Yvonne Howell v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen V Wilson |
Referred: | Alka Sagar |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-08866 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Nov 30, 2016 |
Terminated: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday May 29, 2017 2:23 AM PDT |
Defendant
Cedar-Sinai Medical Center
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yvonne Howell
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Dismissing Case
Wed 03/22 2:59 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to the parties' Stipulation for Dismissal of Action with Prejudice and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), this action shall be, and hereby is, dismissed with prejudice in its entirety as to all claims and parties. Each party shall bear its own attorney's fees and costs. (Case Terminated. Made JS-6.) (cr) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
stip
Dismiss Case
Mon 03/20 5:35 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Settlement filed by Defendants Cedar-Sinai Medical Center, Does, Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston.(Russum, Blake) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Settlement
Fri 03/17 11:02 AM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Defendants Cedar-Sinai Medical Center, Does, Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Russum, Blake) |
|
Wednesday, January 25, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
Wed 01/25 2:22 PM
CIVIL TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) |
|
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 01/25 9:36 AM
MINUTES OF NEW CASE STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Simultaneous filing of Opening Briefs due April 3, 2017; Simultaneous filing of Response Briefs due April 13, 2017. Bench Trial set for 4/18/2017 at 09:00 AM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Court Reporter: N/A. (mrgo) |
|
Thursday, January 05, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B)
Thu 01/05 2:01 PM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A),16 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The document is accepted as filed. (ah) |
|
Wednesday, January 04, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
Wed 01/04 4:42 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service (subsequent documents)15 . The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bp) |
|
Friday, December 30, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Fri 12/30 9:16 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Cedar-Sinai Medical Center, Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, re Answer to Complaint14 served on December 30, 2016. (Russum, Blake) |
|
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 12/30 8:57 AM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition13 filed by Defendants Cedar-Sinai Medical Center, Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston.(Russum, Blake) |
|
Friday, December 23, 2016 | ||
13 | 13
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Fri 12/23 3:29 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Plaintiff All Parties amending Amended Complaint,, filed by plaintiff Yvonne Howell(Attorney Jeremy Robert Schwartz added to party Yvonne Howell(pty:pla))(Schwartz, Jeremy) |
|
Monday, December 19, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order
Mon 12/19 11:05 AM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DISMISSING STATE LAW CAUSES OF ACTION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, re Stipulation to Amend/Correct8 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants shall file their initial response to plaintiff's amended pleading alleging two cause of action under the ERISA civil enforcement section on or before 1/13/17. (mrgo) |
|
Friday, December 16, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Fri 12/16 3:12 PM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 1/23/2017 st 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) |
|
10 | 10
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 12/16 3:07 PM
NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) |
|
Thursday, December 15, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program
Thu 12/15 9:33 AM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:16-cv-08866 SVW(ASx). (rn) |
|
Friday, December 09, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
stip
Amend/Correct
Fri 12/09 2:07 PM
STIPULATION to Amend Amended Complaint, filed by Defendants Cedar-Sinai Medical Center, Does, Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston.(Russum, Blake) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, December 06, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Notice to Counsel (CV-14) Reminder re MJ Civil Consent Pilot Project-optional html form
Tue 12/06 9:19 AM
REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (sbou) |
|
Monday, December 05, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Mon 12/05 3:02 PM
First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by Defendants Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, Does, Cedar-Sinai Medical Center.(Attorney Blake J Russum added to party Does(pty:dft))(Russum, Blake) |
|
Friday, December 02, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Fri 12/02 12:01 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 . The following error(s) was found: Attachment to the notice of removal is labeled as Attachment 1, Exhibit A - Complaint in error. There is no complaint only the First Amended Complaint which is also attached as attachment 2 Exhibit B. (car) |
|
Thursday, December 01, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form
Thu 12/01 5:10 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (car) |
|
Att: 1 CV-11C | ||
Wednesday, November 30, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 11/30 3:07 PM
Defendants' NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Cedar-Sinai Medical Center, Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, identifying Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc; LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc.; Liberty Mutual Group Inc; Liberty Mutual Insurance Company; and Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company;. (Russum, Blake) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 11/30 2:47 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Cedar-Sinai Medical Center, Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Russum, Blake) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 11/30 2:45 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number BC634460 Receipt No: 0973-18974654 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, Cedar-Sinai Medical Center. (Attorney Blake J Russum added to party Cedar-Sinai Medical Center(pty:dft), Attorney Blake J Russum added to party Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston(pty:dft))(Russum, Blake) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - First Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration Paula McGee, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 6 Proof of Service | ||
othcmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 12/01 5:06 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Cedar-Sinai Medical Center, Does, Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston amending Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , filed by Plaintiff Yvonne Howell. Filed in State Court on 10/26/16 Submitted with attachment 2 to Notice of Removal(car) |