Niki Alexander Shetty v. Residential Credit Solutions Inc et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | George H Wu |
Referred: | Frederick F Mumm |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-08774 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Nov 23, 2016 |
Terminated: | Mar 02, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday May 22, 2017 1:15 AM PDT |
Defendant
All Persons Unknown Claiming
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
The Bank of New York Mellon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Niki Alexander Shetty
An individual 20631 Ventura Boulevard Suite 301
Woodland Hills, CA 91364 |
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Residential Credit Solutions Inc
Terminated: 01/09/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Bank of New York
Terminated: 01/09/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
appeal
USCA Mandate
Fri 01/19 3:39 PM
MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals32 CCA # 17-55342 The judgment of the 9th Circuit Court, entered December 26, 2017, takes effect thisdate.This constitutes the formal mandate of the 9th CCA issued pursuant to Rule41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. [See USCA Memorandum35 AFFIRMED.](mat) |
|
Tuesday, December 26, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
appeal
USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order
Wed 12/27 11:25 AM
MEMORANDUM from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals32 filed by Niki Alexander Shetty. CCA # 17-55342 The decision of the District Court is AFFIRMED. (mrgo) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
bankruptcy
Designation of Record
Wed 04/12 5:07 PM
APPELLANT'S DESIGNATION OF RECORD AND STATEMENT OF ISSUES TO BE PRESENTED ON APPEAL filed by Plaintiff Niki Alexander Shetty. (mrgo) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
appeal
USCA Notification of Case Number
Fri 03/17 8:57 AM
NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 17-55342 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals32 as to Plaintiff Niki Alexander Shetty. (pj) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
appeal
Appeal Fees Paid
Wed 03/15 9:03 AM
APPEAL FEE PAID: as to Plaintiff Niki Alexander Shetty; Receipt Number: LA151439 in the amount of $505. (rsm) |
||
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
appeal
Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals
Wed 03/15 9:05 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Plaintiff Niki Alexander Shetty. Appeal of Judgment30 Filed On: 3/8/17; Entered On: 3/9/17; Filing fee $505 paid, receipt number LA151439. (mat) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Entry of Decision or Ruling by a Judge of this Court
Fri 03/10 11:12 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Judgment of Dismissal, re: Judgment30 , filed by Defendant The Bank of New York. (Hernandez, Joshua) |
|
Wednesday, March 08, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
judgmentCV
Judgment
Thu 03/09 11:48 AM
JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL by Judge George H. Wu, in favor of The Bank of New York Mellon against Niki Alexander Shetty Related to: Order on Motion to Dismiss, Motion Hearing,28 . (mrgo) |
|
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Entry of Decision or Ruling by a Judge of this Court
Mon 03/06 9:22 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Entry of Order Granting Motion to Dismiss First AMended Complaint with Prejudice, re: Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Motion Hearing,28 , filed by Defendant The Bank of New York.(Hernandez, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Judgment | ||
Thursday, March 02, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
minutes
Motion Hearing Dismiss
Fri 03/03 9:41 AM
MINUTES OF DEFENDANT THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu re:16 MOTION to Dismiss. Defendant's Motion is GRANTED WITH PREJUDICE. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) Court Reporter: Marea Woolrich. (mrgo) |
|
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Thu 02/16 3:03 PM
REPLY to Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMENDED Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof 19 filed by Defendant The Bank of New York Mellon. (Hernandez, Joshua) |
|
26 | 26
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Thu 02/16 12:57 PM
Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Shetty in Support of Opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMENDED Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof 19 filed by Defendant The Bank of New York Mellon. (Hernandez, Joshua) |
|
25 | 25
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Thu 02/16 12:53 PM
Response to Plaintiff's Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMENDED Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof 19 filed by Defendant The Bank of New York Mellon. (Hernandez, Joshua) |
|
24 | 24
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Thu 02/16 12:50 PM
Opposition to Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMENDED Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof 19 filed by Defendant The Bank of New York Mellon. (Hernandez, Joshua) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Tue 02/14 2:57 PM
PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT16 filed by Plaintiff Niki Alexander Shetty. (lom) |
|
22 | 22
misc
For Judicial Notice
Tue 02/14 2:54 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS16 filed by Plaintiff Niki Alexander Shetty. (lom) |
|
21 | 21
misc
For Judicial Notice
Fri 02/10 4:06 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof 16 filed by Plaintiff Niki Alexander Shetty. (mrgo) |
|
20 | 20
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Fri 02/10 4:03 PM
OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof 16 filed by Plaintiff Niki Alexander Shetty. (mrgo) |
|
Friday, January 27, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Amend/Correct
Fri 01/27 10:31 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMENDED Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Defendant The Bank of New York Mellon(a non-existent New York Corporation). Motion set for hearing on 3/2/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Hernandez, Joshua) |
|
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Transfer Pursuant to GO 16-05 DECLINED-(related case)(CV 34)
Mon 01/23 2:26 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05 filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge R. Gary Klausner, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:16-cv-02238 RGK(KSx) (rn) |
|
17 | 17
misc
For Judicial Notice
Mon 01/23 11:15 AM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Poionts and Authorities in Support Thereof 16 filed by Defendant The Bank of New York Mellon. (Hernandez, Joshua) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Dismiss (cause or other)
Mon 01/23 11:14 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Poionts and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Defendant The Bank of New York Mellon(a non-existent New York Corporation). Motion set for hearing on 3/2/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Hernandez, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Dismiss
Wed 01/11 11:32 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - COURT ORDER by Judge George H. Wu re:12 MOTION to Dismiss. On January 9, 2017, Plaintiff Niki Alexander Shetty filed a First Amended Complaint. In light of that filing, the Operative Complaint is no longer the original complaint. As such, the Court VACATES Defendants' Motion to Dismiss12 , filed on December 19, 2016, and set for January 30, 2017. (mrgo) |
|
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
othcmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 01/10 3:02 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants All Persons Unknown Claiming, Does, The Bank of New York Mellon (a non-existent New York Corporation), The Bank of New York Mellon(as Trustee for the Certificateholders CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2005-43 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-43, a fictitious entity), The Bank of New York Mellon(a New York banking entity); Party Residential Credit Solutions Inc (A Delaware Corporation) terminated; amending Complaint - (Discovery),1 , filed by plaintiff Niki Alexander Shetty(mrgo) |
|
Att: 1 Part 2 of 4, | ||
Att: 2 Part 3 of 4, | ||
Att: 3 Part 4 of 4 | ||
Monday, December 19, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
misc
For Judicial Notice
Mon 12/19 11:59 AM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof 12 filed by Defendants Residential Credit Solutions Inc, The Bank of New York, The Bank of New York Mellon, The Bank of New York Mellon. (Hernandez, Joshua) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Dismiss (cause or other)
Mon 12/19 11:57 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Defendants Residential Credit Solutions Inc, The Bank of New York, The Bank of New York Mellon(as Trustee for the Certificateholders CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2005-43 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-43, a fictitious entity), The Bank of New York Mellon(a New York banking entity). Motion set for hearing on 1/30/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Hernandez, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
11 | 11
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 12/19 11:55 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Residential Credit Solutions Inc, The Bank of New York, The Bank of New York Mellon(as Trustee for the Certificateholders CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2005-43 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-43, a fictitious entity), The Bank of New York Mellon(a New York banking entity), (Attorney Joshua Ryan Hernandez added to party Residential Credit Solutions Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua Ryan Hernandez added to party The Bank of New York(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua Ryan Hernandez added to party The Bank of New York Mellon(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua Ryan Hernandez added to party The Bank of New York Mellon(pty:dft))(Hernandez, Joshua) |
|
Wednesday, December 14, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 12/15 10:21 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Niki Alexander Shetty, upon Defendant The Bank of New York Mellon(as Trustee for the Certificateholders CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2005-43 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-43, a fictitious entity) served on 12/8/2016, answer due 12/29/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Thomas McCauley, Agent for Service in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (mrgo) |
|
Tuesday, December 06, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Wed 12/07 3:33 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Niki Alexander Shetty, upon Defendant Residential Credit Solutions Inc served on 12/1/2016, answer due 12/22/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky DeGeorge, Agent for CSC in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service at business address and no service by mail was executed. Original Summons NOT returned. (mrgo) |
|
8 | 8
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Wed 12/07 3:31 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Niki Alexander Shetty, upon Defendant The Bank of New York Mellon(as Trustee for the Certificateholders CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2005-43 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-43, a fictitious entity) served on 12/1/2016, answer due 12/22/2016; The Bank of New York Mellon(a New York banking entity) served on 12/1/2016, answer due 12/22/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gladys Agilera, Agent for CT Corp in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service at business address and no service by mail was executed. Original Summons NOT returned. (mrgo) |
|
Friday, December 02, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 12/02 10:09 AM
Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu. (kss) |
|
Wednesday, November 23, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 11/29 5:15 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 11/29 5:15 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (et) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Order
Tue 11/29 5:14 PM
APPLICATION for Order for for Court Approval of Notice of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens) filed by Plaintiff Niki Alexander Shetty. LODGED Proposed Order. (et) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Related Case(s)
Tue 11/29 5:08 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Niki Alexander Shetty. Related Case(s): No Related Case. (et) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 11/29 5:07 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery)1 as to Defendants Residential Credit Solutions Inc, The Bank of New York, The Bank of New York Mellon(as Trustee for the Certificateholders CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2005-43 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-43, a fictitious entity), The Bank of New York Mellon(a New York banking entity). (et) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Tue 11/29 5:05 PM
COMPLAINT against Defendants All Persons Unknown Claiming, Does 1-10, Residential Credit Solutions Inc, The Bank of New York, The Bank of New York Mellon(as Trustee for the Certificateholders CWALT, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2005-43 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2005-43, a fictitious entity), The Bank of New York Mellon(a New York banking entity).Case assigned to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Frederick F Mumm. (Filing fee $ 400 FEE PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Niki Alexander Shetty. (et) |
|
Att: 1 Part 1 to Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Part 2 to Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Part 3 to Complaint |