (public)
Thu 04/27 11:39 AM
Case transferred from New Jersey has been opened in Southern District of New York as case 1:17-cv-03072, filed 04/27/2017. (mfr) |
||
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
mdl
MDL Transfer Order (out)
Mon 04/10 4:16 PM
Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the Southern District of New York. (ek) |
|
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District Court Transfer
Mon 04/10 4:17 PM
Case extracted via ECF to the Southern District of New York. (ek) |
||
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Amended Document (NOT Motion/Complaint)
Fri 02/10 4:40 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. Amendment to4 Corporate Disclosure Statement . (DOTRO, LORNA) |
|
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Tue 01/24 11:27 AM
ORDER administratively terminating6 Motion to Stay, and adjourning the in-person initial scheduling conference to 4/27/17 at 11:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 1/23/17. (sr, ) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
minutes
Settlement Conference
Thu 01/19 12:05 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Settlement Conference held on 1/18/2017. (kd) |
||
Tuesday, January 10, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Stay
Tue 01/10 12:23 PM
MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Decision by the JPML by MARYSSA REESE.(MUHLSTOCK, MELANIE) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Brief Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 01/10 2:49 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to6 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Decision by the JPML . Motion set for 2/6/2017 before Judge Susan D. Wigenton. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, ) |
||
Thursday, January 05, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Thu 01/05 1:18 PM
LETTER ORDER - A Scheduling Conference is set for 2/9/2017 at 11:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 4A before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre.Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 1/5/2017. (kd) |
|
Wednesday, January 04, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 01/04 1:33 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (DOTRO, LORNA) |
|
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 01/04 1:32 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..(DOTRO, LORNA) |
|
Tuesday, November 22, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 11/22 9:53 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BAYER OY, BAYER PHARMA AG Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *STEPHEN BOND* (seb) |
|
Monday, November 21, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 11/22 9:50 AM
COMPLAINT against BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BAYER OY, BAYER PHARMA AG ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7493529) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MARYSSA REESE.(seb) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |