Dowling College
New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Robert E Grossman |
Case #: | 8:16-bk-75545 |
Case Filed: | Nov 29, 2016 |
Terminated: | Dec 27, 2022 |
Plan Confirmed: | Dec 20, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Dowling College
PO Box 470
Massapequa, NY 11762 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 12:58 PM EST |
Accountant
Eichen & DiMeglio, P.C.
One Dupont Street Suite 203
Plainview, NY 11803 |
|
Broker
Douglas Elliman
1772 E. Jericho Turnpike
Huntington, NY 11743 |
|
Broker
Hilco Streambank
1500 Broadway 8th Floor
New York, NY 10036 |
|
Broker
CBRE, Inc.
58 South Service Road
Melville, NY 11747 |
|
Claims Agent
Garden City Group, LLC
1985 Marcus Avenue Suite 200
Lake Success, NY 11042 |
|
Consultant
FPM Group, Ltd.
909 Marconi Avenue
Ronkonkoma, NY 11779 |
|
Consultant
Baker Tilly Virchow Krause, LLP
20 Stanwix Street
Pittsburgh, PA 15222 |
|
Creditor
Barbara J Nolan
164 S Portage St.
Westfield, NY 14787 |
|
Creditor
Debra Gustafson
|
|
Creditor
Iron Mountain Information Management, LLC
One Federal Street
Boston, MA 02110 |
|
Creditor
stephen Lamia
|
|
Creditor
Marilyn Mather
2 Putzel Avenue
Guilford, CT 06437 |
|
Creditor
NCF Capital LTD
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Lori Zaikowski
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kimberly Dawn Poppiti
2 Eighth Street
Farmingville, NY 11738 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Powerhouse Maintenance, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Reinoldo Blanco
200 Stoneleigh Drive
Riverhead, NY 11901 |
|
Creditor
Martin Schoenhals
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Synchrony Bank c/o PRA Receivables Management, LLC
PO Box 41021
Norfolk, VA 23541 |
|
Creditor
U.S. Department of Veteran Affairs
PO Box 11930
St Paul, MN 55111 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
UMB Bank, National Association as Indenture Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Richard Wolff Wolff
|
|
Creditor
Argo Partners
12 W 37th St 9th Fl
New York, NY 10018 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Carrier Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Fair Harbor Capital, LLC
PO Box 237037
New York, NY 10023 |
|
Creditor
Dowling College Full Time Faculty Chapter of New York State United Teachers
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
ACA Financial Guaranty Corp.
90 Merrick Avenue 9th Floor
East Meadow, NY 11554 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Department of Education
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
DACA VI LLC
1565 Hotel Circle South Suite 310
San Diego, CA 92108 |
|
Creditor
Michael J. Aloi
|
|
Creditor Committee
Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Justine DeLuca
|
|
Interested Party
Patricia Karpowicz
|
|
Interested Party
New York State Division for Historic Preservation
P.O. Box 189
Waterford, NY 12188 |
|
Interested Party
Certain Members Of The Dowling College Board of Trustees
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
KPMG LLP
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Venmar Holding SA
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Bridgestone Capital Partners, LLC
Long Tuminello, LLP 120 Fourth Avenue
Bay Shore, NY 11706 |
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
Receivable Collection Services, LLC
170 Jericho Turnpike
Floral Park, NY 11001 |
|
Other Prof.
Robert S. Rosenfeld
1330 Avenue of the Americas Suite 23A
New York, NY 10019 |
|
Other Prof.
Madison Hawk Partners, LLC
575 Lexington Ave.
New York, NY 10022 |
|
Other Prof.
A&G Realty Partners, LLC
445 Broadhollow Road Suite 410
Melville, NY 11747 |
|
Other Prof.
Garden City Group, LLC
1985 Marcus Avenue Suite 200
Lake Success, NY 11042 |
|
Other Prof.
Forster & Garbus LLP
60 Motor Parkway
Commack, NY 11725 |
|
Spec. Counsel
Smith & Downey, PA
100 Quentin Roosevelt Boulevard Suite 210
Garden City, NY 11530 |
|
Spec. Counsel
Ingerman Smith, LLP
150 Motor Parkway Suite 400
Hauppauge, NY 11788 |
|
Spec. Counsel
Farrell Fritz, P.C.
100 Motor Parkway Suite 138
Hauppauge, NY 11788 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Long Island Federal Courthouse 560 Federal Plaza - Room 560
Central Islip, NY 11722 |
|
US Trustee Trial Attorney
Stan Y Yang
Office of the United States Trustee Central Islip Office Alfonse M D'Amato US Courthouse 560 Federal Plaza
Central Islip, NY 11722 |
1. | Dowling College Files for Chapter 11 Bankruptcy in order to sell its Long Island campuses (wsj.com) |
Submitted Wed 11/30/2016 | |
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Tuesday, December 27, 2022 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Tue 12/27 3:15 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (rom) |