Texas Western District Court
Judge:Robert Pitman
Case #: 1:16-cv-01270
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Dec 05, 2016
Last checked: Thursday Jan 19, 2017 3:42 AM CST
Amicus
Ken Paxton
Represented By
Prerak Shah
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Mary Abbott Martin
Member of the Board of Directors of the State Bar of Texas, in her official capacity 1414 Colorado St
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Rehan Alimohammad
Member of the Board of Directors of the State Bar of Texas, in his official capacity 1414 Colorado St
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Christy Amuny
Member of the Board of Directors of the State Bar of Texas, in her official capacity 1414 Colorado St
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Barbara R. Bass
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Micah Belden
Member of the Board of Directors of the State Bar of Texas, in his official capacity 1414 Colorado St
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Sylvia Borunda Firth
Member of the Board of Directors of the State Bar of Texas, in her official capacity 1414 Colorado St
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Amy Bryan
Member of the Board of Directors of the State Bar of Texas, in her official capacity 1414 Colorado St
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
H. Alan Carmichael
Member of the Board of Directors of the State Bar of Texas, in his official capacity 1414 Colorado St
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
E. Leon Carter
Member of the Board of Directors of the State Bar of Texas, in his official capacity 1414 Colorado St
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
David E. Chamberlain
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jeff Chandler
Member of the Board of Directors of the State Bar of Texas, in his official capacity 1414 Colorado St
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Allan K. DuBois
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Estrella Escobar
Member of the Board of Directors of the State Bar of Texas, in her official capacity 1414 Colorado St
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jose Escobedo Jr.
Member of the Board of Directors of the State Bar of Texas, in his official capacity 1414 Colorado St
Austin, CO 78701
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Laura Gibson
Member of the Board of Directors of the State Bar of Texas, in her official capacity 1414 Colorado St
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ricky G. Gonzalez
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ann Greenberg
Member of the Board of Directors of the State Bar of Texas, in her official capacity 1414 Colorado St
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
August W. Harris, III
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Angelica Hernandez
Member of the Board of Directors of the State Bar of Texas, in her official capacity 1414 Colorado St
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Joe Horkey Jr.
Member of the Board of Directors of the State Bar of Texas, in his official capacity 1414 Colorado St
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Sam Houston
Member of the Board of Directors of the State Bar of Texas, in his official capacity 1414 Colorado St
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Joseph Indelicato Jr.
Member of the Board of Directors of the State Bar of Texas, in his official capacity 1414 Colorado St
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
John V. Janosonius
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
John V. Jansonius
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Sarah Clower Keathley
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Rudolph K. Metayer
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Brian Miller
Member of the Board of Directors of the State Bar of Texas, in his official capacity 1414 Colorado St
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Gary L. Nickelson
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Christopher Oddo
Member of the Board of Directors of the State Bar of Texas, in his official capacity 1414 Colorado St
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Curtis Pritchard
Member of the Board of Directors of the State Bar of Texas, in his official capacity 1414 Colorado St
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Baili Rhodes
Member of the Board of Directors of the State Bar of Texas, in her official capacity 1414 Colorado St
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Lisa S. Richardson
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ruben S. Robles
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Fidel Rodriguez Jr.
Member of the Board of Directors of the State Bar of Texas, in his official capacity 1414 Colorado St
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Scott Rothenberg
Member of the Board of Directors of the State Bar of Texas, in his official capacity 1414 Colorado St
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Gregory W. Sampson
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Lance D. Sharp
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Scott Sherwood
Member of the Board of Directors of the State Bar of Texas, in his official capacity 1414 Colorado St
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Rebecca Simmons
Member of the Board of Directors of the State Bar of Texas, in her official capacity 1414 Colorado St
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Frank Stevenson
Member of the Board of Directors of the State Bar of Texas, in his official capacity 1414 Colorado Street
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Scott P. Stolley
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
C. Barrett Thomas
Member of the Board of Directors of the State Bar of Texas, in his official capacity 1414 Colorado St
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Andrew Tolchin
Member of the Board of Directors of the State Bar of Texas, in his official capacity 1414 Colorado St
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Travis Torrence
Member of the Board of Directors of the State Bar of Texas, in his official capacity 1414 Colorado St
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Tom Vick
Member of the Board of Directors of the State Bar of Texas, in his official capacity 1414 Colorado Street
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Bradley C. Weber
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Michael J. Wynne
Represented By
Thomas S. Leatherbury
Vinson & Elkins, L.L.P.
contact info
Joshua Stephen Johnson
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Sandra G. Rodriguez
Vinson & Elkins LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Greg Gegenheimer
3410 Far West Blvd #385
Austin, TX 78731
Represented By
William S. Consovoy
Consovoy Mccarthy Park PLLC
contact info
Jonathan F. Mitchell
James Otis Law Group, LLC
contact info


1. Racial Quotas at the Texas Bar Are Illegal and Unwise (wsj.com)
Submitted Fri 12/23/2016
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, February 17, 2017
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 3:11 PM
Text Order GRANTING36 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Robert Pitman. The deadline for Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's pending Motion for Summary Judgment34 is extended until 45 days after entry of the Court's Order ruling on Defendants' pending Motion to Dismiss24 . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Fri 3:14 PM
Text Order GRANTING35 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 15, 2017
41 41 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 10:47 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Mary Abbott Martin, Rehan Alimohammad, Christy Amuny, Barbara R. Bass, Micah Belden, Sylvia Borunda Firth, Amy Bryan, H. Alan Carmichael, E. Leon Carter, David E. Chamberlain, Jeff Chandler, Allan K. DuBois, Estrella Escobar, Jose Escobedo Jr., Laura Gibson, Ricky G. Gonzalez, Ann Greenberg, August W. Harris, III, Angelica Hernandez, Joe Horkey Jr., Sam Houston, Joseph Indelicato Jr., John V. Janosonius, John V. Jansonius, Sarah Clower Keathley, Rudolph K. Metayer, Brian Miller, Gary L. Nickelson, Christopher Oddo, Curtis Pritchard, Baili Rhodes, Lisa S. Richardson, Ruben S. Robles, Fidel Rodriguez Jr., Scott Rothenberg, Gregory W. Sampson, Lance D. Sharp, Scott Sherwood, Rebecca Simmons, Frank Stevenson, Scott P. Stolley, C. Barrett Thomas, Andrew Tolchin, Travis Torrence, Tom Vick, Bradley C. Weber, Michael J. Wynne, re36 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to34 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Sarah Clower Keathley, Defendant Andrew Tolchin, Defendant Rehan Alimohammad, Defendant Mary Abbott Martin, Defendant Rudolph K. Metayer, Defendant Christopher Oddo, Defendant H. Alan Carmichael, Defendant Scott Rothenberg, Defendant Sam Houston, Defendant Brian Miller, Defendant Scott P. Stolley, Defendant Sylvia Borunda Firth, Defendant Frank Stevenson, Defendant Jeff Chandler, Defendant John V. Jansonius, Defendant Joseph Indelicato Jr., Defendant David E. Chamberlain, Defendant Ruben S. Robles, Defendant C. Barrett Thomas, Defendant Christy Amuny, Defendant Ricky G. Gonzalez, Defendant Gary L. Nickelson, Defendant Lance D. Sharp, Defendant Angelica Hernandez, Defendant Travis Torrence, Defendant Gregory W. Sampson, Defendant Lisa S. Richardson, Defendant August W. Harris, III, Defendant Tom Vick, Defendant Laura Gibson, Defendant Estrella Escobar, Defendant Jose Escobedo Jr., Defendant Amy Bryan, Defendant Scott Sherwood, Defendant Bradley C. Weber, Defendant Fidel Rodriguez Jr., Defendant Barbara R. Bass, Defendant E. Leon Carter, Defendant Joe Horkey Jr., Defendant Micah Belden, Defendant Ann Greenberg, Defendant Curtis Pritchard, Defendant Rebecca Simmons, Defendant John V. Janosonius, Defendant Michael J. Wynne, Defendant Baili Rhodes, Defendant Allan K. DuBois (Rodriguez, Sandra)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Wed 9:09 AM
Text Order GRANTING38 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 14, 2017
40 40 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 4:47 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bill Davis on behalf of Ken Paxton. Attorney Bill Davis added to party Ken Paxton(pty:am) (Davis, Bill)
Related: [-]
39 39 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 4:23 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Greg Gegenheimer, re36 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to34 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Sarah Clower Keathley, Defendant Andrew Tolchin, Defendant Rehan Alimohammad, Defendant Mary Abbott Martin, Defendant Rudolph K. Metayer, Defendant Christopher Oddo, Defendant H. Alan Carmichael, Defendant Scott Rothenberg, Defendant Sam Houston, Defendant Brian Miller, Defendant Scott P. Stolley, Defendant Sylvia Borunda Firth, Defendant Frank Stevenson, Defendant Jeff Chandler, Defendant John V. Jansonius, Defendant Joseph Indelicato Jr., Defendant David E. Chamberlain, Defendant Ruben S. Robles, Defendant C. Barrett Thomas, Defendant Christy Amuny, Defendant Ricky G. Gonzalez, Defendant Gary L. Nickelson, Defendant Lance D. Sharp, Defendant Angelica Hernandez, Defendant Travis Torrence, Defendant Gregory W. Sampson, Defendant Lisa S. Richardson, Defendant August W. Harris, III, Defendant Tom Vick, Defendant Laura Gibson, Defendant Estrella Escobar, Defendant Jose Escobedo Jr., Defendant Amy Bryan, Defendant Scott Sherwood, Defendant Bradley C. Weber, Defendant Fidel Rodriguez Jr., Defendant Barbara R. Bass, Defendant E. Leon Carter, Defendant Joe Horkey Jr., Defendant Micah Belden, Defendant Ann Greenberg, Defendant Curtis Pritchard, Defendant Rebecca Simmons, Defendant John V. Janosonius, Defendant Michael J. Wynne, Defendant Baili Rhodes, Defendant Allan K. DuBois(Consovoy, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
38 38 motion Withdraw as Attorney Tue 1:31 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Prerak Shah by Ken Paxton.(Shah, Prerak)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, February 13, 2017
37 37 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 3:14 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott A. Keller on behalf of Ken Paxton. Attorney Scott A. Keller added to party Ken Paxton(pty:am) (Keller, Scott)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 08, 2017
36 36 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 4:21 PM
Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to34 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Mary Abbott Martin, Rehan Alimohammad, Christy Amuny, Barbara R. Bass, Micah Belden, Sylvia Borunda Firth, Amy Bryan, H. Alan Carmichael, E. Leon Carter, David E. Chamberlain, Jeff Chandler, Allan K. DuBois, Estrella Escobar, Jose Escobedo Jr., Laura Gibson, Ricky G. Gonzalez, Ann Greenberg, August W. Harris, III, Angelica Hernandez, Joe Horkey Jr., Sam Houston, Joseph Indelicato Jr., John V. Janosonius, John V. Jansonius, Sarah Clower Keathley, Rudolph K. Metayer, Brian Miller, Gary L. Nickelson, Christopher Oddo, Curtis Pritchard, Baili Rhodes, Lisa S. Richardson, Ruben S. Robles, Fidel Rodriguez Jr., Scott Rothenberg, Gregory W. Sampson, Lance D. Sharp, Scott Sherwood, Rebecca Simmons, Frank Stevenson, Scott P. Stolley, C. Barrett Thomas, Andrew Tolchin, Travis Torrence, Tom Vick, Bradley C. Weber, Michael J. Wynne.(Leatherbury, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Appendix
Tuesday, February 07, 2017
35 35 motion Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Tue 8:19 PM
Joint MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by Greg Gegenheimer. (Consovoy, William)
Related: [-]
34 34 motion Summary Judgment Tue 8:15 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Greg Gegenheimer.(Consovoy, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix
Monday, January 30, 2017
33 33 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 3:17 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Mary Abbott Martin, Rehan Alimohammad, Christy Amuny, Barbara R. Bass, Micah Belden, Sylvia Borunda Firth, Amy Bryan, H. Alan Carmichael, E. Leon Carter, David E. Chamberlain, Jeff Chandler, Allan K. DuBois, Estrella Escobar, Jose Escobedo Jr., Laura Gibson, Ricky G. Gonzalez, Ann Greenberg, August W. Harris, III, Angelica Hernandez, Joe Horkey Jr., Sam Houston, Joseph Indelicato Jr., John V. Janosonius, John V. Jansonius, Sarah Clower Keathley, Rudolph K. Metayer, Brian Miller, Gary L. Nickelson, Christopher Oddo, Curtis Pritchard, Baili Rhodes, Lisa S. Richardson, Ruben S. Robles, Fidel Rodriguez Jr., Scott Rothenberg, Gregory W. Sampson, Lance D. Sharp, Scott Sherwood, Rebecca Simmons, Frank Stevenson, Scott P. Stolley, C. Barrett Thomas, Andrew Tolchin, Travis Torrence, Tom Vick, Bradley C. Weber, Michael J. Wynne, re24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Sarah Clower Keathley, Defendant Andrew Tolchin, Defendant Rehan Alimohammad, Defendant Mary Abbott Martin, Defendant Rudolph K. Metayer, Defendant Christopher Oddo, Defendant H. Alan Carmichael, Defendant Scott Rothenberg, Defendant Sam Houston, Defendant Brian Miller, Defendant Scott P. Stolley, Defendant Sylvia Borunda Firth, Defendant Frank Stevenson, Defendant Jeff Chandler, Defendant John V. Jansonius, Defendant Joseph Indelicato Jr., Defendant David E. Chamberlain, Defendant Ruben S. Robles, Defendant C. Barrett Thomas, Defendant Christy Amuny, Defendant Ricky G. Gonzalez, Defendant Gary L. Nickelson, Defendant Lance D. Sharp, Defendant Angelica Hernandez, Defendant Travis Torrence, Defendant Gregory W. Sampson, Defendant Lisa S. Richardson, Defendant August W. Harris, III, Defendant Tom Vick, Defendant Laura Gibson, Defendant Estrella Escobar, Defendant Jose Escobedo Jr., Defendant Amy Bryan, Defendant Scott Sherwood, Defendant Bradley C. Weber, Defendant Fidel Rodriguez Jr., Defendant Barbara R. Bass, Defendant E. Leon Carter, Defendant Joe Horkey Jr., Defendant Micah Belden, Amicus Ken Paxton, Defendant Ann Greenberg, Defendant Curtis Pritchard, Defendant Rebecca Simmons, Defendant John V. Janosonius, Defendant Michael J. Wynne, Defendant Baili Rhodes, Defendant Allan K. DuBois (Leatherbury, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 26, 2017
32 32 notice Notice Thu 8:59 PM
RESPONSE to30 Notice about Delay in Bar Director Appointment Process, by Greg Gegenheimer (Consovoy, William) Modified on 1/27/2017 to edit docket text (ml).
Related: [-]
31 31 notice Notice Thu 8:53 PM
NOTICE by Greg Gegenheimer re26 Notice (Other),,, (Consovoy, William)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 9:55 AM
Text Order GRANTING29 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to File Reply entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendants' reply is due on January 30, 2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2017
30 30 notice Notice Wed 2:38 PM
NOTICE about Delay in Bar Director Appointment Process by Mary Abbott Martin, Rehan Alimohammad, Christy Amuny, Barbara R. Bass, Micah Belden, Sylvia Borunda Firth, Amy Bryan, H. Alan Carmichael, E. Leon Carter, David E. Chamberlain, Jeff Chandler, Allan K. DuBois, Estrella Escobar, Jose Escobedo Jr., Laura Gibson, Ricky G. Gonzalez, Ann Greenberg, August W. Harris, III, Angelica Hernandez, Joe Horkey Jr., Sam Houston, Joseph Indelicato Jr., John V. Janosonius, John V. Jansonius, Sarah Clower Keathley, Rudolph K. Metayer, Brian Miller, Gary L. Nickelson, Christopher Oddo, Curtis Pritchard, Baili Rhodes, Lisa S. Richardson, Ruben S. Robles, Fidel Rodriguez Jr., Scott Rothenberg, Gregory W. Sampson, Lance D. Sharp, Scott Sherwood, Rebecca Simmons, Frank Stevenson, Scott P. Stolley, C. Barrett Thomas, Andrew Tolchin, Travis Torrence, Tom Vick, Bradley C. Weber, Michael J. Wynne re8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ,25 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,,,,(Leatherbury, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Business Record Affidavit
29 29 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 11:18 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ,28 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,,,,,, by Mary Abbott Martin, Rehan Alimohammad, Christy Amuny, Barbara R. Bass, Micah Belden, Sylvia Borunda Firth, Amy Bryan, H. Alan Carmichael, E. Leon Carter, David E. Chamberlain, Jeff Chandler, Allan K. DuBois, Estrella Escobar, Jose Escobedo Jr., Laura Gibson, Ricky G. Gonzalez, Ann Greenberg, August W. Harris, III, Angelica Hernandez, Joe Horkey Jr., Sam Houston, Joseph Indelicato Jr., John V. Janosonius, John V. Jansonius, Sarah Clower Keathley, Rudolph K. Metayer, Brian Miller, Gary L. Nickelson, Christopher Oddo, Curtis Pritchard, Baili Rhodes, Lisa S. Richardson, Ruben S. Robles, Fidel Rodriguez Jr., Scott Rothenberg, Gregory W. Sampson, Lance D. Sharp, Scott Sherwood, Rebecca Simmons, Frank Stevenson, Scott P. Stolley, C. Barrett Thomas, Andrew Tolchin, Travis Torrence, Tom Vick, Bradley C. Weber, Michael J. Wynne. (Leatherbury, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2017
28 28 respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Fri 4:32 PM
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Greg Gegenheimer, re24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Sarah Clower Keathley, Defendant Andrew Tolchin, Defendant Rehan Alimohammad, Defendant Mary Abbott Martin, Defendant Rudolph K. Metayer, Defendant Christopher Oddo, Defendant H. Alan Carmichael, Defendant Scott Rothenberg, Defendant Sam Houston, Defendant Brian Miller, Defendant Scott P. Stolley, Defendant Sylvia Borunda Firth, Defendant Frank Stevenson, Defendant Jeff Chandler, Defendant John V. Jansonius, Defendant Joseph Indelicato Jr., Defendant David E. Chamberlain, Defendant Ruben S. Robles, Defendant C. Barrett Thomas, Defendant Christy Amuny, Defendant Ricky G. Gonzalez, Defendant Gary L. Nickelson, Defendant Lance D. Sharp, Defendant Angelica Hernandez, Defendant Travis Torrence, Defendant Gregory W. Sampson, Defendant Lisa S. Richardson, Defendant August W. Harris, III, Defendant Tom Vick, Defendant Laura Gibson, Defendant Estrella Escobar, Defendant Jose Escobedo Jr., Defendant Amy Bryan, Defendant Scott Sherwood, Defendant Bradley C. Weber, Defendant Fidel Rodriguez Jr., Defendant Barbara R. Bass, Defendant E. Leon Carter, Defendant Joe Horkey Jr., Defendant Micah Belden, Amicus Ken Paxton, Defendant Ann Greenberg, Defendant Curtis Pritchard, Defendant Rebecca Simmons, Defendant John V. Janosonius, Defendant Michael J. Wynne, Defendant Baili Rhodes, Defendant Allan K. DuBois (Consovoy, William)
Related: [-]
27 27 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 4:28 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Greg Gegenheimer, re8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Greg Gegenheimer (Consovoy, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2017
26 26 notice Notice Wed 4:36 PM
NOTICE Vacation Letter by Mary Abbott Martin, Rehan Alimohammad, Christy Amuny, Barbara R. Bass, Micah Belden, Sylvia Borunda Firth, Amy Bryan, H. Alan Carmichael, E. Leon Carter, David E. Chamberlain, Jeff Chandler, Allan K. DuBois, Estrella Escobar, Jose Escobedo Jr., Laura Gibson, Ricky G. Gonzalez, Ann Greenberg, August W. Harris, III, Angelica Hernandez, Joe Horkey Jr., Sam Houston, Joseph Indelicato Jr., John V. Janosonius, John V. Jansonius, Sarah Clower Keathley, Rudolph K. Metayer, Brian Miller, Gary L. Nickelson, Christopher Oddo, Curtis Pritchard, Baili Rhodes, Lisa S. Richardson, Ruben S. Robles, Fidel Rodriguez Jr., Scott Rothenberg, Gregory W. Sampson, Lance D. Sharp, Scott Sherwood, Rebecca Simmons, Frank Stevenson, Scott P. Stolley, C. Barrett Thomas, Andrew Tolchin, Travis Torrence, Tom Vick, Bradley C. Weber, Michael J. Wynne (Leatherbury, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 06, 2017
25 25 respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Fri 3:01 PM
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Mary Abbott Martin, Rehan Alimohammad, Christy Amuny, Barbara R. Bass, Micah Belden, Sylvia Borunda Firth, Amy Bryan, H. Alan Carmichael, E. Leon Carter, David E. Chamberlain, Jeff Chandler, Allan K. DuBois, Estrella Escobar, Jose Escobedo Jr., Laura Gibson, Ricky G. Gonzalez, Ann Greenberg, August W. Harris, III, Angelica Hernandez, Joe Horkey Jr., Sam Houston, Joseph Indelicato Jr., John V. Janosonius, John V. Jansonius, Sarah Clower Keathley, Rudolph K. Metayer, Brian Miller, Gary L. Nickelson, Christopher Oddo, Curtis Pritchard, Baili Rhodes, Lisa S. Richardson, Ruben S. Robles, Fidel Rodriguez Jr., Scott Rothenberg, Gregory W. Sampson, Lance D. Sharp, Scott Sherwood, Rebecca Simmons, Frank Stevenson, Scott P. Stolley, C. Barrett Thomas, Andrew Tolchin, Travis Torrence, Tom Vick, Bradley C. Weber, Michael J. Wynne, re8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Greg Gegenheimer(Leatherbury, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix
24 24 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Fri 2:55 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Mary Abbott Martin, Rehan Alimohammad, Christy Amuny, Barbara R. Bass, Micah Belden, Sylvia Borunda Firth, Amy Bryan, H. Alan Carmichael, E. Leon Carter, David E. Chamberlain, Jeff Chandler, Allan K. DuBois, Estrella Escobar, Jose Escobedo Jr., Laura Gibson, Ricky G. Gonzalez, Ann Greenberg, August W. Harris, III, Angelica Hernandez, Joe Horkey Jr., Sam Houston, Joseph Indelicato Jr., John V. Janosonius, John V. Jansonius, Sarah Clower Keathley, Rudolph K. Metayer, Brian Miller, Gary L. Nickelson, Christopher Oddo, Curtis Pritchard, Baili Rhodes, Lisa S. Richardson, Ruben S. Robles, Fidel Rodriguez Jr., Scott Rothenberg, Gregory W. Sampson, Lance D. Sharp, Scott Sherwood, Rebecca Simmons, Frank Stevenson, Scott P. Stolley, C. Barrett Thomas, Andrew Tolchin, Travis Torrence, Tom Vick, Bradley C. Weber, Michael J. Wynne.(Leatherbury, Thomas) Modified participant on 1/6/2017 (jf).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix
Wednesday, January 04, 2017
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 9:03 AM
Text Order GRANTING20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by atty William S. Consovoy entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 29, 2016
23 23 misc Brief Thu 10:40 AM
Amicus BRIEF in Support of8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Ken Paxton. (jf)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief Thu 9:30 AM
Text Order GRANTING21 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ja)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 28, 2016
22 22 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 9:41 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Prerak Shah on behalf of Ken Paxton. Attorney Prerak Shah added to party Ken Paxton(pty:am) (Shah, Prerak)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Leave to File Amicus Brief Wed 9:35 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief of Texas Attorney General Ken Paxton by Prerak Shah. by Ken Paxton.(Shah, Prerak)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, December 22, 2016
20 20 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 3:01 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan F. Mitchell for William S. Consovoy on behalf of Greg Gegenheimer. (Mitchell, Jonathan) Modified text on 12/22/2016 (jf)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Deficiency Notice Thu 9:41 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: applicant's original signature is required re 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan F. Mitchell ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-9146529) (jf)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 8:45 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William S. Consovoy ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-9146529) by on behalf of Greg Gegenheimer. (Mitchell, Jonathan) Modified text on 12/22/2016 (jf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2016
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 9:29 AM
Text Order GRANTING17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by atty Joshua Stephen Johnson entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2016
17 17 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 1:40 PM
MOTION for Joshua Stephen Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 100029059). (ml)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 14, 2016
16 16 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 2:00 PM
ORDER GRANTING11 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jf)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Certificate of Service Wed 10:21 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by all named defendants re: 12 Notice of Appearance (Rodriguez, Sandra) Modified text on 12/14/2016 (jf)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Certificate of Service Wed 10:13 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by all named defendants re: 10 Notice of Appearance (Leatherbury, Thomas) Modified text on 12/14/2016 (jf)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Deficiency Notice Wed 9:47 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Thomas S. Leatherbury: re 10 Notice of Appearance. (td)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 8:52 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sandra G. Rodriguez on behalf of all named Defendants. (Rodriguez, Sandra) Modified text on 12/14/2016 (jf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 13, 2016
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Document Tue 8:10 PM
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Mary Abbott Martin, Rehan Alimohammad, Christy Amuny, Barbara R. Bass, Micah Belden, Sylvia Borunda Firth, Amy Bryan, H. Alan Carmichael, E. Leon Carter, David E. Chamberlain, Jeff Chandler, Allan K. DuBois, Estrella Escobar, Jose Escobedo Jr., Laura Gibson, Ricky G. Gonzalez, Ann Greenberg, August W. Harris, III, Angelica Hernandez, Joe Horkey Jr., Sam Houston, Joseph Indelicato Jr., John V. Janosonius, John V. Jansonius, Sarah Clower Keathley, Rudolph K. Metayer, Brian Miller, Gary L. Nickelson, Christopher Oddo, Curtis Pritchard, Baili Rhodes, Lisa S. Richardson, Ruben S. Robles, Fidel Rodriguez Jr., Scott Rothenberg, Gregory W. Sampson, Lance D. Sharp, Scott Sherwood, Rebecca Simmons, Frank Stevenson, Scott P. Stolley, C. Barrett Thomas, Andrew Tolchin, Travis Torrence, Tom Vick, Bradley C. Weber, Michael J. Wynne. (Leatherbury, Thomas)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 8:07 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas S. Leatherbury on behalf of Mary Abbott Martin, Rehan Alimohammad, Christy Amuny, Barbara R. Bass, Micah Belden, Sylvia Borunda Firth, Amy Bryan, H. Alan Carmichael, E. Leon Carter, David E. Chamberlain, Jeff Chandler, Allan K. DuBois, Estrella Escobar, Jose Escobedo Jr., Laura Gibson, Ricky G. Gonzalez, Ann Greenberg, August W. Harris, III, Angelica Hernandez, Joe Horkey Jr., Sam Houston, Joseph Indelicato Jr., John V. Jansonius, Sarah Clower Keathley, Rudolph K. Metayer, Brian Miller, Gary L. Nickelson, Christopher Oddo, Curtis Pritchard, Baili Rhodes, Lisa S. Richardson, Ruben S. Robles, Fidel Rodriguez Jr., Scott Rothenberg, Gregory W. Sampson, Lance D. Sharp, Scott Sherwood, Rebecca Simmons, Frank Stevenson, Scott P. Stolley, C. Barrett Thomas, Andrew Tolchin, Travis Torrence, Tom Vick, Bradley C. Weber, Michael J. Wynne. Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party Mary Abbott Martin(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party Rehan Alimohammad(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party Christy Amuny(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party Barbara R. Bass(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party Micah Belden(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party Sylvia Borunda Firth(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party Amy Bryan(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party H. Alan Carmichael(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party E. Leon Carter(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party David E. Chamberlain(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party Jeff Chandler(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party Allan K. DuBois(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party Estrella Escobar(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party Jose Escobedo Jr.(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party Laura Gibson(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party Ricky G. Gonzalez(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party Ann Greenberg(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party August W. Harris, III(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party Angelica Hernandez(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party Joe Horkey Jr.(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party Sam Houston(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party Joseph Indelicato Jr.(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party John V. Jansonius(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party Sarah Clower Keathley(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party Rudolph K. Metayer(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party Brian Miller(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party Gary L. Nickelson(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party Christopher Oddo(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party Curtis Pritchard(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party Baili Rhodes(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party Lisa S. Richardson(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party Ruben S. Robles(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party Fidel Rodriguez Jr.(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party Scott Rothenberg(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party Gregory W. Sampson(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party Lance D. Sharp(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party Scott Sherwood(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party Rebecca Simmons(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party Frank Stevenson(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party Scott P. Stolley(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party C. Barrett Thomas(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party Andrew Tolchin(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party Travis Torrence(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party Tom Vick(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party Bradley C. Weber(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas S. Leatherbury added to party Michael J. Wynne(pty:dft) (Leatherbury, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 09, 2016
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 1:18 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Greg Gegenheimer. All Defendants. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 08, 2016
8 8 motion Preliminary Injunction Thu 7:07 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Greg Gegenheimer.(Mitchell, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Appendix Appendix
Monday, December 05, 2016
7 7 service Summons Issued Mon 4:59 PM
Summons Issued as to John V. Jansonius. (ml)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 3:38 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Greg Gegenheimer. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 3:35 PM
CORRECTED COMPLAINT against All Defendants correcting1 Complaint, filed by Greg Gegenheimer.(Mitchell, Jonathan) Modified on 12/5/2016 to edit docket text (ml)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
4 4 notice Deficiency Notice Mon 2:52 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 2 Request for Issuance of Summons (afd)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 2:45 PM
Summons Issued as to Mary Abbott Martin, Rehan Alimohammad, Christy Amuny, Barbara R. Bass, Micah Belden, Sylvia Borunda Firth, Amy Bryan, H. Alan Carmichael, E. Leon Carter, David E. Chamberlain, Jeff Chandler, Allan K. DuBois, Estrella Escobar, Jose Escobedo Jr., Greg Gegenheimer, Laura Gibson, Ricky G. Gonzalez, Ann Greenberg, August W. Harris, III, Angelica Hernandez, Joe Horkey Jr., Sam Houston, Joseph Indelicato Jr., Sarah Clower Keathley, Rudolph K. Metayer, Brian Miller, Gary L. Nickelson, Christopher Oddo, Curtis Pritchard, Baili Rhodes, Lisa S. Richardson, Ruben S. Robles, Fidel Rodriguez Jr., Scott Rothenberg, Gregory W. Sampson, Lance D. Sharp, Scott Sherwood. (afd)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 10:52 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Greg Gegenheimer. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 10:06 AM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-9089418). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Greg Gegenheimer.(Mitchell, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 2:41 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd)
Related: [-]