JACKSON v. BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Susan D Wigenton |
Referred: | Leda D Wettre |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-08832 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Nov 29, 2016 |
Terminated: | Apr 07, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday May 28, 2017 5:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
|
|
Defendant
BAYER OY
|
|
Defendant
BAYER PHARMA AG
|
|
Notice Only
PHV LAWRENCE L. JONES, II
|
|
Plaintiff
KASEY JACKSON
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation (public)
Thu 04/27 3:54 PM
Case transferred from New Jersey has been opened in Southern District of New York as case 1:17-cv-03085, filed 04/27/2017. (mfr) |
||
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
mdl
MDL Transfer Order (out)
Mon 04/10 4:38 PM
Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the Southern District of New York. (ek) |
|
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District Court Transfer
Mon 04/10 4:38 PM
Case extracted via ECF to the Southern District of New York. (ek) |
||
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 03/06 10:53 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KASEY JACKSON. BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. waiver sent on 2/28/2017, answer due 5/1/2017. (MUHLSTOCK, MELANIE) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
minutes
Settlement Conference
Thu 01/19 12:14 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Settlement Conference held on 1/18/2017. (kd) |
||
Tuesday, December 27, 2016 | ||
notice
Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added
Tue 12/27 1:32 PM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, LAWRENCE L. JONES, II, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (sr, ) |
||
Wednesday, December 21, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
Wed 12/21 1:00 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Lawrence L. Jones II to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-7550475.) (MUHLSTOCK, MELANIE) |
|
Thursday, December 08, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order
Mon 12/12 11:28 AM
ORDER granting3 Letter for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Lawrence L. Jones, Esq., etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 12/08/2016. (ek) |
|
Wednesday, December 07, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Letter
Wed 12/07 11:09 AM
Letter from Melanie H. Muhlstock, Esq. requesting Pro Hac Vice Admission of Lawrence L. Jones, Esq., on consent of all parties.(MUHLSTOCK, MELANIE) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, November 30, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 11/30 8:48 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BAYER OY, BAYER PHARMA AG Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *CHRISTINE MELILLO* (cm ) |
|
Tuesday, November 29, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 11/29 2:55 PM
COMPLAINT against BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BAYER OY, BAYER PHARMA AG ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7505776) with JURY DEMAND, filed by KASEY JACKSON.(MUHLSTOCK, MELANIE) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 11/29 4:22 PM
Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre added. (eu, ) |