Cook Productions, LLC v. Does 1 through 8
Hawaii District Court | |
Judge: | Helen Gillmor |
Referred: | Rom Trader |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-00637 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Dec 02, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jan 04, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday May 30, 2017 11:38 PM HST |
Defendant
Doe Defendant 1
|
|
Defendant
Doe Defendant 7
|
|
Defendant
Erik Gray
|
|
Defendant
Robert Lujan
|
|
Defendant
Stanley Szerlip
|
|
Plaintiff
Cook Productions, LLC
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Does 1 through 8
Terminated: 02/27/2017
|
|
Defendant
Doe Defendant 2
Terminated: 03/28/2017
|
|
Defendant
Doe Defendant 3
Terminated: 03/24/2017
|
|
Defendant
Doe Defendant 4
Terminated: 03/27/2017
|
|
Defendant
Doe Defendant 5
Terminated: 03/20/2017
|
|
Defendant
Doe Defendant 6
Terminated: 03/17/2017
|
|
Defendant
Doe Defendant 8
Terminated: 02/24/2017
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 13, 2024 | ||
100 | 100
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 03/13 1:17 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cook Productions, LLC re99 Order,, Set Hearings, Service of Garnishee Summons on Garnishee and Defendant (Culpepper, Kerry) |
|
99 | 99
4
pgs
order
Order 2 - Set Hearings
Wed 03/13 12:23 PM
GARNISHEE SUMMONS re97 ,98 (Hawaii Community Federal Credit Union) Garnishee Summons Return Date Hearing set for 4/18/2024 11:00 AM by Telephone before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. (jni) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" | ||
98 | 98
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 03/13 12:15 PM
ORDER GRANTING THIRD EX PARTE MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF GARNISHEE SUMMONS AFTER JUDGMENT re97 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 3/13/2024. (jni) |
|
misc
Court's Certificate of Service
Wed 03/13 12:33 PM
COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of98 Order Granting Third Ex Parte Motion for Issuance of Garnishee Summons After Judgment, and99 Garnishee Summons has been served by First Class Mail to Hawaii Community Federal Credit Union, 75-159 Hualalai Road, Kailua-Kona, HI 96740 on 3/13/2024. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (jni) |