Petrowsky v. NextEra Energy Resources, LLC
Kansas District Court | |
Judge: | Eric F Melgren |
Referred: | Gwynne E Birzer |
Case #: | 6:16-cv-01424 |
Nature of Suit | 893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters |
Cause | 16:1538 Endangered Species Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 23, 2016 |
Terminated: | Feb 22, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday May 22, 2017 3:47 AM CDT |
Defendant
NextEra Energy Resources, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edwin R. Petrowsky
50307 NW 60th Ave
Pratt, KS 67124 |
1. | Kansas farmer files federal lawsuit to stop wind farm from operating to protect the endangered whooping cranes (ksnt.com) |
Submitted Mon 12/05/2016 | |
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for TRO Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Wed 02/22 1:05 PM
ORDER finding as moot3 Motion for TRO; granting6 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting11 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 2/22/2017.Mailed to pro se party Edwin Petrowsky by regular mail. (sz) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Dismiss
Tue 02/21 1:00 PM
MOTION TO WITHDRAW by Plaintiff Edwin R. Petrowsky. (sz) |
|
Tuesday, January 31, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Tue 01/31 1:44 PM
ORDER. The undersigned Magistrate Judge communicated with the parties, via letter dated January 9, 2017, regarding deferred scheduling of this case. Having received no response, the Court assumes the parties are in agreement the Rule 16 scheduling conference should be postponed until after the pending Motion to Dismiss [ECF No. 6] has been decided by the District Judge. Therefore, the initial order and scheduling in this case shall be deferred pending ruling on the Motion to Dismiss. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 1/31/17. Mailed to pro se party Edwin Petrowsky by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(sj) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 01/17 12:01 PM
REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant NextEra Energy Resources, LLC re:6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Sear, Timothy) |
|
Friday, January 06, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
respm
Response to Motion
Fri 01/06 3:03 PM
RESPONSE by Plaintiff Edwin R. Petrowsky re6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction .(sz) |
|
Wednesday, December 28, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
support
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Wed 12/28 2:11 PM
MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant NextEra Energy Resources, LLC(Sear, Timothy) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Wed 12/28 2:10 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant NextEra Energy Resources, LLC (Sear, Timothy) |
|
Wednesday, December 07, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion to Stay Deadlines
Wed 12/07 2:34 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion to Stay Deadlines. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 12/7/2016.Mailed to pro se party Edwin R. Petrowsky by regular mail (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm) |
|
Tuesday, December 06, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Stay Deadlines
Tue 12/06 1:44 PM
MOTION to Stay re3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Edwin R. Petrowsky. (sz) |
|
utility
Motions No Longer Referred
Tue 12/06 3:08 PM
MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: 4 MOTION to Stay Deadlines re 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(alm) |
||
Thursday, December 01, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Temporary Restraining Order
Thu 12/01 3:48 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Edwin R. Petrowsky (sz) |
|
service
Summons Issued
Thu 12/01 3:42 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to NextEra Energy Resources, LLC. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (mam) |
||
Wednesday, November 23, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 11/23 11:37 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET re1 Complaint by Plaintiff Edwin R. Petrowsky. (mam) |
|
1 | 1
8
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 11/23 11:37 AM
COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita, filed by Edwin R. Petrowsky (No Summons Issued). (mam) |
|
misc
Filing Fee Paid
Wed 11/23 11:38 AM
FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $400, receipt number W4631009800. (mam) |