Tony-Tuan Nguyen v. Franz Miller et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Cormac J Carney |
Referred: | Douglas F Mccormick |
Case #: | 8:16-cv-02137 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 01, 2016 |
Terminated: | Feb 17, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday May 30, 2017 1:26 AM PDT |
Defendant
Bryan Elkerton
|
|
Defendant
Miranda McCroskey
|
|
Defendant
Franz Miller
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert Moss
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Thu Hien Nguyen
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Orange County Superior Court
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Timothy Stafford
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Thien Kinh Tran
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Andrew Weiss
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tony-Tuan Nguyen
PO Box 9591
Fountain Valley, CA 92708 |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, March 19, 2018 | ||
48 | 48
appeal
USCA Mandate
Tue 03/20 10:45 AM
MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals42 , USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order47 , CCA # 17-55480 The judgment of this Court, entered February 23, 2018, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. (car) |
|
Friday, February 23, 2018 | ||
47 | 47
appeal
USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order
Tue 02/27 10:55 AM
MEMORANDUM from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals42 filed by Tony-Tuan Nguyen. CCA # 17-55480 The decision of the District Court is AFFIRMED. (shb) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
46 | 46
misc
Financial Entry
Mon 05/08 2:06 PM
FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $505.00 into the registry of the Court from Anthony Nguyen. Receipt number SA013487. (dv) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
45 | 45
appeal
USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order
Mon 04/17 4:52 PM
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals42 filed by Tony-Tuan Nguyen. CCA # 17-55480 A review of the docket reflects that appellant has not paid the docketing and filing fees for this appeal. Within 21 days from the date of this order, appellant shall:[See document] If appellant fails to comply with this order, this appeal will be dismissed automatically by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. [See document for all details.] (mat) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
44 | 44
appeal
USCA Notification of Case Number
Tue 04/11 2:45 PM
NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 17-55480 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals42 as to Plaintiff Tony-Tuan Nguyen. (lom) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
43 | 43
appeal
Filing Fee Letter (A-15CV)
Mon 04/10 4:09 PM
FILING FEE LETTER issued as to Plaintiff Tony-Tuan Nguyen, re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals42 (car) |
|
42 | 42
appeal
Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals
Mon 04/10 4:06 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Plaintiff Tony-Tuan Nguyen. Appeal of Order, Terminated Case32 , Order on Motion to Vacate41 Filing fee $ 505 Billed. (car) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
41 | 41
order
Vacate
Tue 03/14 10:36 AM
ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney denying37 MOTION to Vacate Dismissal Order. (see document for details). (dro) |
|
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 03/06 1:20 PM
OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Vacate Order, Terminated Case32 37 filed by Defendants Franz Miller, Franz Miller, Robert Moss, Robert Moss, Orange County Superior Court, Timothy Stafford, Timothy Stafford. (Overton, Sarah) |
|
39 | 39
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Mon 03/06 10:03 AM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Vacate Order, Terminated Case32 37 with supporting declaration and proof of service filed by Defendants Thu Hien Nguyen, Thien Kinh Tran, Andrew Weiss.(Weiss, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 | ||
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
respm
Exhibit to Motion
Mon 02/27 10:33 PM
EXHIBITS FOR MOTION to Vacate or Amend Rulings on 2/17/2017 (Dismissal) Caused from Errors or Misunderstanding from the Court32 37 filed by Plaintiff Tony-Tuan Nguyen. (mt) |
|
37 | 37
motion
Vacate
Mon 02/27 10:31 PM
MOTION to Vacate or Amend Rulings on 2/17/2017 (Dismissal) Caused from Errors or Misunderstanding from the Court32 filed by Plaintiff Tony-Tuan Nguyen. (mt) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
order
Vacate
Fri 02/24 11:08 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney denying34 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Vacate. (see document for details). (dro) |
|
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Exhibit (non-trial)
Thu 02/23 3:58 PM
EXHIBITS for EX PARTE MOTION to Vacate34 filed by Plaintiff Tony-Tuan Nguyen. (dro) |
|
34 | 34
motion
Vacate
Thu 02/23 3:55 PM
EX PARTE MOTION to Vacate Or Amend Rulings filed by plaintiff Tony-Tuan Nguyen. (dro) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Fri 02/17 11:28 AM
ORDER Dismissing Case With Prejudice by Judge Cormac J. Carney: For the following reasons, Plaintiff's case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. See document for further information. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lwag) |
|
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 02/21 2:25 PM
NOTICE of Intent to File Motion to Protective Order-Partial Summary Judgments and Injunction Relief, Compel Discovery Process and Joining Disposition filed by Plaintiff Tony-Tuan Nguyen. (lwag) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Mon 02/13 4:44 PM
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint 14 filed by Defendants Franz Miller, Franz Miller, Robert Moss, Robert Moss, Orange County Superior Court, Timothy Stafford, Timothy Stafford. (Overton, Sarah) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Declaration
Fri 02/10 2:26 PM
DECLARATION of Tony-Tuan Nguyen To Oppose and Strike Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,27 filed by Plaintiff Tony-Tuan Nguyen. (dro) |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines
Tue 02/07 9:30 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER Continuing Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Quash17 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Two defense motions are currently pending in this case: a motion to dismiss, (Dkt.14 ), noticed for February 27, 2017, at 1:30 p.m., and a motion to quash summons, (Dkt.17 ), noticed for February 13, 2017, at 1:30 p.m. In the interests of judicial economy, the hearing on the motion to quash summons is HEREBY CONTINUED to February 27, 2017, at 1:30 p.m. The Court will consider both pending motions at that time. (dro) |
|
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 02/06 9:05 PM
NOTICE TO OPPOSE AND OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANTS FRANZ MILLER, ROBERT MOSS and TIMOTHY STAFFORD AND ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT filed by Plaintiff Tony-Tuan Nguyen. (mt) |
|
27 | 27
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Mon 02/06 8:25 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order24 with supporting declaration and proof of service filed by Defendants Thu Hien Nguyen, Thien Kinh Tran, Andrew Weiss.(Weiss, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Related Case(s)
Mon 02/06 9:50 AM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff Tony-Tuan Nguyen. Related Case(s): SACV17-00128 JLS (KESx) (dro) |
|
25 | 25
motion
Consolidate Cases
Mon 02/06 9:47 AM
EX PARTE MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to SACV17-00128 JLS (KESx), filed by plaintiff Tony-Tuan Nguyen. (dro) |
|
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Order
Thu 02/02 4:03 PM
EX PARTE of Motion and Ex Parte Motion to Disqualify Counsel Defendant Andrew Weiss from his Fraudulent and Criminal Conducts filed by plaintiff Tony-Tuan Nguyen. (mba) |
|
Sunday, January 29, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice (Other)
Sun 01/29 8:05 PM
NOTICE Intent to Cross-Examine purusant to Rule 7-8 filed by Defendants Thu Hien Nguyen, Thien Kinh Tran, Andrew Weiss. with proof of service (Weiss, Andrew) |
|
22 | 22
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Sun 01/29 7:44 PM
REPLY in Support of Motion, with Request for Judicial Notice and proof of service NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash Summons re: Complaint - (Discovery),1 and First Amended Complaint with proof of service 17 filed by Defendants Thu Hien Nguyen, Thien Kinh Tran, Andrew Weiss.(Weiss, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Tuesday, January 24, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Deficiency - Default /Default Judgment (CV-52b) - optional html form
Tue 01/24 9:00 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: APPLICATION for Entry of Default against defendants Thu Hien Nguyen, Thien Kinh Tran, Andrew Weiss15 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: Proof of Service is lacking required information. Proof of Service is missing information about how and when defendants were served. (dro) |
|
Monday, January 23, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Tue 01/24 4:22 PM
NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND OPPOSITION to MOTION to Quash Summons17 filed by Plaintiff Tony-Tuan Nguyen. (dro) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Consolidate Cases
Fri 01/20 3:51 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney denying as Moot16 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Consolidate Cases. (see document for details). (dro) |
|
Wednesday, January 18, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Declaration
Thu 01/19 3:42 PM
DECLARATION of Dr. Tony-Tuan Nguyen filed by Plaintiff Tony-Tuan Nguyen. (dro) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Quash Summons
Thu 01/12 2:16 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash Summons re: Complaint - (Discovery),1 and First Amended Complaint with proof of service filed by Defendants Thu Hien Nguyen, Thien Kinh Tran, Andrew Weiss. Motion set for hearing on 2/13/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attorney Andrew D Weiss added to party Thu Hien Nguyen(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew D Weiss added to party Thien Kinh Tran(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew D Weiss added to party Andrew Weiss(pty:dft)) (Weiss, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 | ||
Tuesday, January 10, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Consolidate Cases
Wed 01/11 10:15 AM
EX PARTE APPLICATION to Consolidate Cases, as to SACV17-00015 AG (JCGx), filed by plaintiff Tony-Tuan Nguyen. (dro) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Default
Wed 01/11 10:14 AM
APPLICATION for Entry of Default against defendants Thu Hien Nguyen, Thien Kinh Tran, Andrew Weiss filed by plaintiff Tony-Tuan Nguyen. (dro) |
|
Thursday, January 05, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Dismiss (cause or other)
Thu 01/05 2:10 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Franz Miller(Official Capacity), Franz Miller(Individual Capacity), Robert Moss(Individual Capacity), Robert Moss(Official Capacity), Orange County Superior Court, Timothy Stafford(Individual Capacity), Timothy Stafford(Official Capacity). Motion set for hearing on 2/27/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Overton, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
13 | 13
notice
Withdrawal (Document or Motion)
Thu 01/05 11:34 AM
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss (cause or other),,,8 filed by Defendants Franz Miller(Official Capacity), Franz Miller(Individual Capacity), Robert Moss(Individual Capacity), Robert Moss(Official Capacity), Orange County Superior Court, Timothy Stafford(Individual Capacity), Timothy Stafford(Official Capacity). (Overton, Sarah) |
|
Wednesday, January 04, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Clerical Error (G-11)
Wed 01/04 9:29 AM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error the incorrect document was attached to docket # 1111 . The correct document is attached to this notice. (See document for details). (dv) |
|
Att: 1 Correct document | ||
Tuesday, January 03, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Transfer Pursuant to GO 16-05 DECLINED-(related case)(CV 34)
Tue 01/03 2:14 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05 filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Josephine L. Staton, for the reasons set forth on this order. (See document for details). Related Case No. 8:16-cv-01950-JLS-KESx. (dv) |
|
Wednesday, December 28, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Related Case(s)
Wed 12/28 3:20 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Franz Miller(Official Capacity), Franz Miller(Individual Capacity), Robert Moss(Individual Capacity), Robert Moss(Official Capacity), Orange County Superior Court, Timothy Stafford(Individual Capacity), Timothy Stafford(Official Capacity). Related Case(s): SACV 16-01950 JLS KESx (Overton, Sarah) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 12/28 3:13 PM
NOTICE filed by Defendant Franz Miller(Official Capacity), Franz Miller(Individual Capacity), Robert Moss(Individual Capacity), Robert Moss(Official Capacity), Orange County Superior Court, Timothy Stafford(Individual Capacity), Timothy Stafford(Official Capacity). Notice of Interested Parties (Overton, Sarah) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss (cause or other)
Wed 12/28 3:05 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Defendant Franz Miller(Official Capacity), Franz Miller(Individual Capacity), Robert Moss(Individual Capacity), Robert Moss(Official Capacity), Orange County Superior Court, Timothy Stafford(Individual Capacity), Timothy Stafford(Official Capacity). Motion set for hearing on 2/6/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attorney Sarah L Overton added to party Franz Miller(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah L Overton added to party Franz Miller(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah L Overton added to party Robert Moss(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah L Overton added to party Robert Moss(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah L Overton added to party Orange County Superior Court(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah L Overton added to party Timothy Stafford(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah L Overton added to party Timothy Stafford(pty:dft)) (Overton, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, December 22, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
othcmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 12/22 4:01 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery),1 , filed by plaintiff Tony-Tuan Nguyen(dro) |
|
Monday, December 19, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Related Case(s)
Tue 12/20 8:37 AM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff Tony-Tuan Nguyen. Related Case(s): 30-2016 00729544 (dro) |
|
Friday, December 02, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Thu 12/08 10:38 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to defendants All Defendants. (dro) |
|
Thursday, December 01, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 12/06 12:49 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Tony-Tuan Nguyen, identifying Other Affiliate US Department of Homeland Security, Other Affiliate Orange County District Attorneys, Other Affiliate State Bar of California, Other Affiliate California Judicial Performance Commission, Other Affiliate Orange County Superior Court, Other Affiliate US Department of Justice, Other Affiliate US Department of Defense, Other Affiliate Federal Bureau of Investigations for Tony-Tuan Nguyen. (car) |
|
3 | 3
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 12/06 12:45 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 12/06 12:43 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (car) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Tue 12/06 12:42 PM
COMPLAINT against Defendants Case assigned to Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick.(Filing fee $ 400 PAID) Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Tony-Tuan Nguyen. (car) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |