BLONDIN et al v. American Security Insurance Company
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Beth Bloom |
Referred: | Alicia O Valle |
Case #: | 0:16-cv-62801 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Nov 28, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jan 09, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday May 27, 2017 5:51 AM EDT |
Defendant
American Security Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Duniesky Blondin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jacqueline Blondin
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, January 27, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 01/30 9:25 AM
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the parties Stipulation, ECF No.16 , is approved and adopted, and the matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. To the extent not otherwise disposed of, all pending motions are DENIED as moot, and all pending deadlines are VACATED. TheClerk is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/27/2017. (jas) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 01/27 4:07 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Duniesky Blondin, Jacqueline Blondin(Chong, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Order of Dismissal with Prejudice | ||
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Administrative Order
Mon 01/09 3:12 PM
ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. The above-styled action is administratively CLOSED. The Clerk shall CLOSE this case for administrative purposes only; The parties are directed to file a Stipulation for Final Order of Dismissal or other appropriate dismissal papers on or before 2/8/2017; Any pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Any pending deadlines are TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/9/2017. (jas) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Settlement
Mon 01/09 1:39 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by American Security Insurance Company (Brown, Jonathan) |
|
Wednesday, January 04, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order
Thu 01/05 10:21 AM
ORDER Requiring Parties To Comply re12 Scheduling Order, Order Referring Case to Mediation, Order Referring Case to Judge on or Before January 9, 2017. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/4/2017. (jas) |
|
Monday, December 12, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation Order Referring Case to Judge
Mon 12/12 2:41 PM
ORDER Seeting Trial And Pre-Trial Schedle, Requiring Mediation, And Referring Certain Matters To Magistrate Judge: (Jury Trial set for 11/13/2017 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 11/7/2017 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Amended Pleadings due by 2/10/2017., Discovery due by 7/18/2017., Expert Discovery due by 7/18/2017., Joinder of Parties due by 2/10/2017., Mediation Deadline 8/1/2017., In Limine Motions due by 10/17/2017., Dispositive Motions due by 8/9/2017., Pre-Trial Motions due by 8/9/2017., Joint Pre-Trial Stipulation due by 10/17/2017.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/12/2016. (jas) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order Striking
Mon 12/12 2:31 PM
ORDER STRIKING10 Notice of Unavailability filed by Duniesky Blondin, Jacqueline Blondin. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/12/2016. (jas) |
|
Friday, December 09, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Unavailability
Fri 12/09 6:52 PM
NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by Duniesky Blondin, Jacqueline Blondin for dates of 4/1/2016 to 6/15/2016 (Chong, Jennifer) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1
Fri 12/09 4:51 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by American Security Insurance Company(Brown, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 | ||
Monday, December 05, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 12/05 2:13 PM
NOTICE by American Security Insurance Company re6 Order Notice of Filing State Circuit Court Docket (Brown, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Docket | ||
Wednesday, November 30, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report
Wed 11/30 11:23 AM
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates Of Interested Parties. Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates Of Interested Parties due by 12/20/2016. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/29/2016. (jas) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order
Wed 11/30 11:23 AM
ORDER ON POST-REMOVAL PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/29/2016. (jas) |
|
Tuesday, November 29, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
answer
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Tue 11/29 11:52 AM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by American Security Insurance Company. (Brown, Jonathan) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 11/29 11:35 AM
Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Security Insurance Company (Brown, Jonathan) |
|
Monday, November 28, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Clerk's Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge - FORM
Tue 11/29 10:32 AM
Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (lrz1) |
|
2 | 2
order
Judge Assignment
Tue 11/29 10:31 AM
Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom (lrz1) |
|
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT) Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-9283588, filed by American Security Insurance Company.(Brown, Jonathan) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 |