Elizarraras v. Walgreens Co. et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Gregory A Presnell |
Referred: | Karla R Spaulding |
Case #: | 6:16-cv-02093 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Dec 05, 2016 |
Terminated: | Mar 07, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 03, 2017 6:25 AM EDT |
Defendant
Walgreens Co.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria Elizarraras
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Zurich American Insurance Company
Terminated: 12/15/2016
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Zurich American Insurance Company of Illinois
Terminated: 12/15/2016
|
Represented By
|
1. | Lawsuit filed alleging man died of emotional distress after being forced to clean Walgreens bathroom (pix11.com) |
Submitted Thu 12/08/2016 | |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order dismissing case
Wed 03/22 9:44 AM
ENDORSED ORDER dismissing case with prejudice re 31 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/22/2017. (TKW) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 03/21 3:55 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Walgreens Co.. (Coleman, James) |
|
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order dismissing case
Tue 03/07 12:18 PM
ORDER dismissing case without prejudice re 29 Mediation report. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 3/7/2017. (TKW) |
|
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
adr
Mediation report
Mon 03/06 12:07 PM
MEDIATION report Hearing held on March 3, 2017. Hearing outcome: Settled.. (Berlanga-Helms, Dawn) |
|
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
answer
Answer to amended complaint
Fri 02/24 11:18 AM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to 27 Amended Complaint by Walgreens Co..(Coleman, James) |
|
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 02/23 11:19 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Walgreens Co. with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs.(Valle, Richard) |
|
26 | 26
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Thu 02/23 10:44 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 22 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 2/23/2017. (Presnell, Gregory) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order to strike
Fri 02/17 11:11 AM
ORDER to strike re: 20 Notice of Service of Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents to Defendant filed by Maria Elizarraras, 21 Notice of Service of Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories filed by Maria Elizarraras, 23 Notice of Service of Plaintiffs' Insurance Interrogatories filed by Maria Elizarraras. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 2/17/2017. (ECJ) |
|
24 | 24
order
Order to strike
Fri 02/17 11:09 AM
ORDER to strike re: 19 Response to Defendant's Affirmative Defenses filed by Maria Elizarraras. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 2/17/2017. (ECJ) |
|
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 02/16 12:55 PM
NOTICE by Maria Elizarraras SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS' INSURANCE INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT (Valle, Richard) |
|
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Leave to File Document
Wed 02/15 4:39 PM
Consent MOTION for leave to file Amended Complaint by All Plaintiffs.(Valle, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 02/15 3:52 PM
NOTICE by Maria Elizarraras (Valle, Richard) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 02/15 3:50 PM
NOTICE by Maria Elizarraras (Valle, Richard) |
|
19 | 19
respoth
Response
Wed 02/15 3:49 PM
RESPONSE re8 Answer to Complaint Affirmative Defenses filed by Maria Elizarraras. (Valle, Richard) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of mediation conference/hearing
Fri 01/20 3:51 PM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 3-3-17 at 1:30 pm before Dawn Berlanga-Helms. (Coleman, James) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
utility
Case Referred to Mediation
Thu 01/19 10:14 AM
CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Dawn Berlanga-Helms appointed as Mediator. (LMM) |
|
utility
Set/reset scheduling order deadlines - PUBLIC
Thu 01/19 10:13 AM
Set/reset scheduling order deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/17/2017, Joinder of Parties due by 3/17/2017, Discovery due by 10/2/2017, Dispositive motions due by 11/1/2017, Joint final Pretrial statement due by 2/9/2018, All other motions due by 2/23/2018, Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/8/2018 at 01:30 PM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell, Trial term begins 4/2/2018 at 09:15 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 A before Judge Gregory A. Presnell., Conduct mediation hearing by 11/1/2017. Lead counsel to coordinate dates., Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 8/14/2017, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 7/14/2017 (LMM) |
||
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Case management and scheduling order
Wed 01/18 10:12 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 1/18/2017. (TKW) |
|
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Case Management Report
Tue 01/17 10:28 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Coleman, James) |
|
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Response to order to show cause
Mon 01/09 10:52 AM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Maria Elizarraras. (Valle, Richard) |
|
Wednesday, January 04, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
Wed 01/04 3:11 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re5 Interested persons order by Maria Elizarraras. (Valle, Richard) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of pendency of related cases
Wed 01/04 3:07 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Maria Elizarraras. Related case(s): yes (Valle, Richard) |
|
Wednesday, December 28, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order to show cause
Wed 12/28 1:51 PM
ORDER for Plaintiff to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed, which may include dismissal of this case, for failure to respond to the Related Case Order and Interested Persons Order. Show Cause Response due by 1/10/2017. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 12/28/2016. Copies mailed.(LAM) |
|
Wednesday, December 14, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Wed 12/14 10:18 AM
ORDER re 9 Stipulation filed by Walgreens Co. that Plaintiff's claims against said Defendants are dismissed, each party to bear its own fees and costs. Any pending motions as to these Defendants are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 12/14/2016. (TKW) |
|
Monday, December 12, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Stipulation
Mon 12/12 3:25 PM
STIPULATION for Dismissal as to Defendants, Zurich American Insurance Company and Zurich American Insurance Company of Illinois by Walgreens Co.. (Coleman, James) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 12/12 3:21 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Walgreens Co..(Coleman, James) |
|
Wednesday, December 07, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
Wed 12/07 10:32 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re5 Interested persons order by Walgreens Co., Zurich American Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company of Illinois. (Coleman, James) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of pendency of related cases
Wed 12/07 10:30 AM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases re4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Walgreens Co., Zurich American Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company of Illinois. Related case(s): no (Coleman, James) |
|
Tuesday, December 06, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
order
Interested persons order
Tue 12/06 1:29 PM
INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/20/2016. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 12/6/2016. Copies mailed.(LAM) |
|
4 | 4
order
Related case order and track 2 notice
Tue 12/06 1:28 PM
RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/20/2016. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 12/6/2016. Copies mailed.(LAM) |
|
Monday, December 05, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 12/05 11:39 AM
NOTICE to adverse parties of filing1 Notice of Removal by Walgreens Co., Zurich American Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company of Illinois.(LMM) |
|
2 | 2
12
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 12/05 11:37 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Maria Elizarraras. Filed in State Court 10/14/16.(LMM) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 12/05 11:36 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Circuit Court, case number 2016-CA-9159-O filed in State Court on 10/14/16. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ORL-58852 filed by All Defendants.(LMM) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 |