Farnham v. Federal National Mortgage Association et al
Montana District Court | |
Judge: | Sam E Haddon |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-00060 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1442 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Dec 01, 2016 |
Terminated: | Apr 13, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday May 30, 2017 2:49 AM MDT |
Defendant
Federal National Mortgage Association
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
First American Title Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mughtowne Property
|
|
Defendant
Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sheri Farnham
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 40 minutes ago |
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
utility
Remark
Mon 04/17 10:53 AM
Remark. Sent to Gallatin County District Court hard copies of USDC case filings with docket sheet along with Gallatin County District Court's case register report with filings. (ELL) |
||
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion to Remand
Thu 04/13 3:16 PM
ORDER granting17 Motion to Remand Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 4/13/2017. (DED) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Remand
Wed 04/12 2:19 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Remand for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Michelle Millhollin Sullivan appearing for Defendants Federal National Mortgage Association, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (Sullivan, Michelle) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/07 12:07 PM
ANSWER to5 Complaint, by First American Title Company. (Dockery, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Tue 04/04 1:32 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Mughtowne Property Co. (ELL) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Entry of Default
Mon 04/03 5:40 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default Mark Lewis Evans appearing for Plaintiff Sheri Farnham (Evans, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Mark L. Evans | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/03 2:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kelsey E. Bunkers on behalf of First American Title Company (Bunkers, Kelsey) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT
Wed 03/29 4:00 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERPreliminary Pretrial Statement due by 5/15/2017. Joint Discovery Plan due by 5/15/2017. Pretrial Conference set for 5/24/2017 at 11:00 AM in Helena, MT before Judge Sam E Haddon. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 3/29/2017. (ELL) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order
Wed 03/29 3:58 PM
ORDERED: Plaintiff forthwith shall take all steps necessary and appropriate to either move for default of Defendants Mughtowne Property Co. and First American Title Company, LLC or to dismiss them from the case. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 3/29/2017. (ELL) |
|
Sunday, March 05, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT
Sun 03/05 2:39 PM
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Federal National Mortgage Association, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (Sullivan, Michelle) |
|
Thursday, March 02, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Affidavit of Service
Thu 03/02 4:09 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint & Notice of Removal served on First American Title Company, LLC on February 22, 2017, filed by Sheri Farnham. (Evans, Mark) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Affidavit of Service
Mon 02/27 2:57 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint & Notice of Removal served on Mughtowne Property Co. on February 22, 2017, filed by Sheri Farnham. (Evans, Mark) |
|
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Lis Pendens
Fri 02/24 4:32 PM
NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Sheri Farnham (Evans, Mark) |
|
Wednesday, January 04, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order
Wed 01/04 3:10 PM
ORDERED. Plaintiff forthwith shall take all steps necessary to effect service upon Defendants Mughtowne Property Co. and First American Title Company, LLC on or before 3/1/17. Proof of such service shall be filed on or before 3/15/17. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 1/4/2017. (ELL) |
|
Sunday, December 11, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Complaint - SDM
Sun 12/11 3:06 PM
COMPLAINT against Federal National Mortgage Association, First American Title Company, Mughtowne Property, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, filed by Sheri Farnham. (Originally filed with MT 18th Judicial District, Gallatin County on 9/28/16 as Cause No. DV-16-723C) (ELL) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Sun 12/11 3:04 PM
NOTICE of filing of State Court Case Register Report. (ELL) |
|
Thursday, December 01, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 12/01 4:06 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal National Mortgage Association, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Sullivan, Michelle) |
|
2 | 2
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 12/01 4:06 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Federal National Mortgage Association, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Sullivan, Michelle) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal - SDM
Thu 12/01 3:25 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, Federal National Mortgage Association from Montana Eighteenth Judicial District Court, Gallatin County, case number DV-16-723C., filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, Federal National Mortgage Association. (ELL, ) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Thu 12/01 3:28 PM
Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-1874072 (ELL, ) |