Michigan Immigrant Rights Center et al v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | John Corbett O'Meara |
Referred: | Elizabeth A Stafford |
Case #: | 5:16-cv-14192 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 05:552 Freedom of Information Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 30, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday May 29, 2017 5:19 AM EDT |
Defendant
Customers and Border Protection
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Department of Homeland Security
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
American Civil Liberties Union of Michigan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dr. Elizabeth Oglesby
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dr. Geoffrey Alan Boyce
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michigan Immigrant Rights Center
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jun 08 2017
OPINION AND ORDER denying 14 Motion to Deem Certain Allegations in the Complaint Admitted. Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar) |
1. | Michigan immigrant and civil rights group file lawsuit against the US Government (washingtontimes.com) |
Submitted Thu 12/01/2016 | |
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
respm
Response to Motion
Wed 06/06 4:54 PM
RESPONSE to28 MOTION for Summary Judgment ,32 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Michigan, Dr. Elizabeth Oglesby, Dr. Geoffrey Alan Boyce, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center. (Wheaton, Corey) |
|
Tuesday, June 05, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
order
Stipulation and Order
Tue 06/05 3:20 PM
STIPULATED ORDER Granting Leave to file Reply in Excess of Page Limitation, Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar) |
|
Monday, June 04, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
notice
Hearing on Motion*
Mon 06/04 2:08 PM
AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING on28 MOTION for Summary Judgment ,32 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing RESET for 8/2/2018 10:15 AM before District Judge John Corbett O'Meara (WBar) |
|
Wednesday, May 09, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
respm
Response to Motion
Wed 05/09 5:24 PM
RESPONSE to32 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and REPLY in Support of Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by All Defendants. (Healy, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Supplemental Declaration of Robert Lewandowski | ||
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Hearing on Motion*
Wed 03/28 2:10 PM
AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING on28 MOTION for Summary Judgment ,32 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 6/20/2018 10:00 AM before District Judge John Corbett O'Meara (WBar) |
|
32 | 32
motion
Partial Summary Judgment
Wed 03/28 1:49 PM
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by All Plaintiffs., #8 Exhibit G (Category B Sample), #9 Exhibit H 3/5/18 Aukerman Letter), #10 Exhibit I (3/16/18 Aukerman/Nestler Email Exchange), #11 Exhibit J (Bratlie Declaration), #12 Exhibit K (Mass Declaration), #13 Exhibit L (Cohn Declaration), #14 Exhibit M (Sheley Declaration), #15 Exhibit N (Wessler Declaration), #16 Exhibit O (Robinson Declaration), #17 Exhibit P (Morawetz Declaration), #18 Exhibit Q (Ebadolahi Declaration), #19 Exhibit R (Aukerman Declaration)) (Wheaton, Corey) |
|
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A (Border Patrol Map), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B (2015 FOIA Request), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C (2/29/16 Dykema Letter), | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D (2017 FOIA Request), | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E (Category A Sample), | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F 3/30/17 Aukerman/Nestler Email Exchange | ||
Friday, March 23, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 03/23 10:41 AM
ORDER granting30 Motion for Substitution of Counsel. Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar) |
|
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Withdrawal of Attorney
Tue 03/20 11:22 AM
MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney and Substitution of Counsel for Emily B. Nestler by Customers and Border Protection, Department of Homeland Security. (Nestler, Emily) |
|
Thursday, February 15, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Hearing on Motion*
Thu 02/15 11:17 AM
NOTICE OF HEARING on28 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing set for 6/20/2018 10:00 AM before District Judge John Corbett O'Meara (WBar) |
|
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Summary Judgment
Wed 02/14 5:53 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by All Defendants. (Nestler, Emily) |
|
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, Declaration of Robert Lewandowski, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A-1, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A-2, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit A-3, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit A-4, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit A-5, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit A-6, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit A-7, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit A-8 | ||
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
order
Text-Only Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 12/14 3:16 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER Adopting27 Joint Status Report; Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is due 2/14/2018, Plaintiffs' Response and Cross-Motion is due by 3/28/2018, Defendants' Reply due 5/9/2018, Plaintiffs' Reply due 6/6/2018, Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar) |
||
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Report - Free
Wed 11/29 2:01 PM
Joint Status Report REPORT by All Plaintiffs (Wheaton, Corey) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 10/27 11:18 AM
Set Deadline: Joint Status Report due by 11/29/2017 (WBar) |
||
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Report - Free
Wed 10/25 6:05 PM
JOINT REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULE by American Civil Liberties Union of Michigan, Dr. Elizabeth Oglesby, Dr. Geoffrey Alan Boyce, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center (Wheaton, Corey) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 09/25 9:40 AM
Set Deadline: Joint Status Report due by 10/26/2017 (WBar) |
||
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Report - Free
Mon 09/18 6:00 PM
JOINT REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULE by All Plaintiffs (Wheaton, Corey) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Fri 08/11 9:05 AM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Customers and Border Protection, Department of Homeland Security. (Nestler, Emily) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 08/04 9:30 AM
STIPULATED ORDER Regarding Scheduling and Discovery Plan; Joint Status Report due by 9/18/2017, Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
cmp
Civil Case - Complaint, Amended
Fri 07/28 8:37 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED., #6 Exhibit 10/6/15 Email Deny Expedited Processing), #7 Exhibit F (10/14/15 Letter Appealing Denial), #8 Exhibit G (10/21/15 Email re Fee Waiver), #9 Exhibit 11/19/15 Letter Appealing Failure to Make Timely Determination), #10 Exhibit I (1/12/16 Letter re Initial Response to FOIA Request), #11 Exhibit J (2/29/16 Appeal Letter), #12 Exhibit K (5/9/16 Administrative Closure), #13 Exhibit L (9/30/16 Letter re Appeal of Expedited Processing), #14 Exhibit M (10/21/15 Email), #15 Exhibit N (10/30/15 Email), #16 Exhibit 10/26/16 Email Seeking Clarification on Case Numbers), #17 Exhibit P (2/26/16 Letter re Problems with FOIA Online System), #18 Exhibit Q (5/3/17 2017 FOIA Request), #19 Exhibit R (5/16/17 2017 FOIA Return Receipt)) (Damren, Samuel) |
|
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A (5/21/15 FOIA Request), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B (5/21/15 Cover Email), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C (7/13/15 Resubmission of FOIA Request), | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 7/13/15 Receipt of FOIA Request | ||
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
notice
Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled
Wed 07/12 3:16 PM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Scheduling Conference on 7/14/17 is Cancelled re20 Notice to Appear (WBar) |
||
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Discovery Plan - Rule 26f
Tue 07/11 12:01 PM
DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Damren, Samuel) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Appear*
Thu 06/08 12:03 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 7/14/2017 10:00 AM before District Judge John Corbett O'Meara, or file Rule 26(f) Plan. (WBar) |
|
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion - Free
Thu 06/08 11:55 AM
OPINION AND ORDER denying14 Motion to Deem Certain Allegations in the Complaint Admitted. Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 04/10 2:39 PM
REPLY to Response re14 MOTION Motion to Deem Certain Allegations in the Complaint Admitted Under Fed.R.Civ.Pro. 8(B)(6) or, In The Alternative, to Take a Limited Fed.R.Civ.Pro. 30(B)(6) Deposition filed by All Plaintiffs. (Damren, Samuel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - 4-6-17 Correspondence from U.S. Customs and Border Protection | ||
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 04/03 6:12 PM
RESPONSE to14 MOTION Motion to Deem Certain Allegations in the Complaint Admitted Under Fed.R.Civ.Pro. 8(B)(6) or, In The Alternative, to Take a Limited Fed.R.Civ.Pro. 30(B)(6) Deposition , or in the Alternative, Cross-Motion to Strke Certain Allegations in the Complaint filed by All Defendants. (Nestler, Emily) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
order
Text-Only Order
Fri 03/24 2:55 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER Granting16 Stipulation for Leave to File Amended Answer. Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar) |
||
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation
Thu 03/23 3:26 PM
STIPULATION for Defendants to file First Amended Answer by All Defendants (Nestler, Emily) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit First Amended Answer | ||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument*
Tue 03/21 2:21 PM
Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re14 MOTION Motion to Deem Certain Allegations in the Complaint Admitted Under Fed.R.Civ.Pro. 8(B)(6) or, In The Alternative, to Take a Limited Fed.R.Civ.Pro. 30(B)(6) Deposition (WBar) |
|
notice
Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled
Tue 03/21 2:20 PM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Scheduling Conference on 3/24/2017 is Cancelled. (WBar) |
||
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Motion - Free
Mon 03/20 11:12 AM
MOTION Motion to Deem Certain Allegations in the Complaint Admitted Under Fed.R.Civ.Pro. 8(B)(6) or, In The Alternative, to Take a Limited Fed.R.Civ.Pro. 30(B)(6) Deposition by All Plaintiffs. (Damren, Samuel) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 02/21 3:47 PM
Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Scheduling Conference reset for 3/24/2017 09:30 AM before District Judge John Corbett O'Meara, or file Rule 26(f) Plan. (WBar) |
||
Thursday, February 09, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Appear*
Thu 02/09 1:43 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 3/3/2017 09:30 AM before District Judge John Corbett O'Meara, or file Rule 26(f) Plan. (WBar) |
|
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 02/06 4:41 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants. (Nestler, Emily) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Appearance
Mon 02/06 4:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Emily B. Nestler on behalf of All Defendants. (Nestler, Emily) |
|
Tuesday, January 03, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 01/03 10:39 AM
STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time to Answer1 Complaint; Responsive Pleading due by 2/6/2017, Signed by District Judge John Corbett O'Meara. (WBar) |
|
Friday, December 30, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Appearance
Fri 12/30 11:20 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Derri T. Thomas on behalf of Customers and Border Protection, Department of Homeland Security. (Thomas, Derri) |
|
Thursday, December 15, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued for US Attorney/Attorney General*
Thu 12/15 11:53 AM
SUMMONS Issued for the United States Attorney and the Office of the Attorney General. (LGra) |
|
Wednesday, November 30, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued*
Wed 11/30 11:25 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Department of Homeland Security* (LGra) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued*
Wed 11/30 11:24 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Customers and Border Protection* (LGra) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Appearance
Wed 11/30 10:25 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Corey Q. Wheaton on behalf of Dr. Elizabeth Oglesby, Dr. Geoffrey Alan Boyce, Michigan Immigrant Rights Center. (Wheaton, Corey) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Attorney Appearance
Wed 11/30 10:11 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Miriam J. Aukerman appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Aukerman, Miriam) |
|
3 | 3
trial
Exhibit
Wed 11/30 9:03 AM
EXHIBIT re1 Complaint,, by All Plaintiffs (Damren, Samuel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit I (1/12/16 Howard Letter), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit J (2/29/16 Appeal Letter), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit K (5/9/16 Closure Letter), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit L (9/30/16 Suzuki Letter), | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit M (10/21/15 Email), | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit N (10/30/15 Email), | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit O (10/26/16 Aukerman Email), | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit P (2/26/16 Plaintiffs' Letter) | ||
2 | 2
trial
Exhibit
Wed 11/30 8:58 AM
EXHIBIT re1 Complaint,, by All Plaintiffs |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit B (Cover email), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit C (7/13/15 resubmission of FOIA request), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit D (FOIA Receipt), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit E (10/6/15 email), | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit F (10/14/15 Aukerman Leter), | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit G (10/21/15 (email), | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit H (11/19/15 Aukerman Letter)) (Damren, Samuel | ||
1 | 1
27
pgs
cmp
Civil Case - Complaint
Wed 11/30 8:51 AM
COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-5979051 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Damren, Samuel) |
|
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 21 pgs Exhibit A (5/21/15 FOIA Request) | ||
notice
Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option
Wed 11/30 11:23 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (LGra) |