California Central District Court
Judge:Percy Anderson
Referred: Rozella A Oliver
Case #: 2:16-cv-08965
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Dec 02, 2016
Terminated:Apr 17, 2017
Last checked: Wednesday May 31, 2017 2:12 AM PDT
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Martinez
Represented By
Geoffrey R Plowden
Los Angeles City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Charlie Beck
Represented By
Geoffrey R Plowden
Los Angeles City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
City of Los Angeles
Represented By
Geoffrey R Plowden
Los Angeles City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Raul Pedroza
Represented By
Geoffrey R Plowden
Los Angeles City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Jasmyne Cannick
Represented By
Robert Stanford Brown
Robert Stanford Brown Apc
contact info
Nana Gyamfi
Law Office Of Nana Gyamfi
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/28/2021 11:59 PM PST
Monday, April 17, 2017
35 35 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 04/18 12:17 PM
MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge Percy Anderson. For reasons stated on the record, the Court grants plaintiff's oral motion to dismiss her federal claims without prejudice. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) Court Reporter: Cindy Nirenberg. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2017
34 34 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Fri 03/31 1:29 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court continues the Scheduling Conference, currently on calendar for April 3, 2017, to April 17, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
33 33 testxtonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 03/31 8:54 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Percy Anderson: On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference22 currently set for 04/03/2017 at 10:30 am is hereby VACATED. No appearances are necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 28, 2017
32 32 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 03/28 1:06 PM
Second CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Charlie Beck, Martinez, Raul Pedroza, (Plowden, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
31 31 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 03/28 1:05 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition25 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Charlie Beck, Martinez, Raul Pedroza.(Attorney Geoffrey R Plowden added to party Charlie Beck(pty:dft), Attorney Geoffrey R Plowden added to party Martinez(pty:dft), Attorney Geoffrey R Plowden added to party Raul Pedroza(pty:dft))(Plowden, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2017
30 30 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Fri 03/17 12:28 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Plaintiff Jasmyne Cannick.. (Brown, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2017
29 29 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 03/15 11:23 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jasmyne Cannick, upon Defendant Martinez served on 3/7/2017, answer due 3/28/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Officer Ugarte, Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brown, Robert)
Related: [-]
28 28 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 03/15 11:19 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jasmyne Cannick, upon Defendant Raul Pedroza served on 3/6/2017, answer due 3/27/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Shanice Williams, Authorized Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brown, Robert)
Related: [-]
27 27 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 03/15 11:10 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jasmyne Cannick, upon Defendant Charlie Beck served on 3/6/2017, answer due 3/27/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Diane Hassien, Senior Administrative Clerk in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brown, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2017
26 26 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 03/09 10:11 AM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition25 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles.(Plowden, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2017
25 25 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Thu 02/23 11:51 PM
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant City of Los Angeles amending Amended Complaint/Petition5 , filed by Plaintiff Jasmyne Cannick(Brown, Robert)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Order Thu 02/23 3:22 PM
ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR FILING SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Percy Anderson, re Stipulation to Amend/Correct23 . Based on the written stipulation of the parties and good cause appearing to support it, Plaintiff may file an amended Complaint in the form of the Second Amended Complaint attached as Exhibit A. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 21, 2017
23 23 stip Amend/Correct Tue 02/21 11:27 PM
STIPULATION to Amend Amended Complaint/Petition5 filed by Plaintiff Jasmyne Cannick.(Brown, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Friday, February 17, 2017
22 22 order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Fri 02/17 2:24 PM
SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)]; SCHEDULING CONFERENCE set for April 3, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. [FRCP 26(f)] by Judge Percy Anderson: This action has been assigned to the calendar of United States District Judge Percy Anderson. The responsibility for the progress of litigation in the federal courts falls not only upon the attorneys in the action, but upon the court as well. Please refer to the Court's order for specifics. (cr)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Order Fri 02/17 2:21 PM
STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE ND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. Both the Court and the attorneys bear responsibility for the progress of litigation in the Federal Courts. To secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action, Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, all counsel are ordered to familiarize themselves with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of the Central District of California. Please refer to the Court's order for specifics. (cr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2017
20 20 cs_rasgn Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV 89) Thu 02/16 3:41 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:16-cv-08965 PA(RAOx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 13, 2017
19 19 stip Amend/Correct Mon 02/13 10:50 AM
STIPULATION to Amend Amended Complaint/Petition5 filed by Plaintiff Jasmyne Cannick.(Brown, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Friday, February 10, 2017
18 18 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Fri 02/10 1:22 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Scheduling Conference set for 5/1/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (cj)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 06, 2017
17 17 notice Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Mon 02/06 1:11 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Gail J Standish to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:16-cv-08965 CAS (RAOx). (esa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 19, 2017
16 16 service Summons Issued Thu 01/19 2:30 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition5 as to Defendant Martinez. (ec)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons Issued Thu 01/19 2:29 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition5 as to Defendant Raul Pedroza. (ec)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Issued Thu 01/19 2:27 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition5 as to Defendant Charlie Beck. (ec)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Summons Request Thu 01/19 1:34 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition5 filed by Plaintiff Jasmyne Cannick. (Brown, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 10, 2017
12 12 notice Summons Request Tue 01/10 1:01 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition5 filed by Plaintiff Jasmyne Cannick. (Brown, Robert)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Summons Request Tue 01/10 12:57 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition5 filed by Plaintiff Jasmyne Cannick. (Brown, Robert)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 08, 2017
10 10 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Sun 01/08 8:25 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles, (Plowden, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Sun 01/08 8:22 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition5 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles.(Attorney Geoffrey R Plowden added to party City of Los Angeles(pty:dft))(Plowden, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 29, 2016
8 8 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 12/29 7:09 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jasmyne Cannick, upon Defendant City of Los Angeles served on 12/20/2016, answer due 1/10/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Michael Valdivia in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brown, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 13, 2016
7 7 service Summons Issued Tue 12/13 9:58 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint5 as to Defendant City of Los Angeles. (ec)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2016
6 6 notice Summons Request Mon 12/12 4:27 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition5 filed by Plaintiff Jasmyne Cannick. (Brown, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 06, 2016
5 5 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Tue 12/06 11:21 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Jasmyne Cannick amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by Plaintiff Jasmyne Cannick(Brown, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 05, 2016
4 4 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form Mon 12/05 2:49 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (car)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 11-C
Friday, December 02, 2016
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 12/02 8:16 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jasmyne Cannick, (Brown, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 12/02 8:13 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jasmyne Cannick. (Brown, Robert)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 12/02 7:52 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-18992256 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Jasmyne Cannick. (Attorney Robert Stanford Brown added to party Jasmyne Cannick(pty:pla))(Brown, Robert)
Related: [-]