Covington v. Lassiter et al
North Carolina Western District Court | |
Judge: | Frank D Whitney |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-00387 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Dec 01, 2016 |
Terminated: | Sep 01, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Declaration
Tue 09/12 5:37 PM
DECLARATION of Karl L. Covington, Jr. in Support of Motion for an Order for Production of Document filed by Karl L. Covington, Jr. (khm) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
30 | 30
misc
Declaration
Tue 09/12 5:35 PM
DECLARATION of Karl L. Covington, Jr. in Support of Exhibit J and Opposition to Defendants' Statement of Facts filed by Karl L. Covington, Jr.(khm) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
order
Judgment - Clerk
Fri 09/01 2:27 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 9/1/17. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc) |
|
28 | 28
13
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Order on Motion for TRO Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim
Fri 09/01 2:24 PM
ORDER Plaintiffs action is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to exhaust administrative remedies. Denying 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 8 Motion for TRO; granting 21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 8/29/17. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 08/23 6:51 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim "and Affirmative Statements" by Karl L. Covington, Jr. Replies due by 8/30/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail. (ejb) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Miscellaneous Filing
Tue 08/22 10:23 AM
Return Receipts re: certified mailing of24 Roseboro Order. (kby) |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Wed 08/16 2:14 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Karl L. Covington, Jr. to #1401412, Lanesboro Correctional Institution, P. O. Box 280, Polkton, NC 28135. (ni) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order Setting Response Deadline
Mon 08/14 9:17 AM
ROSEBORO ORDER Setting Response Deadline re: 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Pla shall respond to the pending Motion to Dismiss within 14 days of entry of this Order plus an additional 3 days if served by mail. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 8/13/2017. (Pro se litigant served via Certified US Mail.)(kby) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 08/04 3:21 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Christian Crawford, Kenneth E. Lassiter, Keith Turner.(Grande, Kimberly) |
|
22 | 22
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Fri 08/04 3:19 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Response in opposition to request for preliminary injunction by Christian Crawford, Kenneth E. Lassiter, Keith Turner. (Grande, Kimberly) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim
Fri 08/04 3:16 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Christian Crawford, Kenneth E. Lassiter, Keith Turner. Responses due by 8/18/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Grande, Kimberly) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 08/04 3:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Dawn Grande on behalf of Christian Crawford, Kenneth E. Lassiter, Keith Turner (Grande, Kimberly) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Letter
Thu 08/03 11:10 AM
Letter from Karl L. Covington, Jr. re8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction/TRO by Karl L. Covington, Jr.(khm) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 07/07 3:50 PM
ORDER granting 16 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants up to and including 8/7/2017. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 07/07/2017. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(thh) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 07/07 9:22 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re:1 Complaint,, by Christian Crawford, Kenneth E. Lassiter, Keith Turner. (Hill, Tammera) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/07 9:15 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Tammera Sudderth Hill on behalf of Christian Crawford, Kenneth E. Lassiter, Keith Turner (Hill, Tammera) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Compel
Thu 06/29 11:07 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER denying 12 Motion to Compel Text of Order: Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Defendants to Produce the Prison's Policy for Disciplinary Purposes is DENIED as premature because the period for the parties to obtain discovery has not commenced. So Ordered. Entered by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 6/29/2017. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eel) |
||
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
service
Summons Issued
Fri 06/09 5:18 PM
Summons Issued Electronically to US Marshal for service as to Christian Crawford, Kenneth E. Lassiter, Keith Turner.(khm) |
|
Att: 1 USM-285s | ||
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Fri 05/19 7:27 PM
ORDER that (1) Pltf's 1 Complaint survives initial review; (2) Pltf's 7 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED at this time because it is premature; (3) Clerk to send Pltf summons forms to fill out, and once Court receives summons forms, U.S. Marshal shall effectuate service on Defts in accordance with Rule 4 of FRCivP. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 5/19/17. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Compel
Thu 05/04 5:08 PM
MOTION to Compel Policy for Disciplinary Purposes by Karl L. Covington, Jr. Responses due by 5/15/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail(kby) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order Directing Monthly Prisoner Payment
Tue 04/18 2:47 PM
ORDER Waiving the Initial Filing Fee and Directing Monthly Payments to be made from the Prison Account of Karl L. Covington, Jr. Directing the correctional facility to transmit monthly payments.. Signed by the Clerk of Court on 4/18/2017. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(lhg) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Mon 04/17 7:44 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (Sealed - Court) as to Karl L. Covington, Jr., submitted by NC DPS. (ejb) |
|
Tuesday, January 03, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Preliminary Injunction Temporary Restraining Order
Thu 01/05 3:45 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction/TRO by Karl L. Covington, Jr. Responses due by 1/17/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail(khm) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Friday, December 16, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Summary Judgment
Fri 12/16 8:16 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Karl L. Covington, Jr. (ejb) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Tuesday, December 13, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Prisoner Admin Remedy Statement
Fri 12/16 8:11 PM
Prisoner Admin Remedy Statement by Karl L. Covington, Jr.(ejb) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Monday, December 05, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order for Prisoner Trust Account Statement
Mon 12/05 11:03 AM
ORDER for Prisoner Trust Account Statement of Plaintiff. Administrative Remedy Statement IS Requested.. Signed by the Clerk of Court on 12/5/2016. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(lhg) |
|
Friday, December 02, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Memorandum/Brief
Mon 12/05 11:22 AM
MEMORANDUM/BRIEF in Support of plf's Preliminary Injunction and TRO by Karl L. Covington, Jr re:1 Complaint (Attachment 15-Proposed Order).(cbb) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
4 | 4
misc
Declaration
Mon 12/05 11:14 AM
DECLARATION of Karl L. Covington, Jr. [1-15] Proposed Order attached to1 Complaint filed by Karl L. Covington, Jr(cbb) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Thursday, December 01, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Affidavit - 1983 Application IFP
Fri 12/02 1:54 PM
AFFIDAVIT - 1983 Application IFP (Sealed - Participants) re1 Complaint by Karl L. Covington, Jr(cbb) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration in Support of IFP Motion | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 12/02 12:40 PM
COMPLAINT against Christian Crawford, Kenneth E. Lassiter, Keith Turner (Filing fee $ 0), filed by Karl L. Covington, Jr.(cbb) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration in Support of Exhaustion of Grievance Remedies, | ||
Att: 2 Letter/Grievance - Step 1, | ||
Att: 3 Letter/Grievance - Step 2,3, | ||
Att: 4 Cover Letter, | ||
Att: 5 Declaration in Support of Evidence, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit A-1, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit A-2, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 13 Customer Maintenance, | ||
Att: 14 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 15 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 16 Envelope | ||
notice
ECF - Wrong Division Error
Fri 12/02 3:01 PM
NOTICE: Case was filed in wrong division. Case has been copied from 5:16CV213 to 1:16CV387. Please use 1:16CV387 for all future pleadings. (cbb) |