Frank N Magid Associates, Inc v. Marrs et al
Iowa Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Linda R Reade |
Referred: | Cj Williams |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-00198 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Nov 29, 2016 |
Terminated: | Dec 13, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday May 28, 2017 4:30 AM CDT |
Counter Claimant
Shannon Marrs
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Elizabeth Shepherd
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Frank N Magid Associates, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chirp Research LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Shannon Marrs
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Elizabeth Shepherd
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frank N Magid Associates, Inc
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jul 20 2017
ORDER granting 43 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Linda R Reade on 7/20/2017. (pac) |
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Wed 12/13 11:13 AM
***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to64 Stipulation of Dismissal, with Prejudice. (mml) |
||
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
64 | 64
2
pgs
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 12/12 3:57 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Frank N Magid Associates, Inc (Mick, Ryan) |