TAYLOR v. BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Susan D Wigenton |
Referred: | Leda D Wettre |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-08906 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Nov 30, 2016 |
Terminated: | Apr 07, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday May 29, 2017 4:50 AM EDT |
Defendant
BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BAYER OY
|
|
Defendant
BAYER PHARMA AG
|
|
Plaintiff
CRYSTAL TAYLOR
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation (public)
Mon 05/01 2:03 PM
Case transferred from New Jersey has been opened in Southern District of New York as case 1:17-cv-03169, filed 05/01/2017. (mfr) |
||
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
mdl
MDL Transfer Order (out)
Tue 04/11 11:39 AM
Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the Southern District of New York. (ek) |
|
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District Court Transfer
Tue 04/11 11:40 AM
Case extracted via ECF to the Southern District of New York. (ek) |
||
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 02/17 10:05 AM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone/Status Conference set for 4/24/2017 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Amended Pleadings due by 4/7/2017. Fact Discovery due by 10/15/2017. Joinder of Parties due by 4/7/2017; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 2/16/17. (DD, ) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Amended Document (NOT Motion/Complaint)
Fri 02/10 4:38 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. Amendment to7 Corporate Disclosure Statement . (DOTRO, LORNA) |
|
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order
Wed 02/08 1:56 PM
TEXT ORDER - The Court shall issue a Pretrial Scheduling Order based on the parties joint discovery plan. Accordingly, counsel need not appear for the telephonic initial scheduling conference set for 2/9/2016, at 12:00 noon.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 2/8/2017. (kd) |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
discov
Joint Discovery Plan
Tue 02/07 11:05 AM
Joint Discovery Plan by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..(DOTRO, LORNA) |
|
Friday, January 27, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order
Fri 01/27 12:32 PM
TEXT ORDER - Converting an In Person Scheduling Conference to a Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/9/2017 at 12:00 pm. Once all parties are on the phone, please call Chambers at (973) 645-3574.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 1/27/2017. (kd) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
minutes
Settlement Conference
Thu 01/19 11:52 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre: Settlement Conference held on 1/18/2017. (kd) |
||
Tuesday, January 03, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Tue 01/03 2:16 PM
LETTER ORDER - A Scheduling Conference set for 1/3/2017 at 12:00 PM in Newark - Courtroom 4A before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre.Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 1/3/2017. (kd) |
|
Tuesday, December 27, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 12/27 2:50 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (DOTRO, LORNA) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 12/27 2:49 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..(DOTRO, LORNA) |
|
Tuesday, December 13, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order
Wed 12/14 8:47 AM
CONSENT ORDER dismissing Pltf's Request for Punitive Damages, w/prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan D. Wigenton on 12/13/16. (DD, ) |
|
Monday, December 12, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Letter
Mon 12/12 10:36 AM
Letter from Louis F. D'Onofrio enclosing Consent Order. (D'ONOFRIO, HEATHER) |
|
Thursday, December 08, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 12/13 10:43 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by CRYSTAL TAYLOR. BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. served on 12/7/2016, answer due 12/28/2016. (seb) |
|
Thursday, December 01, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 12/01 12:54 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BAYER OY, BAYER PHARMA AG Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *CHRISTINE MELILLO* (cm ) |
|
Wednesday, November 30, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 12/01 12:52 PM
COMPLAINT against BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BAYER OY, BAYER PHARMA AG ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7509500) with JURY DEMAND, filed by CRYSTAL TAYLOR.(cm ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |