Karen M. Soles v. United Airlines, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Virginia A Phillips |
Referred: | Charles F Eick |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-08769 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 23, 2016 |
Terminated: | Apr 27, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday May 22, 2017 2:01 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
United Airlines, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karen M Soles
3212 West 85th Street No. 2293
Inglewood, CA 90305 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, May 11, 2018 | ||
68 | 68
order
Reconsideration
Fri 05/11 1:07 PM
MINUTE ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (DOC. NO. 65) (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Virginia A. Phillips denying65 MOTION for Reconsideration: The Court thus DENIES Plaintiff's Motion and VACATES the hearing set for May 28, 2018. The parties should not file any further briefs on this Motion. (see document for further details) (bm) |
|
Thursday, May 10, 2018 | ||
67 | 67
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 05/10 11:26 AM
OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration65 filed by Defendant United Airlines, Inc.. (Echavarria, Camilo) |
|
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
66 | 66
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Tue 05/08 1:19 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL filed by plaintiff Karen M Soles, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration65 served on 5/8/18. (bm) |
|
65 | 65
motion
Reconsideration
Tue 05/08 1:16 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION filed by plaintiff Karen M Soles. Motion set for hearing on 5/28/2018 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bm) |