Wolfe v. Rodriguez et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | William J Zloch |
Case #: | 0:16-cv-62797 |
Nature of Suit | 422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158 |
Cause | 28:0158 Bankruptcy Appeal from Judgment/Order |
Case Filed: | Nov 28, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jan 18, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday May 27, 2017 5:57 AM EDT |
Appellant
Michael J. Wolfe
8716 Kently Road
New Port Richey, FL 34654 |
|
Appellee
Deborah L. Corn
|
Represented By
|
Appellee
Armando Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Noticing Bankruptcy Court
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Bankruptcy Order Dismissing Bankruptcy Appeal
Wed 01/18 4:06 PM
Bankruptcy Order Dismissing Bankruptcy Appeal on Appellant(s) Agreed Motion to Dismiss Pending Appeals. Closing Case. Signed by US Bankruptcy Judge Raymond B. Ray on 1/18/2017. (jc) |
|
Friday, December 23, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 12/23 11:26 AM
NOTICE by Deborah L. Corn, Armando Rodriguez (Neiwirth, Ronald) |
|
Wednesday, November 30, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 11/30 1:05 PM
NOTICE by Deborah L. Corn, Armando Rodriguez Notice of Filing Mtn to Dismiss Untimely Appeal In Bankrupcty Court (Neiwirth, Ronald) |
|
Monday, November 28, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals
Mon 11/28 9:39 AM
Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (bb) |
|
3 | 3
order
Judge Assignment
Mon 11/28 9:38 AM
Judge Assignment to Judge William J. Zloch (bb) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court
Mon 11/28 9:18 AM
Bankruptcy Transmittal of Notice of Appeal re1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Michael J. Wolfe(smd) |
|
Att: 1 Docket Sheet | ||
1 | 1
appeal
Bankruptcy Appeal - CV - NO FEE
Mon 11/28 9:15 AM
Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT , Bankruptcy Court case number 12-02101 RBR, filed by Michael J. Wolfe.(smd) |