Kirby v. Janssen Research & Development LLC et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Eldon E Fallon |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-16675 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Nov 29, 2016 |
Terminated: | Nov 09, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday May 28, 2017 3:39 AM CDT |
Defendant
Bayer AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Bayer HealthCare AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer HealthCare LLC
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Pharma AG
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Ortho LLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Research & Development LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Yvonne Kirby
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 63 minutes ago |
Friday, November 09, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 11/09 3:10 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. See rec. doc. 11509 filed in master case 14-md-2592. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/02/2018. (jeg) |
|
Tuesday, December 06, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association
Tue 12/06 1:38 PM
PRETRIAL ORDERS #1 - #30. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon.(ADI) |
|
Thursday, December 01, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 12/01 9:55 AM
Summons Issued as to Bayer AG, Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare AG, Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson Company. (mf) |
|
Wednesday, November 30, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Wed 11/30 12:16 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (jeg) |
|
Tuesday, November 29, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 11/29 4:06 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-5827859) filed by Yvonne Kirby.Attorney Emanuella J. Paulos added to party Yvonne Kirby(pty:pla).(Paulos, Emanuella) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Bayer AG, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Bayer Corporation, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Bayer Healthcare AG, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Bayer Healthcare LLC, | ||
Att: 6 Summons Bayer Pharma AG, | ||
Att: 7 Summons Johnson & Johnson, | ||
Att: 8 Summons Janssen Ortho LLC, | ||
Att: 9 Summons Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, | ||
Att: 10 Summons Janssen Research & Development, | ||
Att: 11 Summons Bayer Healthcare Pharma Inc |