Adams v. Sanofi-Aventis U S L L C et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Rebecca F Doherty |
Referred: | Patrick J Hanna |
Case #: | 6:16-cv-01649 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Nov 29, 2016 |
Terminated: | Dec 30, 2016 |
Last checked: Sunday May 28, 2017 4:43 AM CDT |
Defendant
Aventis Pharma S A
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi S A
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U S L L C
|
|
Plaintiff
Hilda Adams
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, January 05, 2017 | ||
utility
District Transfer/Remand Record Received
Thu 01/05 3:58 PM
DISTRICT COURT TRANSFER Record Received electronically by Eastern District of Louisiana on 1/5/2017, case number 2:16-cv-17583. (crt,Whidden, C) |
||
Friday, December 30, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
transfer
Order for Multi-District Litigation (MDL) Transfer
Tue 01/03 9:45 AM
ORDER FOR MULTI-DISTRICT LITIGATION TRANSFER CTO # 14, directing transfer to Eastern District of Louisiana, In Re: Taxotere (Docetaxel) Products Liability Litigation, MDL # 2740. Record electronically transmitted to receiving court. Case Terminated. All future pleadings should be filed with the newly assigned court. (crt,Whidden, C) |
|
Wednesday, December 14, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 12/14 8:26 AM
NOTICE received via email from Clerk of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transmitting Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-14) in MDL No. 2740, IN RE: Taxotere (Docetaxel) Products Liability Litigation advising case shall be transferred to the Eastern District of Louisiana upon the request of the record. (crt,Whidden, C) |
|
Wednesday, November 30, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued - All (Form Included)
Wed 11/30 9:50 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Aventis Pharma S A, Sanofi S A, Sanofi-Aventis U S L L C (crt,Putch, A) |
|
Tuesday, November 29, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 11/29 4:21 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3230486) filed by Hilda Adams.(Attorney Christopher L Coffin added to party Hilda Adams(pty:pla))(aty,Coffin, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 11/30 9:49 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge Rebecca F Doherty and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Putch, A) |