Total Cable USA LLC
New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Alan S Trust |
Case #: | 8:16-bk-75603 |
Case Filed: | Dec 03, 2016 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jan 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 25, 2017 |
Debtor
Total Cable USA LLC
15 West Moylan Lane Coram, New York
New York, NY 11727 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Robert L. Pryor
Pryor & Mandelup LLP 675 Old Country Road
Westbury, NY 11590 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Long Island Federal Courthouse 560 Federal Plaza - Room 560
Central Islip, NY 11722 |
Docket last updated: 12/04/2016 9:08 PM EST |
Saturday, December 03, 2016 | ||
crditcrd
Automatic docket of credit card/debit card
Sat 12/03 3:22 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(8 16-75603 [misc,volp7a] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 14958734. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
misc
Judge - Trustee - 341 Meeting Assignment (Chapter 7 Business No Asset) (Auto Assign)
Sat 12/03 9:58 PM
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 Business & Appointment of Chapter 7 Trustee, Robert L. Pryor, , 341(a) |
||
1 | 1
3
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Sat 12/03 3:20 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non Individuals. Fee Amount $335 Filed by Satish K Bhatia on behalf of Total Cable USA LLC (Bhatia, Satish) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Exhibit
Sat 12/03 3:24 PM
Exhibit D Filed by Satish K Bhatia on behalf of Total Cable USA LLC (Bhatia, Satish) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Credit Counseling
Sat 12/03 3:25 PM
First Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Total Cable USA LLC Filed by Satish K Bhatia on behalf of Total Cable USA LLC (Bhatia, Satish) |